Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
D'Carpio Domenico, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Pang Natalie S., Ruf Kevin F., against Seldat Distribution Inc., Seldat Inc., represented by Aron Simon, Kaufman Aryeh, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Richard J. Burdge Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRichard J. Burdge Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management210 days |
Filing DateJune 28, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Donenuci D'Carpio (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-28T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel; Filed by: Attorney; As to: Seldat, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-20T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Domenico D'Carpio (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-03-17T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Domenico D'Carpio (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-03-17T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel; Filed by: Attorney; As to: Seldat Distribution, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-20T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone; Filed by: Domenico D'Carpio (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Court Order Re Non-Complex Determination;) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-07-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Seldat, Inc. (Defendant); Seldat Distribution, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Domenico D'Carpio (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-09T00:00:00Declaration of Kevin F. Ruf; Filed by: Domenico D'Carpio (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Domenico D'Carpio (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-01T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Domenico D'Carpio (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-08T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-08-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-06-08T00:00:00Motion for Leave to Amend the Complaint; Filed by: Domenico D'Carpio (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-03T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-11T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-07-16T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Domenico D'Carpio (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-03T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-27T00:00:00; On the Amended Complaint (1st) filed by Domenico D'Carpio on
Date: 2020-04-10T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Donenuci D'Carpio (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-29T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-06-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Non-Complex Determination;)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-07-09T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Domenico D'Carpio (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-21T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Domenico D'Carpio (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-29T00:00:00Appendix of Evidence; Filed by: Domenico D'Carpio (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-08T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-23T00:00:00Updated -- Order Proposed: Filed By: Domenico D'Carpio (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date:
Date: 2020-07-29T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Donenuci D'Carpio (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-28T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-04-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Domenico D'Carpio (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00On the Amended Complaint (1st) filed by Domenico D'Carpio on , Default entered on , Vacated - .
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Domenico D'Carpio (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-08T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-05-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-05-26T00:00:00Complaint ( (1st)) Filed by Domenico D'Carpio (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-28T00:00:00Case Management Order; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone; Filed by: Domenico D'Carpio (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Donenuci D'Carpio (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-07-11T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-23T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) Filed by Donenuci D'Carpio (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-07-30T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by Domenico D'Carpio (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-03-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-12-24T00:00:00Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) Filed by Domenico D'Carpio (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-04-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-06-08T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Reassignment to an Independent Calendar Court)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-07-12T00:00:00Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil Filed by Simon Aron (Attorney)
Date: 2019-12-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-12-23T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone Filed by Domenico D'Carpio (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Domenico D'Carpio (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-19T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-08-19T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel Filed by Simon Aron (Attorney)
Date: 2019-11-20T00:00:00Answer Filed by Seldat, Inc. (Defendant); Seldat Distribution, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-30T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-27T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Domenico D'Carpio (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-10T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by Domenico D'Carpio (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Request for Peremptory Disqualification by Pl...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-08-13T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-07-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Declaration (of Kevin F. Ruf) Filed by Domenico D'Carpio (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-03T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by Donenuci D'Carpio (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-07-11T00:00:00Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) Filed by Domenico D'Carpio (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-03-30T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-14T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel Filed by Aryeh Kaufman (Attorney)
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-11T00:00:00Appendix of Evidence Filed by Domenico D'Carpio (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Defendants have retained new counsel ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-29T00:00:00Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-06-28T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: Donenuci D'Carpio (Plaintiff); As to: Seldat, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-06-28T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone; Filed by: Domenico D'Carpio (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Domenico D'Carpio (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-11T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Domenico D'Carpio (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-26T00:00:00Complaint ( (1st))
Date: 2019-06-28T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-06-28T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-06-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Non-Complex Determination;))
Date: 2019-07-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Reassignment to an Independent Calendar Court))
Date: 2019-07-12T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-07-11T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2019-10-22T00:00:00Stipulation - No Order (Stipulation to file first amended complaint)
Date: 2019-10-22T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2019-07-30T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2019-07-11T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2019-08-19T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2019-07-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order Re Non-Complex Determination;) of 07/09/2019)
Date: 2019-07-09T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-08-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Request for Peremptory Disqualification by Pl...))
Date: 2019-08-13T00:00:00Amended Complaint (1st)
Date: 2019-10-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 03/19/2020)
Date: 2020-03-19T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2020-03-17T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone
Date: 2020-01-13T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (Regarding Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel)
Date: 2020-01-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-01-09T00:00:00Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: 2019-12-23T00:00:00Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: 2019-12-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: 2020-03-27T00:00:00Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)
Date: 2020-03-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-03-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel))
Date: 2019-12-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-03-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel))
Date: 2019-12-23T00:00:00Answer (To Second Amended Complaint)
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-04-23T00:00:00Order (Proposed)
Date: 2020-07-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-08-11T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-07-01T00:00:00Motion for Leave to Amend (the Complaint)
Date: 2020-06-03T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 06/08/2020)
Date: 2020-06-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of ...))
Date: 2020-07-16T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Proof of Service - Order Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-06-08T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2020-06-03T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Stipulation and Proposed Order Regarding Motion for Leave to Amend)
Date: 2020-08-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/23/2020)
Date: 2020-04-23T00:00:00Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)
Date: 2020-06-09T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-06-26T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 08/11/2020)
Date: 2020-08-11T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (2nd))
Date: 2020-08-18T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2021-03-08T00:00:00Declaration (of Kevin F. Ruf)
Date: 2020-06-03T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2021-03-08T00:00:00Notice (OF APPEARANCE OF ARYEH KAUFMAN, ESQ. ON BEHALF OF SELDAT, INC. AND SELDAT DISTRIBUTION, INC.)
Date: 2020-07-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default Judgment))
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default Judgment)])
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-07-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-07-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 07/29/2020)
Date: 2020-07-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-07-29T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone
Date: 2020-07-09T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Re: Plaintiff's Proposed Second Amended Complaint)
Date: 2020-07-27T00:00:00Case Management Order
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel))
Date: 2021-03-09T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2021-06-21T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: 2021-04-14T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2021-04-29T00:00:00Order ([Proposed] Order Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel)
Date: 2021-03-09T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-04-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an Order Continuing Heari...))
Date: 2021-07-09T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: 2021-05-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Defendants have retained new counsel ...))
Date: 2021-03-24T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-03-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-05-26T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-03-08T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (for an Order Continuing Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00Order ([Proposed] Order Granting Ex Parte Application)
Date: 2021-07-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 03/10/2021)
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Appendix of Evidence
Date: 2021-03-08T00:00:00Brief (Plaintiff's Case Summary in Support of Request for Entry of Default Judgment by Court)
Date: 2021-06-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 05/26/2021)
Date: 2021-05-26T00:00:00Complaint
Date: June 28, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Domenico D'Carpio (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-26T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Donenuci D'Carpio (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-22T00:00:00Amended Complaint (1st) Filed by Donenuci D'Carpio (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-22T00:00:00Order (Proposed) Filed by Domenico D'Carpio (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-27T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone Filed by Domenico D'Carpio (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-13T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Domenico D'Carpio (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-08T00:00:00Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil Filed by Simon Aron (Attorney)
Date: 2019-12-23T00:00:00Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) Filed by Domenico D'Carpio (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Domenico D'Carpio (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-03-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-06-08T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by Domenico D'Carpio (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-04-10T00:00:00Motion for Leave to Amend (the Complaint) Filed by Domenico D'Carpio (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-03T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order Re Non-Complex Determination;) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-07-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default Judgment)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by Domenico D'Carpio (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Domenico D'Carpio (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Regarding Plaintiff's Application for Default Jud...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an Order Continuing Heari...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-26T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Domenico D'Carpio (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Domenico D'Carpio (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment Filed by Domenico D'Carpio (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-08T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by Domenico D'Carpio (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-29T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by Domenico D'Carpio (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-08T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Domenico D'Carpio (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-09T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Domenico D'Carpio (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-08T00:00:00Order ([Proposed] Order Granting Ex Parte Application) Filed by Domenico D'Carpio (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-09T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (2nd)) Filed by Domenico D'Carpio (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-18T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-05T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by Domenico D'Carpio (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-21T00:00:00Case Management Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Seldat, Inc. (Defendant); Seldat Distribution, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone Filed by Domenico D'Carpio (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by Domenico D'Carpio (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: 2019-11-20T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel
Date: 2019-11-20T00:00:00Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)
Date: 2020-04-10T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2020-04-10T00:00:00Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department 37 Jury Trial ((3 days)) - Not Held - Vacated by Court Jury Trial ((3 days)) - Not Held - Vacated by Court |
|
May 03, 2022 | Hearing |
Department 37 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Jury Trial |
|
May 03, 2022 | Hearing | ||
April 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department 37 Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court |
|
April 26, 2022 | Hearing |
Department 37 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Final Status Conference |
|
April 26, 2022 | Hearing | Final Status Conference | |
December 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Department 37 Post-Mediation Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court Post-Mediation Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court |
|
December 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Department 37 Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Vacated by Court Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Vacated by Court |
|
December 30, 2021 | Hearing |
Department 37 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Post-Mediation Status Conference |
|
December 30, 2021 | Hearing |
Department 37 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.