Case Last Refreshed: 1 day ago
Ranger Brian, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Krissman Jarod Adam, against Alamitos Bay Yacht Club, represented by Fedeli Thomas M., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Superior with Jon R. Takasugi presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management170 days |
|
Filing DateJuly 01, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedMay 01, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions130 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Order By the Court transferring this matter to IC Court as Complicated PI; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-11-08T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-06-10T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: Brian Ranger (Plaintiff); As to: Alamitos Bay Yacht Club (Defendant)
Date: 2019-07-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Alamitos Bay Yacht Club (Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-02T00:00:00Amended Complaint; Filed by: Brian Ranger (Plaintiff); As to: Alamitos Bay Yacht Club (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-13T00:00:00Request for Refund / Order; Filed by: Alamitos Bay Yacht Club (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-19T00:00:00Appeal - Clerk's Transcript Fee Paid appellant paid $383.19; Filed by:
Date: 2021-11-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Brian Ranger (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Alamitos Bay Yacht Club (Defendant)
Date: 2019-10-01T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by: Alamitos Bay Yacht Club (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Reply Defendant's Reply to Pltf's Opposition to Demurrer; Filed by: Alamitos Bay Yacht Club (Defendant)
Date: 2020-05-13T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Brian Ranger (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-23T00:00:00Tentative Ruling and Final Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-07-16T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone; Filed by: Alamitos Bay Yacht Club (Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-02T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Alamitos Bay Yacht Club (Defendant)
Date: 2019-10-01T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-09-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-13T00:00:00Reply Reply to Opposition to Demurrer; Filed by: Alamitos Bay Yacht Club (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-03T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Alamitos Bay Yacht Club (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Brian Ranger (Plaintiff); As to: Alamitos Bay Yacht Club (Defendant)
Date: 2019-07-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00PI General Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-07-10T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Default Issued (respondent) for Notice of Appeal, filed ; B315302; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-11-10T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Brian Ranger (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-04-07T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Brian Ranger (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-07-11T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-07-16T00:00:00Amended Complaint; Filed by: Brian Ranger (Plaintiff); As to: Alamitos Bay Yacht Club (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-11-08T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by: Brian Ranger (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-02T00:00:00Appeal - Reporter Appeal Transcripts Deposit Paid; Filed by:
Date: 2021-11-04T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-; Filed by: Alamitos Bay Yacht Club (Respondent)
Date: 2021-09-28T00:00:00Amended Complaint First; Filed by: Brian Ranger (Plaintiff); As to: Alamitos Bay Yacht Club (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-27T00:00:00Notice OF JUDGMENT; Filed by: Alamitos Bay Yacht Club (Defendant); As to: Brian Ranger (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-22T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-; Filed by: Brian Ranger (Appellant)
Date: 2021-09-21T00:00:00Amended Complaint (3rd); Filed by: Brian Ranger (Plaintiff); As to: Alamitos Bay Yacht Club (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Appeal - Reporter Appeal Transcript Process Fee Paid; Filed by: Brian Ranger (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-04T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Alamitos Bay Yacht Club (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-21T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-07-01T00:00:00Declaration In Support of Defendant Demurrer; Filed by: Alamitos Bay Yacht Club (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-31T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by: Alamitos Bay Yacht Club (Defendant)
Date: 2019-10-01T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Brian Ranger (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-07-11T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Brian Ranger (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-07-01T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Brian Ranger (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-07-01T00:00:00Amended Complaint (1st) Filed by Brian Ranger (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Brian Ranger (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Declaration of Thomas M. Fedeli ISO Defendant's Reply Filed by Alamitos Bay Yacht Club (Defendant)
Date: 2020-05-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-10T00:00:00Defendant's Reply to Pltf's Opposition to Demurrer Filed by Alamitos Bay Yacht Club (Defendant)
Date: 2020-05-13T00:00:00Summons (on Amended Complaint (1st)) Filed by Brian Ranger (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-13T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (3rd)) Filed by Brian Ranger (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone Filed by Alamitos Bay Yacht Club (Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-02T00:00:00Notice of Ruling re Hearing on Demurrer without Motion to Strike Filed by Brian Ranger (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Brian Ranger (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-04-07T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (2nd)) Filed by Brian Ranger (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Reply to Opposition to Demurrer Filed by Alamitos Bay Yacht Club (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-03T00:00:00Notice of Ruling re Court Order CMC Filed by Brian Ranger (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-15T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed Filed by Brian Ranger (Appellant)
Date: 2021-09-15T00:00:00Appeal - Reporter Appeal Transcript Process Fee Paid Filed by Brian Ranger (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-04T00:00:00[Proposed] Judgment Filed by Alamitos Bay Yacht Club (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-22T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP- Filed by Brian Ranger (Appellant)
Date: 2021-09-21T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Default Issued ((respondent) for Notice of Appeal, filed ; B315302) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-11-10T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-17T00:00:00Notice (OF JUDGMENT) Filed by Alamitos Bay Yacht Club (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-22T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Alamitos Bay Yacht Club (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-21T00:00:00Appeal Record Delivered Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-14T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP- Filed by Alamitos Bay Yacht Club (Respondent)
Date: 2021-09-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-16T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Brian Ranger (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-07-01T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Alamitos Bay Yacht Club (Defendant)
Date: 2019-10-01T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet (Addendum) Filed by Brian Ranger (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-07-01T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Brian Ranger (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-07-10T00:00:00PI General Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-07-10T00:00:00Summons (First Amended) Filed by Brian Ranger (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-13T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-07-01T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by Alamitos Bay Yacht Club (Defendant)
Date: 2019-10-01T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt Filed by Brian Ranger (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-09-03T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike Filed by Alamitos Bay Yacht Club (Defendant)
Date: 2019-10-01T00:00:00Amended Complaint Filed by Brian Ranger (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-11-08T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Brian Ranger (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-23T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by Alamitos Bay Yacht Club (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Request for Refund / Order Filed by Alamitos Bay Yacht Club (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-11-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Alamitos Bay Yacht Club (Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-02T00:00:00Order (By the Court transferring this matter to IC Court as Complicated PI) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-11-08T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial Filed by Brian Ranger (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-02T00:00:00Declaration (In Support of Defendant Demurrer) Filed by Alamitos Bay Yacht Club (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-13T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike Filed by Alamitos Bay Yacht Club (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2020-07-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Objection to Request for Judicial Notice w-POS
Date: 2019-11-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2020-03-17T00:00:00Defendant's Reply to Pltf's Opposition to Demurrer
Date: 2020-05-13T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet (Addendum)
Date: 2019-07-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order] and Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates)
Date: 2019-07-10T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone
Date: 2019-12-02T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2019-12-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-12-02T00:00:00Amended Complaint
Date: 2019-08-13T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2019-10-01T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Thomas M. Fedeli ISO Defendant Alamitos Bay Yacht Club's Demurrer)
Date: 2019-10-01T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2019-10-01T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-07-01T00:00:00Notice of Ruling re Hearing on Demurrer without Motion to Strike
Date: 2019-11-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-07-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-07-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-03-17T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: 2019-09-03T00:00:00Request for Refund / Order
Date: 2019-11-19T00:00:00PI General Order
Date: 2019-07-10T00:00:00Reply (Defendant's Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Demurrer w-POS)
Date: 2019-11-01T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-04-07T00:00:00Amended Complaint (1st)
Date: 2019-08-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-03-27T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2019-07-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Defendant's Response to Pltf's Objection to Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2020-05-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike) of )
Date: 2019-11-08T00:00:00Declaration of Thomas M. Fedeli ISO Defendant's Reply
Date: 2020-05-13T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2019-10-01T00:00:00Objection (Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Objection to Request for Judicial Notice w-POS)
Date: 2019-11-01T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Thomas M. Fedeli ISO Defendant's Reply to Demurrer Opposition w-POS)
Date: 2019-11-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Declaration of Thomas M. Fedeli ISO Defendant's Reply to Demurrer Opposition w-POS
Date: 2019-11-01T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-07-21T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (3rd))
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (2nd))
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of )
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00[Proposed] Judgment
Date: 2021-07-22T00:00:00Appeal - Reporter Appeal Transcript Process Fee Paid
Date: 2021-11-04T00:00:00Declaration (In Support of Defendant Demurrer)
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Appeal - Original Clerk's Transcript 2 Volumes Certified; for Notice of Appeal, filed ; B315302
Date: 2022-01-12T00:00:00Notice (OF JUDGMENT)
Date: 2021-07-22T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Default Issued ((respondent) for Notice of Appeal, filed ; B315302)
Date: 2021-11-10T00:00:00Summons (on Amended Complaint (1st))
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed
Date: 2021-09-15T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-10-23T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore ((Alexander Joko, CSR: 12272))
Date: 2020-10-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike))
Date: 2021-06-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike))
Date: 2020-10-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2021-07-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike) of )
Date: 2021-06-10T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Reply (DEFENDANTS REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER)
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00Reply to Opposition to Demurrer
Date: 2021-06-03T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-
Date: 2021-09-21T00:00:00Appeal Record Delivered
Date: 2022-01-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of )
Date: 2021-07-16T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal
Date: 2021-09-17T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Fees Due for Clerk's Transcript on Appeal (for Notice of Appeal, filed ; B315302)
Date: 2021-11-16T00:00:00Appeal - Notice Court Reporter to Prepare Appeal Transcript (for Notice of Appeal, filed ; B315302)
Date: 2021-11-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike))
Date: 2021-07-15T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-
Date: 2021-09-28T00:00:00Order (By the Court transferring this matter to IC Court as Complicated PI)
Date: 2019-11-08T00:00:00Defendant's Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Demurrer w-POS
Date: 2019-11-01T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-07-01T00:00:00Notice of Ruling re Court Order CMC
Date: 2019-11-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2020-03-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike))
Date: 2019-11-08T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-07-10T00:00:00Summons (First Amended)
Date: 2019-08-13T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2019-07-01T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet (Addendum)
Date: 2019-07-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order] and Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates)
Date: 2019-07-10T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-07-01T00:00:00Amended Complaint (1st)
Date: 2019-08-13T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Thomas M. Fedeli ISO Defendant Alamitos Bay Yacht Club's Demurrer)
Date: 2019-10-01T00:00:00Summons (First Amended)
Date: 2019-08-13T00:00:00Order (By the Court transferring this matter to IC Court as Complicated PI)
Date: 2019-11-08T00:00:00Reply (Defendant's Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Demurrer w-POS)
Date: 2019-11-01T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Thomas M. Fedeli ISO Defendant's Reply to Demurrer Opposition w-POS)
Date: 2019-11-01T00:00:00Objection (Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Objection to Request for Judicial Notice w-POS)
Date: 2019-11-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 11/12/2019)
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike))
Date: 2019-11-08T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike) of 11/08/2019)
Date: 2019-11-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-03-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 03/17/2020)
Date: 2020-03-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-03-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 03/27/2020)
Date: 2020-03-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 07/13/2020)
Date: 2020-07-13T00:00:00Declaration (In Support of Defendant Demurrer)
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (3rd))
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike))
Date: 2020-10-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike) of 06/10/2021)
Date: 2021-06-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike))
Date: 2021-06-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-07-13T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore ((Alexander Joko, CSR: 12272))
Date: 2020-10-20T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (2nd))
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 10/22/2020)
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Summons (on Amended Complaint (1st))
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00[Proposed] Judgment
Date: 2021-07-22T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103
Date: 2021-09-21T00:00:00Appeal - Original Clerk's Transcript 2 Volumes Certified; for Notice of Appeal, filed 9/15/21; B315302
Date: 2022-01-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 07/16/2021)
Date: 2021-07-16T00:00:00Notice (OF JUDGMENT)
Date: 2021-07-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike))
Date: 2021-07-15T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Default Issued ((respondent) for Notice of Appeal, filed 9/15/21; B315302)
Date: 2021-11-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2021-07-16T00:00:00Reply (DEFENDANTS REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER)
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103
Date: 2021-09-28T00:00:00Tentative Ruling and Final Order
Date: 2021-07-16T00:00:00Response (Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Objection to Request for Judicial Notice w-POS)
Date: 2019-11-01T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Ruling re Court Order CMC)
Date: 2019-11-18T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Ruling re Hearing on Demurrer without Motion to Strike)
Date: 2019-11-18T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Thomas M. Fedeli ISO Defendant's Reply)
Date: 2020-05-13T00:00:00Response (Defendant's Response to Pltf's Objection to Request for Judicial Notice)
Date: 2020-05-13T00:00:00Reply (Defendant's Reply to Pltf's Opposition to Demurrer)
Date: 2020-05-13T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.