Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Hoeft Lori, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Tooson Jamal, Witzer Brian David, against E&S Management Ring Corp, Marina Pacific Associates, Water'S Edge At Marina Harbor, represented by Alderman Daniel S., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Stephen I. Goorvitch presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 08, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Motion to Continue Trial Date; Filed by: LORI HOEFT (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-12-12T00:00:00Reply to Opposition; Filed by: LORI HOEFT (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-06-28T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: LORI HOEFT (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-05-26T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: LORI HOEFT (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-12-06T00:00:00Declaration Declaration of CTA; Filed by: LORI HOEFT (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-05-26T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel; Filed by: Attorney; As to: LORI HOEFT (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-07-18T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel; Filed by: Attorney; As to: LORI HOEFT (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-07-19T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: LORI HOEFT (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-08-04T00:00:00Notice of Settlement; Filed by: LORI HOEFT (Plaintiff); Vacate Future Dates: No
Date: 2023-09-13T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: LORI HOEFT (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-08-01T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: July 08, 2019Complaint
Date: July 08, 2019Notice of Ruling
Date: January 13, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR ORDER TO REOPEN DISCOVERY)
Date: January 13, 2021Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: November 03, 2021Separate Statement
Date: November 03, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF DEFENDANTS' APPENDIX OF EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF MSJ
Date: November 03, 2021Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing
Date: November 23, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE AND AL...)
Date: December 28, 2021Separate Statement
Date: April 21, 2022Reply - REPLY DEFENDANTS' REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO NOT
Date: April 28, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE RESCHEDULE HEARING)
Date: May 04, 2022Notice of Continuance
Date: May 04, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT)
Date: May 20, 2022Notice of Ruling
Date: May 20, 2022Substitution of Attorney
Date: October 31, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: October 31, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR CONTINUANCE OF MOTION FOR...)
Date: November 01, 2022Notice of Lien
Date: November 04, 2022Notice - NOTICE OF ATTORNEY'S CHARGING LIEN
Date: December 01, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: December 06, 2022Response - RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Date: December 12, 2022Motion to Continue Trial Date
Date: December 12, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME TO ...)
Date: December 13, 2022Notice of Ruling
Date: December 14, 2022Notice - NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Date: December 16, 2022Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION PROTECTIVE ORDER
Date: May 08, 2023Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2020-05-15T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2019-07-08T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates)
Date: 2019-07-16T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel
Date: 2020-05-15T00:00:00Opposition (to Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial)
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application TO CONTINUE FSC, TRIAL AND RE...))
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2020-08-27T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2019-08-20T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (TO CONTINUE FSC, TRIAL AND RELATED DATES)
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Motion for Order (to Reopen Discovery)
Date: 2020-12-17T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Order TO Reopen Discovery))
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to Continue Trial Date and All Trial Related Dates and Deadlines)
Date: 2021-12-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re Reschedule Hearing) of )
Date: 2022-05-04T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Reopen Discovery)
Date: 2020-12-30T00:00:00Objection (Defendants Evidentiary Objections to Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2022-04-28T00:00:00Reply (Defendants' Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Not)
Date: 2022-04-28T00:00:00Notice of Rejection of Electronic Filing
Date: 2021-11-23T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-11-03T00:00:00Notice (of Defendants' Appendix of Evidence in Support of MSJ)
Date: 2021-11-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re Reschedule Hearing))
Date: 2022-05-04T00:00:00Reply (to Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Reopen Discovery)
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2022-04-21T00:00:00Objection (Plaintiff's Objection to Defendants' Evidence in Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2022-04-21T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-07-08T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates)
Date: 2019-07-16T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2020-01-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 05/15/2020)
Date: 2020-05-15T00:00:00Reply (to Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Reopen Discovery)
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Opposition (to Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial)
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Order TO Reopen Discovery))
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application TO CONTINUE FSC, TRIAL AND RE...))
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE RE: HEARING DATE SCHEDULED ON PLAINTIFF COUNSEL'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL)
Date: 2020-05-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel))
Date: 2020-09-02T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Reopen Discovery)
Date: 2020-12-30T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (TO CONTINUE FSC, TRIAL AND RELATED DATES)
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Motion for Order (to Reopen Discovery)
Date: 2020-12-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-05-15T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to Continue Trial Date and All Trial Related Dates and Deadlines)
Date: 2021-12-27T00:00:00Notice (of Defendants' Appendix of Evidence in Support of MSJ)
Date: 2021-11-03T00:00:00PI General Order
Date: 2019-07-16T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-07-08T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-10-18T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-05-15T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2019-08-19T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: 2020-05-15T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-07-08T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-05-20T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: LORI HOEFT (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-12-14T00:00:00Notice Of Attorney's Charging Lien; Filed by: Law Offices of Brian D. Witzer (Non-Party)
Date: 2022-12-01T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: LORI HOEFT (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-31T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: LORI HOEFT (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-21T00:00:00PI General Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-07-16T00:00:00Notice of Lien; Filed by: Law Offices of Brian D. Witzer (Non-Party)
Date: 2022-11-04T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: LORI HOEFT (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-05-31T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order re Reschedule Hearing) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-05-04T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-05-15T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: LORI HOEFT (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-27T00:00:00Opposition to Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial; Filed by: LORI HOEFT (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-07-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-05-15T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2020-01-02T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-07-08T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE RE: HEARING DATE SCHEDULED ON PLAINTIFF COUNSEL'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL)
Date: 2020-05-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel))
Date: 2020-09-02T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2021-11-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial Date and Al...))
Date: 2021-12-28T00:00:00Notice of Continuance
Date: 2022-05-04T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.