Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Paul Kysa, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case represented by Prainito Taylor, against Gilman An Individual Ana, Gilman Anna, Hagen Brian, Target Corporation, represented by Grant Samantha C., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Holly J. Fujie presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management201 days |
|
Filing DateJuly 17, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
This complaint is an amendment to a previous complaint filed in the Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles. The plaintiff initially designated the defendant by a fictitious name but has now discovered the true name of the defendant. The ...
Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: August 12, 2020Complaint
Date: July 17, 2019Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Target Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-27T00:00:00Notice of Continued Case Management Conference; Filed by: Kysa Paul (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-13T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer; Filed by: Target Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-19T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference and Continued Order to Show Cause; Filed by: Kysa Paul (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-03T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-09-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Target Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-02T00:00:00Notice of Continued Order to Show Cause Hearing; Filed by: Kysa Paul (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-09-10T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-07-22T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Kysa Paul (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Kysa Paul (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Kysa Paul (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-30T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Target Corporation, a Minnesota Corporation (Defendant); As to: Kysa Paul (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-09T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Show Cause Hearing; Filed by: Kysa Paul (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-14T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-11-21T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Target Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-07-22T00:00:00Declaration of Samantha C. Grant in Support; Filed by: Target Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-19T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-07-17T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference; Filed by: Target Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: July 17, 2019Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: July 17, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: July 17, 2019Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: July 22, 2019Complaint
Date: July 17, 2019Proof of Personal Service
Date: July 30, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING
Date: August 14, 2019Answer
Date: August 09, 2019Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: September 06, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING
Date: September 10, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND CONTINUED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: October 03, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)
Date: October 03, 2019Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: October 17, 2019Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer
Date: November 19, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION OF SAMANTHA C. GRANT IN SUPPORT
Date: November 19, 2019Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: November 21, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: December 02, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: January 17, 2020Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: January 17, 2020Separate Statement
Date: January 21, 2020Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: January 21, 2020Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: January 21, 2020Reply - REPLY BRIEF FOR MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF’S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: January 27, 2020Request for Judicial Notice
Date: January 27, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO STRIKE (NOT ANTI-SLAPP) - WITHOUT DEMURR...)
Date: February 03, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))
Date: February 10, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: February 11, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: February 27, 2020Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: August 12, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF PLAINTIFF'S EX-PARTE APPLICATION
Date: September 23, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER SETTING AN INFOR...)
Date: September 24, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: September 30, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 09/30/2020
Date: September 30, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))
Date: November 03, 2020Informal Discovery Conference
Date: November 03, 2020Request for Dismissal
Date: January 15, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)
Date: January 27, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: February 17, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: March 08, 2021Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-07-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 09/30/2020)
Date: 2020-09-30T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-07-17T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2019-07-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-09-30T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-12-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)))
Date: 2020-02-10T00:00:00Amended Complaint
Date: 2019-10-16T00:00:00Amended Complaint (1st)
Date: 2019-10-16T00:00:00Notice (of Continued Case Management Conference)
Date: 2020-01-13T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: 2019-07-22T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-08-09T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00Notice (of Withdrawal of Plaintiff's Ex-Parte Application)
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-07-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service))
Date: 2019-10-03T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer
Date: 2019-11-19T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-07-30T00:00:00Notice (of Case Management Conference and Continued Order to Show Cause)
Date: 2019-10-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-02-11T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2019-09-06T00:00:00Reply (BRIEF FOR MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF?S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT)
Date: 2020-01-27T00:00:00Notice (of Continued Order to Show Cause Hearing)
Date: 2019-09-10T00:00:00Notice (of Case Management Conference and Order to Show Cause Hearing)
Date: 2019-08-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an Order Setting an Infor...))
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Notice (of Continued Case Management Conference and Continued Order to Show Cause Hearing)
Date: 2019-10-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2019-11-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurr...))
Date: 2020-02-03T00:00:00Declaration (of Samantha C. Grant in Support)
Date: 2019-11-19T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2020-01-27T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendant's Motion to Strike Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.