Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Osuji Chijoke John Major, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Conlogue Kevin Shawn, Feher Thomas Steven, Zeesman Alexander Joshua, Zeesman Diana, against Lahijani Behzad, Lyft Inc., represented by Barilla Nicole C., Velilla Rachel T, Bartlett Michael J, Fiola N. Asir, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Christopher K. Lui presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 22, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: April 30, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: May 28, 2020Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted
Date: June 29, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: June 30, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: July 10, 2020Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts
Date: July 13, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))
Date: July 13, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)
Date: July 20, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: July 20, 2020Motion to Transfer
Date: July 20, 2020Motion for Protective Order
Date: August 07, 2020Request for Judicial Notice
Date: August 07, 2020Separate Statement
Date: August 12, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUED HEARING
Date: August 12, 2020Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: August 17, 2020Separate Statement
Date: August 17, 2020Association of Attorney
Date: September 01, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE
Date: September 09, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF ERRATA RE: SPELLING OF PLAINTIFF'S NAME AND DATE OF LOSS
Date: September 15, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))
Date: October 07, 2020Reply - REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF THE MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER
Date: October 26, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ((1) HEARING ON MOTION TO DEEM REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ADMITTED...)
Date: November 02, 2020Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: November 04, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF RESULTS OF HEARING AT 11/4/2020 IDC
Date: November 05, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))
Date: November 04, 2020Separate Statement
Date: November 13, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: November 16, 2020Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: November 18, 2020Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel
Date: November 18, 2020Informal Discovery Conference
Date: November 20, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF’S NOTICE OF MOTION AND ...)
Date: November 20, 2020Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: November 23, 2020Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: November 30, 2020Motion for Protective Order
Date: December 09, 2020Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: December 15, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION DEFENDANT LYFT, INC.’S EX PAR...)
Date: December 15, 2020Order - ORDER ORDER APPOINTING REFEREE
Date: December 17, 2020Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: December 22, 2020Reply - REPLY DEFENDANT’S REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF THE MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL
Date: December 29, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: January 07, 2021Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: January 12, 2021Reply - REPLY DEFENDANT'S SUR-REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF THE MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL
Date: January 15, 2021Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: January 15, 2021Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: January 22, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL MCNEIL, TROPP, & ...)
Date: February 01, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF JOHN CHIJIOKE OSUJI MAJOR
Date: February 08, 2021Objection - OBJECTION AND RESPONSES TO DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFF
Date: February 10, 2021Order - ORDER RE: SHIFTING DISCOVERY REFEREE COSTS TO DEFENDANT LYFT, INC.
Date: February 19, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR ORDER PLAINTIFF’S NOTICE OF MOTION AND ...)
Date: February 19, 2021Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: February 23, 2021Motion for Leave to Intervene
Date: February 25, 2021Order - ORDER RE: MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL
Date: March 02, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: March 04, 2021Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: March 05, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: March 22, 2021Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF DISASSOCIATION
Date: March 24, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE
Date: March 29, 2021Answer
Date: April 09, 2021Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE
Date: June 29, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))
Date: July 26, 2021Motion for Protective Order
Date: August 23, 2021Notice of Settlement
Date: August 30, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER)
Date: August 31, 2021Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER CONFIDENTIAL AND HIGHLY CONFIDENTIAL DESIGNATIONS
Date: September 27, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))
Date: October 19, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: October 27, 2021Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Alexander Joshua Zeesman (Attorney)
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00PI General Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-07-30T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-06-30T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by: Lyft, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-09-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-30T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by: Behzad Lahijani (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-04T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Lyft, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-09-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-05-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-10T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-07-22T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Behzad Lahijani (Defendant); As to: Chijoke John Major Osuji (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-04T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-15T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts; Filed by: Lyft, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-07-13T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Behzad Lahijani (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-07T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Lyft, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-07T00:00:00Motion for Protective Order; Filed by: Behzad Lahijani (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-20T00:00:00Association of Attorney; Filed by: Chijoke John Major Osuji (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00Motion to Transfer; Filed by: Chijoke John Major Osuji (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-20T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Lyft, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-12T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel; Filed by: Attorney; As to: Behzad Lahijani (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Notice of Results of Hearing at IDC; Filed by: Chijoke John Major Osuji (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Chijoke John Major Osuji (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Thomas Steven Feher (Attorney)
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Chijoke John Major Osuji (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Lyft, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Reply brief in support of the motion for protective order; Filed by: Behzad Lahijani (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Behzad Lahijani (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Motion for Protective Order; Filed by: Lyft, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-09T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter Jul;ie Park, CSR #13925; Signed and Filed by:
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Pleadings; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-06-15T00:00:00Order RE: SHIFTING DISCOVERY REFEREE COSTS TO DEFENDANT LYFT, INC. Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel McNeil, Tropp, & ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Chijoke John Major Osuji (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-05T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Chijoke John Major Osuji (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-27T00:00:00Motion for Protective Order Filed by Behzad Lahijani (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-07T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION OF JOHN CHIJIOKE OSUJI MAJOR) Filed by Chijoke John Major Osuji (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel Filed by Nicole C. Barilla (Attorney)
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-06-30T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application DEFENDANT BEHZAD LAHIJANI?S E...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-11T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-15T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel PLAINTIFF?S NOTICE OF MOTION AND ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application DEFENDANT BEHZAD LAHIJANI?S E...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-25T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Chijoke John Major Osuji (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Lyft, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-22T00:00:00Reply (brief in support of the motion for protective order) Filed by Behzad Lahijani (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: STEADFAST INSURANCE COMPANY (Non-Party); As to: Chijoke John Major Osuji (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Lyft, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-22T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Chijoke John Major Osuji (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-06T00:00:00Order RE: MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: STEADFAST INSURANCE COMPANY (Non-Party)
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: April 09, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL
Date: April 09, 2021Notice of Rejection - Pleadings
Date: April 21, 2021Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTIONS
Date: April 20, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: April 27, 2021Separate Statement
Date: April 27, 2021Motion for Protective Order
Date: May 28, 2021Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)
Date: June 04, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: June 07, 2021Notice of Rejection - Pleadings
Date: June 15, 2021Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion
Date: July 06, 2021Separate Statement
Date: July 06, 2021Motion for Protective Order; Filed by: Lyft, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Pleadings; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-04-21T00:00:00Updated -- Motion for Protective Order: Filed By: Lyft, Inc. (Defendant); Result: Denied; Result Date:
Date: 2021-06-01T00:00:00Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death); Filed by: Chijoke John Major Osuji (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-04T00:00:00Motion for Protective Order; Filed by: Lyft, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-28T00:00:00Default entered as to Behzad Lahijani; On the Complaint filed by Chijoke John Major Osuji on
Date: 2021-06-01T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Behzad Lahijani (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-04T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Lyft, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-12T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts Filed by Lyft, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-07-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-06-30T00:00:00Order (RE: SHIFTING DISCOVERY REFEREE COSTS TO DEFENDANT LYFT, INC.) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-19T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses Filed by Chijoke John Major Osuji (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted Filed by Chijoke John Major Osuji (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-07T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by Chijoke John Major Osuji (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-09-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-05-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Leave to Intervene STEADFAST INSURANCE ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-06T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Order (RE: MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses Filed by Chijoke John Major Osuji (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00Motion for Protective Order Filed by Lyft, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-28T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Withdrawal of Motions) Filed by Chijoke John Major Osuji (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses Defen...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-04T00:00:00Notice (of Association of Counsel) Filed by Chijoke John Major Osuji (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Pleadings Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-21T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by STEADFAST INSURANCE COMPANY (Non-Party)
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Status Conference re stipulated protective order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Chijoke John Major Osuji (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-07T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Pleadings Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-15T00:00:00Motion for Protective Order Filed by Lyft, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Answer Filed by STEADFAST INSURANCE COMPANY (Non-Party)
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Chijoke John Major Osuji (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-06T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Informal Discovery Conference) Filed by Lyft, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-01T00:00:00Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death) Filed by Chijoke John Major Osuji (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-04T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Chijoke John Major Osuji (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: sanctions for Defendant Behzad Lahija...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-27T00:00:00Notice of Settlement Filed by Chijoke John Major Osuji (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Chijoke John Major Osuji (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference re stipulated protective order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-07-22T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2019-07-22T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-08-02T00:00:00PI General Order
Date: 2019-07-30T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates)
Date: 2019-07-30T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-07-22T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-07-22T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2019-09-06T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2019-09-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/15/2020)
Date: 2020-04-15T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2020-02-04T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-02-04T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-09-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/30/2020)
Date: 2020-04-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-04-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-04-30T00:00:00Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted
Date: 2020-06-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 06/30/2020)
Date: 2020-06-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-05-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 05/28/2020)
Date: 2020-05-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-06-30T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order))
Date: 2020-07-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 07/10/2020)
Date: 2020-07-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-07-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-07-20T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts
Date: 2020-07-13T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts
Date: 2020-07-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)))
Date: 2020-07-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2020-07-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 07/20/2020)
Date: 2020-07-20T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Entry of Order of 7/10/2020 Re Hearing Date on Motion to Compel Written Discovery)
Date: 2020-07-20T00:00:00Motion to Transfer
Date: 2020-07-20T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2020-08-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of 07/20/2020)
Date: 2020-07-20T00:00:00Motion for Protective Order
Date: 2020-08-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application DEFENDANT BEHZAD LAHIJANI?S E...))
Date: 2020-08-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION DEFENDANT BEHZAD LAHIJANI?S E...))
Date: 2020-08-11T00:00:00Motion to Compel (Further Responses to Request for Production of Documents)
Date: 2020-08-12T00:00:00Motion to Compel (Further Responses to Special Interrogatories)
Date: 2020-08-12T00:00:00Notice (of continued hearing)
Date: 2020-08-12T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses (to Form Interrogatories)
Date: 2020-08-12T00:00:00Notice (OF CONTINUANCE OF INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE)
Date: 2020-09-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application DEFENDANT BEHZAD LAHIJANI?S E...))
Date: 2020-08-25T00:00:00Notice (of Court Order)
Date: 2020-08-27T00:00:00Association of Attorney
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00Opposition (PLAINTIFF?S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT, BEHZAD LAHIJANI?S EX PARTE APPLICATION)
Date: 2020-08-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)) of 10/07/2020)
Date: 2020-10-07T00:00:00Notice (of Errata Re: Spelling of Plaintiff's Name and Date of Loss)
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)))
Date: 2020-10-07T00:00:00Opposition (Defendant Behzad Lahijani's opposition to compel written discovery responses)
Date: 2020-10-20T00:00:00Opposition ([PLAINTIFF?S] TO DEFENDANT, BEHZAD LAHIJANI?S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER)
Date: 2020-10-20T00:00:00Reply (brief in support of the motion for protective order)
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( ((1) Hearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted...))
Date: 2020-11-02T00:00:00Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil (FOURTH AMENDED)
Date: 2021-03-01T00:00:00Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)
Date: 2021-06-04T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (CONFIDENTIAL AND HIGHLY CONFIDENTIAL DESIGNATIONS)
Date: 2021-09-27T00:00:00Notice of Association of Counsel; Filed by: Chijoke John Major Osuji (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Lyft, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Status Conference re stipulated protective order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Chijoke John Major Osuji (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( ((1) Hearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-02T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial Filed by Behzad Lahijani (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-20T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Chijoke John Major Osuji (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-15T00:00:00Objection And Responses To Declaration Of Plaintiff; Filed by: Lyft, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Declaration DECLARATION OF JOHN CHIJIOKE OSUJI MAJOR; Filed by: Chijoke John Major Osuji (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by Thomas Steven Feher (Attorney)
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses Filed by Lyft, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-17T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Chijoke John Major Osuji (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-07-22T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by Alexander Joshua Zeesman (Attorney)
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Notice (of Court Order) Filed by Chijoke John Major Osuji (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Notice (of Results of Hearing at IDC) Filed by Chijoke John Major Osuji (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference Filed by Chijoke John Major Osuji (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-20T00:00:00Order (APPOINTING REFEREE) Filed by Lyft, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-20T00:00:00Motion to Transfer Filed by Chijoke John Major Osuji (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-20T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-07-22T00:00:00Answer Filed by Behzad Lahijani (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial Filed by Lyft, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-09-12T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Behzad Lahijani (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-10T00:00:00Association of Attorney Filed by Chijoke John Major Osuji (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00PI General Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-07-30T00:00:00Notice (OF TAKING INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE OFF CALENDAR) Filed by Lyft, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-13T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Lyft, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Motion to Compel (Further Responses to Special Interrogatories) Filed by Lyft, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-12T00:00:00Notice (of Vacating Ex Parte Application) Filed by Lyft, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION DEFENDANT BEHZAD LAHIJANI?S E...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-11T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses Filed by Chijoke John Major Osuji (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Chijoke John Major Osuji (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-07-22T00:00:00Notice (of continued hearing) Filed by Behzad Lahijani (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-12T00:00:00Answer Filed by Lyft, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-09-12T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses (to Form Interrogatories) Filed by Lyft, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-12T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Disassociation) Filed by Chijoke John Major Osuji (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-24T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application DEFENDANT LYFT, INC.?S EX PAR...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Lyft, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-30T00:00:00Notice (OF CONTINUANCE OF INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE) Filed by Lyft, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-09T00:00:00Objection (And Responses To Declaration Of Plaintiff) Filed by Lyft, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-10T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Chijoke John Major Osuji (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel McNeil, Tropp, & ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses LYFT,...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Order PLAINTIFF?S NOTICE OF MOTION AND ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-19T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Chijoke John Major Osuji (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-07-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-05-28T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by Chijoke John Major Osuji (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-05T00:00:00Motion for Protective Order Filed by Lyft, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel McNeil, Tropp, & ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-01T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Behzad Lahijani (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Lyft, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-17T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Behzad Lahijani (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-04T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)))
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)) of 11/04/2020)
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Notice (of Results of Hearing at 11/4/2020 IDC)
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Reply (DEFENDANT?S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF?S MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION OF DEFENDANT BEHZAD LAHIJANI)
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Memorandum (PLAINTIFF?S STATEMENT RE: APPOINTMENT OF DISCOVERY REFEREE, PER COURT ORDER)
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference
Date: 2020-11-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel PLAINTIFF?S NOTICE OF MOTION AND ...))
Date: 2020-11-20T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Motion for Protective Order
Date: 2020-12-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application DEFENDANT LYFT, INC.?S EX PAR...))
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Notice (of Vacating Ex Parte Application)
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Opposition (TO DEFENDANT, BEHZAD LAHIJANI?S COUNSEL?S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL)
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Order (APPOINTING REFEREE)
Date: 2020-12-17T00:00:00Reply (DEFENDANT?S REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF THE MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL)
Date: 2020-12-29T00:00:00Opposition (Defendant Behzad Lahijani's opposition to plaintiff's omnibus ex parte application)
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel McNeil, Tropp, & ...))
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 01/07/2021)
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Reply (DEFENDANT'S SUR-REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF THE MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL)
Date: 2021-01-15T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: 2021-01-15T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel McNeil, Tropp, & ...))
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION OF JOHN CHIJIOKE OSUJI MAJOR)
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Objection (And Responses To Declaration Of Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-10T00:00:00Order (RE: SHIFTING DISCOVERY REFEREE COSTS TO DEFENDANT LYFT, INC.)
Date: 2021-02-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Order PLAINTIFF?S NOTICE OF MOTION AND ...))
Date: 2021-02-19T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00Motion for Leave to Intervene
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Order (RE: MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL)
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel McNeil, Tropp, & ...))
Date: 2021-03-01T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION OF NICOLE C. BARILLA REGARDING COMPLIANCE WITH COURT?S ORDER)
Date: 2021-03-04T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2021-03-05T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-03-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses LYFT,...))
Date: 2021-03-19T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Disassociation)
Date: 2021-03-24T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-03-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Leave to Intervene STEADFAST INSURANCE ...))
Date: 2021-04-06T00:00:00Order (RE: PROPOSED INTERVENOR STEADFAST INSURANCE COMPANY?S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE)
Date: 2021-04-06T00:00:00Notice (Of Non-Opposition To Motion For Leave To Intervene)
Date: 2021-03-29T00:00:00Declaration (OF MICHAEL J. BARTLETT REGARDING COMPLIANCE WITH THE COURT?S APRIL 6, 2021 MINUTE ORDER)
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Notice (of Association of Counsel)
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Order (RE: DEFENDANT LYFT?S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES FROM PLAINTIFF)
Date: 2021-05-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses Defen...))
Date: 2021-05-04T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (Ex Parte Application To Advance Hearing Date Of Motion For Protective Order)
Date: 2021-05-28T00:00:00Motion for Protective Order
Date: 2021-05-28T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Informal Discovery Conference)
Date: 2021-06-29T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-07-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)))
Date: 2021-07-26T00:00:00NOTICE OF INTERVENOR STEADFAST INSURANCE COMPANY?S OBJECTION TO ENTRY OF DEFAULT OF BEHZAD LAHIJANI
Date: 2021-07-07T00:00:00Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion
Date: 2021-07-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery...))
Date: 2021-06-01T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-06-07T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Pleadings
Date: 2021-06-15T00:00:00Notice (OF TAKING INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE OFF CALENDAR)
Date: 2021-07-22T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Kevin S. Conlogue RE Compliance With The Court's June 1, 2021 Minute Order)
Date: 2021-06-07T00:00:00Motion for Protective Order
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Status Conference re stipulated protective order) of 08/31/2021)
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference re stipulated protective order))
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery...))
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Withdrawal of Motions)
Date: 2021-04-20T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Pleadings
Date: 2021-04-21T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-04-27T00:00:00Declaration (of Kevin S. Conlogue RE Compliance With The Court's April 27, 2021 Minute Order)
Date: 2021-04-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: sanctions for Defendant Behzad Lahija...))
Date: 2021-04-27T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-04-27T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2020-08-12T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2020-08-17T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: 2020-08-17T00:00:00Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Not Held - Vacated by Court Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Not Held - Vacated by Court Judge: Daniel M. Crowley |
|
February 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department 26, Elaine Lu, Presiding Jury Trial ((5-7 day est.)) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated Jury Trial ((5-7 day est.)) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated Judge: Elaine Lu |
|
February 14, 2022 | Hearing | ||
February 14, 2022 | Hearing |
Department 26 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Jury Trial |
|
January 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department 26, Elaine Lu, Presiding Final Status Conference ((JT )) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated Final Status Conference ((JT 02/14/2022)) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated Judge: Elaine Lu |
|
January 26, 2022 | Hearing | Final Status Conference | |
January 26, 2022 | Hearing |
Department 26 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Final Status Conference |
|
December 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Department 26, Elaine Lu, Presiding Hearing on Motion for Protective Order - Held - Advanced and Heard Hearing on Motion for Protective Order - Held - Advanced and Heard Judge: Elaine Lu |
|
December 02, 2021 | Hearing | Hearing on Motion for Protective Order | |
November 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Department 26, Elaine Lu, Presiding Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses (PLAINTIFF?S NOTICE OF MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES BY DEFENDANT TO PLAINTIFF?S FORM INTERROGATORIES (SET ONE) AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses (PLAINTIFF?S NOTICE OF MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES BY DEFENDANT TO PLAINTIFF?S FORM INTERROGATORIES (SET ONE) AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court Judge: Elaine Lu |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.