Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
KENNETH B CLAY VS FARSHID TAKAPOOY, ET AL.
On June 28, 2019 a motor vehicle - personal injury/property damage/wrongful death (general jurisdiction) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. Judge Jon R. Takasugi presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
June 28, 2019
Last Refreshed
February 20, 2021
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Filing Court House
Spring Street Courthouse
Category
Motor Vehicle - Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Automobile
Case Outcome Type
Unknown disposition
Status
Voluntary Dismissal
Case Duration
9 months and 4 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal Filed by Kenneth B Clay (Plaintiff) |
|
July 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order] and Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearings Dates) Filed by Clerk |
|
July 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
PI General Order Filed by Clerk |
|
July 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Kenneth B Clay (Plaintiff) |
|
June 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed by Kenneth B Clay (Plaintiff) |
|
June 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk |
|
June 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Kenneth B Clay (Plaintiff) |
|