Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Schneider Michele Marie, filed a(n) Intentional Torts - Torts case represented by Clancy Robert Andrew, against Fierro Irene Gutierrez, Fierro Rudy, represented by Aslanian Grigor, Trivino-Perez Wilfredo, Russakow Mark, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Jon R. Takasugi presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJon R. Takasugi Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 15, 2019 |
CategoryIntentional Bodily Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (E.G., Assault, Battery, Vandalism, Etc.) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeIntentional Torts |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Michele Marie Schneider (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Rudy Fierro (Defendant); As to: Michele Marie Schneider (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-29T00:00:00Declaration Declaration of Reasonable Diligence; Filed by: Michele Marie Schneider (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-27T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel; Filed by: Attorney; As to: Rudy Fierro (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-22T00:00:00Notice of Ruling After Hearing; Filed by: Michele Marie Schneider (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-16T00:00:00Notice OF HEARING; Filed by: Michele Marie Schneider (Plaintiff); As to: Rudy Fierro (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Declaration In Support of Default; Filed by: Michele Marie Schneider (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-20T00:00:00Summary of the Case; Filed by: Michele Marie Schneider (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-04T00:00:00Request for Court Judgment; Filed by: Michele Marie Schneider (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-03T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: DENYING REQUEST FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-12-22T00:00:00On the Complaint filed by Michele Marie Schneider on , Default entered on , Vacated - .
Date: 2021-04-14T00:00:00Summary of the Case; Filed by: Michele Marie Schneider (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-20T00:00:00Declaration In Support of Default; Filed by: Michele Marie Schneider (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-04T00:00:00Default entered as to Irene Gutierrez Fierro; On the Complaint filed by Michele Marie Schneider on
Date: 2021-12-20T00:00:00Summary of the Case; Filed by: Michele Marie Schneider (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-03T00:00:00Declaration In Support of Default; Filed by: Michele Marie Schneider (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-03T00:00:00Request For dismissal; Filed by: Michele Marie Schneider (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-04T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: July 15, 2019Complaint
Date: July 15, 2019PI General Order
Date: July 22, 2019Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: August 09, 2019Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: August 14, 2019Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: October 31, 2019Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: December 10, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF REASONABLE DILIGENCE
Date: December 27, 2019Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: January 02, 2020Answer
Date: January 29, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO SHORTEN TIME TO FILE MOTIO...)
Date: December 01, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: December 10, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION FOR DISCOVERY SANCTIONS
Date: December 10, 2020Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion
Date: December 10, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: December 14, 2020Objection - OBJECTION OBJECTION TO CURRENT ATTORNEY'S WITHDRAWAL FROM REPRESENTATION
Date: December 17, 2020Reply - REPLY MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL
Date: December 18, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: December 22, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL BY DEFENDANT COUN...)
Date: December 22, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE DARK COURT AND RESCHEDULING MOTION HEARINGS.)
Date: February 02, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: February 02, 2021Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 02/02/2021
Date: February 02, 2021Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL AND SANCTIONS
Date: March 01, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: March 02, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: March 02, 2021Reply - REPLY FOR DISCOVERY SANCTIONS
Date: March 08, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: March 08, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: March 16, 2021Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING AFTER HEARING
Date: March 16, 2021Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: March 22, 2021Substitution of Attorney
Date: April 12, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL
Date: April 12, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: June 02, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)
Date: June 14, 2021Request - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL
Date: October 04, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT
Date: October 04, 2021Summary of the Case
Date: October 04, 2021Minute Order - (AMENDED)
Date: October 15, 2021Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: December 20, 2021Summary of the Case
Date: December 20, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT
Date: December 20, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: DENYING REQUEST FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT)
Date: December 22, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT
Date: January 03, 2022Request - REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT
Date: January 03, 2022Summary of the Case
Date: January 03, 2022Judgment
Date: January 05, 2022Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims
Date: January 12, 2022Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-07-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-07-15T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2019-07-15T00:00:00PI General Order
Date: 2019-07-22T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-08-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates)
Date: 2019-07-22T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2019-08-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application TO SHORTEN TIME TO FILE MOTIO...))
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (TO SHORTEN TIME TO FILE MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL)
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-01-29T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: 2020-01-02T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Objection (OBJECTION TO CURRENT ATTORNEY'S WITHDRAWAL FROM REPRESENTATION)
Date: 2020-12-17T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-03-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel By Defendant Coun...))
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Notice (of Continuance of Hearing on Motion for Sanctions)
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Reply (RESPONSIVE REPLY TO MOVANT'S REPLY)
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Declaration (by Mr. Rudy Fierro as Objector in Opposition to Attorney Perez's Withdrawal)
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-03-08T00:00:00Reply (MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL)
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition to Motion to Compel and Sanctions)
Date: 2021-03-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Dark Court and Rescheduling Motion Hearings.))
Date: 2021-02-02T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (After Hearing)
Date: 2021-03-16T00:00:00Notice (Re Continuance of Trial Setting Conference)
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-02-02T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore ((Estrella Herman #13865))
Date: 2021-03-16T00:00:00Reply (For Discovery Sanctions)
Date: 2021-03-08T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 02/02/2021)
Date: 2021-02-02T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Dark Court and Rescheduling Motion Hearings.) of 02/02/2021)
Date: 2021-02-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Sanctions; Trial Setting Conference))
Date: 2021-03-16T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (Re Motion to be Relieved as Counsel of Record)
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel
Date: 2021-03-22T00:00:00Request (For dismissal)
Date: 2021-10-04T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-06-02T00:00:00Notice (of Association of Counsel)
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion - Other MOTION T BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL; Tr...))
Date: 2021-04-14T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00Summary of the Case
Date: 2021-10-04T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: 2021-03-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE))
Date: 2021-06-14T00:00:00Declaration (In Support of Default)
Date: 2021-10-04T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2021-06-02T00:00:00Notice (OF HEARING)
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2019-12-10T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Reasonable Diligence)
Date: 2019-12-27T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2019-10-31T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-07-22T00:00:00Reply RESPONSIVE REPLY TO MOVANT'S REPLY; Filed by: Rudy Fierro (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Default entered as to Irene Gutierrez Fierro; On the Complaint filed by Michele Marie Schneider on
Date: 2019-12-10T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Rudy Fierro (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00PI General Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-07-22T00:00:00Reply For Discovery Sanctions; Filed by: Michele Marie Schneider (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-08T00:00:00Notice of Association of Counsel; Filed by: Rudy Fierro (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00Declaration For Discovery Sanctions; Filed by: Michele Marie Schneider (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-07-15T00:00:00Opposition Opposition to Motion to Compel and Sanctions; Filed by: Rudy Fierro (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-01T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Michele Marie Schneider (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-09T00:00:00Default entered as to Rudy Fierro; On the Complaint filed by Michele Marie Schneider on
Date: 2019-12-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-02-02T00:00:00Reply MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL; Filed by: Rudy Fierro (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.