Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Fararooei Minoo, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Brahman Nina Pouneh, Seo Jung Ju, against Kobulnick Belinda, Kobulnick Jeffrey Allan, represented by Flannery Courtney Dawn, Freed Leesa Ann, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Laura A. Seigle presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 26, 2019 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle - Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Jury Instructions; Filed by: MINOO FARAROOEI (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-09T00:00:00Witness List; Filed by: JEFFREY ALLAN KOBULNICK (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Tax Plaintiff's Costs; Filed by: Minoo Fararooei (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-18T00:00:00Motion to Tax Costs; Filed by: Jeffrey Allan Kobulnick (Defendant)
Date: 2021-11-01T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-07-26T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: JEFFREY ALLAN KOBULNICK (Defendant); As to: MINOO FARAROOEI (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-09-25T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: MINOO FARAROOEI (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-17T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: JEFFREY ALLAN KOBULNICK (Defendant)
Date: 2019-09-25T00:00:00Motion for Trial Preference; Filed by: MINOO FARAROOEI (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: JEFFREY ALLAN KOBULNICK (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-03T00:00:00PI General Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-08-08T00:00:00Motion for Attorney Fees; Filed by: Minoo Fararooei (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-19T00:00:00Jury Question Juror Question for Witness #6; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00Jury Question Juror Questions 1-5 for Witnesses; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-08-27T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by: MINOO FARAROOEI (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00Trial Brief; Filed by: Jeffrey Allan Kobulnick (Defendant); BELINDA KOBULNICK (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-08T00:00:00Exhibit List; Filed by: MINOO FARAROOEI (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-29T00:00:00Jury Instructions Refused; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-09-17T00:00:00Jury Question Juror Question for Witness; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-09-09T00:00:00Jury Question; Filed by:
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Jury Instructions Given; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-09-17T00:00:00Special Verdict; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-09-17T00:00:00Jury Question; Filed by:
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00Trial Brief
Date: September 08, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL)
Date: September 09, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL)
Date: September 10, 2021Jury Question - JURY QUESTION JUROR QUESTIONS FOR WITNESSES
Date: September 13, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL)
Date: September 13, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL)
Date: September 14, 2021Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER RE: DR. MILLER'S REBUTTAL TESTIMONY
Date: September 15, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL)
Date: September 15, 2021Jury Instructions - JURY INSTRUCTIONS GIVEN
Date: September 17, 2021Jury Instructions - JURY INSTRUCTIONS WITHDRAWN
Date: September 17, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL)
Date: September 17, 2021Jury Instructions - JURY INSTRUCTIONS REFUSED
Date: September 17, 2021Special Verdict
Date: September 17, 2021Notice of Intent to Dispose of Exhibits (Civil)
Date: September 21, 2021Judgment on Special Verdict
Date: October 05, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT
Date: October 12, 2021Motion for Attorney Fees
Date: October 19, 2021Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: October 19, 2021Motion to Tax Costs
Date: November 01, 2021Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO TAX PLAINTIFF'S COSTS
Date: November 18, 2021Reply - REPLY TO DEF'S OPPOSITION TO PLTF'S MTN FOR ATTY'S FEES & COSTS OF PROOF SANCTIONS
Date: November 23, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER CONTINUING MOTION HEARINGS FROM 10/03/2021 TO 10/...)
Date: November 29, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL
Date: December 03, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER CONTINUING HEARING FROM 12/10/2021 10:00 AM TO 3:...)
Date: December 07, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER FOR PROOF OF COST SANCTIONS; HEARIN...)
Date: December 10, 2021Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment
Date: February 03, 2022Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-20T00:00:00Trial Transfer Order (to Judge Harwin; Dept M; Van Nuys; OTR ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-30T00:00:00Minute Order ((Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-26T00:00:00Minute Order ((Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion - Other for Proof of Cost Sanctions; Hearin...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-12-10T00:00:00Jury Question (Juror Question for Witness) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-09T00:00:00Judgment on Special Verdict Filed by Minoo Fararooei (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-05T00:00:00Minute Order ((Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Dispose of Exhibits (Civil) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-21T00:00:00Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment Filed by Jeffrey Allan Kobulnick (Defendant)
Date: February 03, 2022Jury Question (for Witness Donald J. Lewis , M.D.) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-17T00:00:00Jury Instructions (Refused) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-17T00:00:00Notice (of unavailability of counsel) Filed by Minoo Fararooei (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00Jury Question (Juror Questions for Witnesses) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-14T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary) Filed by Minoo Fararooei (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-19T00:00:00Special Verdict Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-17T00:00:00Jury Question (Juror Questions for Witnesses) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00Jury Instructions (Given) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-09T00:00:00Minute Order ((Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-14T00:00:00Jury Question (Juror Questions 1-5 for Witnesses) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-27T00:00:00Motion for Attorney Fees Filed by Minoo Fararooei (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-19T00:00:00Jury Instructions (Withdrawn) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-17T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order continuing hearing from 10:00 AM to 3:...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-12-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Continuing Motion Hearings from to 10/...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-11-29T00:00:00Motion to Tax Costs Filed by Jeffrey Allan Kobulnick (Defendant)
Date: 2021-11-01T00:00:00Minute Order ((Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-10T00:00:00Statement of the Case Filed by Minoo Fararooei (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-15T00:00:00Minute Order ((Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-03T00:00:00Jury Question (Juror Question for Witness #6) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Judgment) Filed by Minoo Fararooei (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-12T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendant's Motion to Tax Plaintiff's Costs) Filed by Minoo Fararooei (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-18T00:00:00Minute Order ((Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to Continue Trial) Filed by Jeffrey Allan Kobulnick (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-01T00:00:00Motion for Trial Preference Filed by Minoo Fararooei (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00Statement of the Case Filed by Jeffrey Allan Kobulnick (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00Witness List Filed by Jeffrey Allan Kobulnick (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial; Final Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-02T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (Deposition of Jan Roughan taken on ) Filed by Jeffrey Allan Kobulnick (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-26T00:00:00Trial Transfer Order (to Judge Cho, Dept. K, Santa Monica Court, OTR today at 1:30 p.m.) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-20T00:00:00Reply (TO DEF'S OPPOSITION ON TO PLTF'S MIL 3) Filed by Minoo Fararooei (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-16T00:00:00Jury Question; Filed by:
Date: 2021-09-03T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-08-03T00:00:00Jury Question Juror Questions for Witnesses; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-09-14T00:00:00Trial Transfer Order to Judge Harwin; Dept M; Van Nuys; OTR ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00Witness List; Filed by: MINOO FARAROOEI (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-09T00:00:00Statement of the Case; Filed by: MINOO FARAROOEI (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-09T00:00:00Jury Question Juror Questions for Witnesses; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00Exhibit List; Filed by: MINOO FARAROOEI (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-09T00:00:00Jury Question; Filed by:
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Joint Exhibit List; Filed by: JEFFREY ALLAN KOBULNICK (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00Jury Instructions; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-09-17T00:00:00Exhibit List; Filed by: MINOO FARAROOEI (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-14T00:00:00Other - Election to Forgo Affidavit (CCP Section 170.6); Filed by: JEFFREY ALLAN KOBULNICK (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00Witness List; Filed by: MINOO FARAROOEI (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-30T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00Reply TO DEF'S OPPOSION TO PLTF'S MIL 3; Filed by: MINOO FARAROOEI (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-16T00:00:00Statement of the Case; Filed by: JEFFREY ALLAN KOBULNICK (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00Notice of Lodging Deposition of Jan Roughan taken on ; Filed by: Jeffrey Allan Kobulnick (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-26T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Dispose of Exhibits (Civil); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-09-21T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Minoo Fararooei (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-07-26T00:00:00Jury Instructions Filed by Minoo Fararooei (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-09T00:00:00PI General Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-08-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial; Hearing on...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00Answer Filed by Jeffrey Allan Kobulnick (Defendant)
Date: 2019-09-25T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Minoo Fararooei (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-07-26T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Jeffrey Allan Kobulnick (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-03T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Jeffrey Allan Kobulnick (Defendant)
Date: 2019-09-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-25T00:00:00Other - (Election to Forgo Affidavit (CCP Section 170.6)) Filed by Jeffrey Allan Kobulnick (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) Filed by Minoo Fararooei (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Order Motion for Order to Compel Additi...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Minoo Fararooei (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-07-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-29T00:00:00Joint Exhibit List Filed by Jeffrey Allan Kobulnick (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Minoo Fararooei (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-17T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-07-26T00:00:00Exhibit List Filed by Minoo Fararooei (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Exhibit List Filed by Minoo Fararooei (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-14T00:00:00Witness List Filed by Minoo Fararooei (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-09T00:00:00Exhibit List Filed by Minoo Fararooei (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-09T00:00:00Notice (of Continuance of Trial) Filed by Minoo Fararooei (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial / RETRIAL;)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-18T00:00:00Witness List Filed by Minoo Fararooei (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference; Jury Trial (Re-Trial))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-18T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-03T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2019-07-26T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-07-26T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-09-25T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2019-09-25T00:00:00PI General Order
Date: 2019-08-08T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-07-26T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates)
Date: 2019-08-08T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-07-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Order Motion for Order to Compel Additi...))
Date: 2021-04-30T00:00:00Motion for Trial Preference
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to Continue Trial)
Date: 2021-07-01T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-05-03T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2021-05-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial; Hearing on...))
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2021-07-09T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2021-07-09T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2021-07-09T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2021-07-09T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00Joint Exhibit List
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2021-07-14T00:00:00Opposition (OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES)
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00Opposition (OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES)
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2021-07-14T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00Opposition (TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES)
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00Opposition (TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES)
Date: 2021-07-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2021-07-20T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial; Final Status Conference))
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00Other - (Election to Forgo Affidavit (CCP Section 170.6))
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00Trial Transfer Order (to Judge Harwin; Dept M; Van Nuys; OTR 7/29/21 )
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00Motion in Limine (PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 7 TO EXCLUDE COLLATERAL SOURCE)
Date: 2021-07-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2021-07-29T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore (Patti Sundstrom CSR#5923)
Date: 2021-07-29T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2021-07-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2021-08-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2021-07-30T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2021-07-30T00:00:00Notice (of Continuance of Trial)
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter
Date: 2021-08-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2021-08-03T00:00:00Trial Transfer Order (to Judge Cho, Dept. K, Santa Monica Court, OTR today at 1:30 p.m.)
Date: 2021-08-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference; Jury Trial (Re-Trial)))
Date: 2021-08-18T00:00:00Notice (Of Intent to Use potions of Videotape deposition of Kobulnick in Plaintiff's Case in Chief)
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial / RETRIAL;))
Date: 2021-08-18T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore (Re: Sarah Baker #13608)
Date: 2021-08-18T00:00:00Reply (TO DEF'S OPPOSITION ON TO PLTF'S MIL 3)
Date: 2021-08-16T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (RE: AUTHENTICITY OF 3 POLICE VIDEOS (BODYCAMS/DASH CAM))
Date: 2021-08-20T00:00:00Notice (Of Intent to Use potions of Videotape deposition of Josephson in Plaintiff's Case in Chief)
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00Notice (Of Intent to Use potions of Videpotape deposition of Van Horn in Plaintiff's Case in Chief)
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00Notice (Of Intent to Use potions of Videotape deposition of Jaeger in Plaintiff's Case in Chief)
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00Notice (Of Intent to Use potions of Videotape deposition of Kode in Plaintiff's Case in Chief)
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2021-08-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00Minute Order ((Jury Trial))
Date: 2021-08-26T00:00:00Minute Order ((Jury Trial))
Date: 2021-08-27T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (Deposition of Jan Roughan taken on 07/16/2021)
Date: 2021-08-26T00:00:00Jury Question (Juror Questions 1-5 for Witnesses)
Date: 2021-08-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2021-08-25T00:00:00Minute Order ((Jury Trial))
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00Exhibit List (Joint (3rd Amended))
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00Jury Question (Juror Question for Witness #6)
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00Minute Order ((Jury Trial))
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2021-09-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2021-09-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00Jury Question (Juror Questions for Witnesses)
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00Trial Brief (RE: EXCLUSION OF MEDICAL BILLS NOT SHOWN TO BE NECESSARY)
Date: 2021-09-08T00:00:00Stipulation - No Order (Re: Dr. Miller's Rebuttal Testimony)
Date: 2021-09-15T00:00:00Jury Instructions (Given)
Date: 2021-09-17T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendant's Trial Brief RE: Exclusion of Past Medical Bills)
Date: 2021-09-09T00:00:00Minute Order ((Jury Trial))
Date: 2021-09-03T00:00:00Minute Order ((Jury Trial))
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2021-09-10T00:00:00Jury Instructions (Refused)
Date: 2021-09-17T00:00:00Minute Order ((Jury Trial))
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Special Verdict
Date: 2021-09-17T00:00:00Jury Question (Juror Question for Witness)
Date: 2021-09-09T00:00:00Jury Question (Juror Questions for Witnesses)
Date: 2021-09-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2021-09-15T00:00:00Objection (Objection Reply to Opposition to Motion to Strike or Tax Plaintiff's Memorandum of Costs)
Date: 2021-11-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2021-09-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order continuing hearing from 12/10/2021 10:00 AM to 3:...))
Date: 2021-12-07T00:00:00Judgment on Special Verdict
Date: 2021-10-05T00:00:00Notice (of unavailability of counsel)
Date: 2021-12-03T00:00:00Jury Question (for Witness Donald J. Lewis , M.D.)
Date: 2021-10-29T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendant's Motion to Tax Plaintiff's Costs)
Date: 2021-11-18T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Judgment)
Date: 2021-10-12T00:00:00Reply (TO DEF'S OPPOSITION TO PLTF'S MTN FOR ATTY'S FEES & COSTS OF PROOF SANCTIONS)
Date: 2021-11-23T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Dispose of Exhibits (Civil)
Date: 2021-09-21T00:00:00Motion to Tax Costs
Date: 2021-11-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Continuing Motion Hearings from 10/03/2021 to 10/...))
Date: 2021-11-29T00:00:00Motion for Attorney Fees
Date: 2021-10-19T00:00:00Jury Instructions (Withdrawn)
Date: 2021-09-17T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: 2021-10-19T00:00:00Opposition (OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES)
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (AUTHENTICITY OF 3 POLICE VIDEOS (BODYCAMS/DASH CAM))
Date: 2021-08-20T00:00:00Trial Brief
Date: 2021-09-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2021-08-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2021-08-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-07-26T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2021-05-17T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-05-03T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2019-07-26T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-09-25T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2021-07-09T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-07-26T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2021-07-09T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2019-09-25T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to Continue Trial)
Date: 2021-07-01T00:00:00Motion for Trial Preference
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2021-07-09T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2021-07-09T00:00:00Opposition (OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES)
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00Notice (of Continuance of Trial)
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00Motion in Limine (PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 7 TO EXCLUDE COLLATERAL SOURCE)
Date: 2021-07-29T00:00:00Notice (Of Intent to Use potions of Videotape deposition of Josephson in Plaintiff's Case in Chief)
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00Opposition (TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES)
Date: 2021-07-20T00:00:00Opposition (OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES)
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2021-07-14T00:00:00Opposition (OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES)
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00Reply (TO DEF'S OPPOSITION ON TO PLTF'S MIL 3)
Date: 2021-08-16T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2021-07-30T00:00:00Other - (Election to Forgo Affidavit (CCP Section 170.6))
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00Joint Exhibit List
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2021-07-29T00:00:00Notice (Of Intent to Use potions of Videpotape deposition of Van Horn in Plaintiff's Case in Chief)
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00Notice (Of Intent to Use potions of Videotape deposition of Jaeger in Plaintiff's Case in Chief)
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00Reply (TO DEF'S OPPOSION TO PLTF'S MIL 3)
Date: 2021-08-16T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.