Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Estrada Irma, Estrada Irma An Individual, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Matusek Henry John Ii, O'Neil Thomas, against Allison Kimberlee, Allison Kimberlee An Individual, represented by Kim Steve, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Christopher K. Lui presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeChristopher K. Lui Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 28, 2019 |
CategoryPersonal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death - Uninsured Motorist (Limited Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Judgment - Judgment Proposed
Date: February 27, 2023Special Verdict - Special Verdict
Date: February 08, 2023Minute Order - Minute Order (Final Status Conference)
Date: June 01, 2022Notice of Reclassification - Notice of Reclassification
Date: June 14, 2022Notice of Status Conference and Order - Notice of Status Conference and Order
Date: July 21, 2022Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling
Date: September 08, 2022Minute Order - Minute Order (Status Conference)
Date: September 08, 2022Minute Order - Minute Order (Jury Trial)
Date: January 04, 2023Jury Instructions - Jury Instructions
Date: January 09, 2023Exhibit List - Exhibit List
Date: January 09, 2023Witness List - Witness List
Date: January 09, 2023Statement of the Case - Statement of the Case
Date: January 09, 2023Exhibit List - Exhibit List
Date: January 19, 2023Minute Order - Minute Order (Jury Trial)
Date: January 25, 2023Jury Instructions - Jury Instructions
Date: January 31, 2023Minute Order - Minute Order (Jury Trial)
Date: February 01, 2023Declaration (name extension) - Election To Forgo Affidavit (CCP 170.6)
Date: February 01, 2023Minute Order - Minute Order (Jury Trial)
Date: February 07, 2023Minute Order - Minute Order (Jury Trial)
Date: February 06, 2023Jury Instructions - Jury Instructions Given
Date: February 08, 2023Minute Order - Minute Order (Jury Trial)
Date: February 08, 2023Jury Instructions - Jury Instructions Withdrawn
Date: February 08, 2023Memorandum of Costs (Summary) - Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: February 15, 2023Motion to Tax Costs - Motion to Tax Costs
Date: February 28, 2023Memorandum of Costs (Summary) - Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: March 01, 2023Opposition (name extension) - Opposition to Motion to Tax Costs
Date: March 20, 2023Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Tax Costs)
Date: May 30, 2023Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling
Date: May 31, 2023Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: KIMBERLEE ALLISON, , an individual (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-24T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Steve Kim (Attorney)
Date: 2022-05-27T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-06-28T00:00:00PI General Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-07-03T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by: KIMBERLEE ALLISON, , an individual (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-24T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: KIMBERLEE ALLISON (Defendant)
Date: 2022-12-14T00:00:00Exhibit List; Filed by: IRMA ESTRADA (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-19T00:00:00Jury Instructions; Filed by: KIMBERLEE ALLISON (Defendant)
Date: 2023-01-31T00:00:00Statement of the Case; Filed by: KIMBERLEE ALLISON (Defendant)
Date: 2023-01-09T00:00:00Notice of Reclassification; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-06-14T00:00:00Jury Instructions; Filed by: KIMBERLEE ALLISON (Defendant)
Date: 2023-01-09T00:00:00Witness List; Filed by: KIMBERLEE ALLISON (Defendant)
Date: 2023-01-09T00:00:00Special Verdict; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-02-08T00:00:00Jury Instructions Given; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-02-08T00:00:00Notice of Status Conference and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-07-21T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-06-14T00:00:00Stipulation, Receipt and Order re: Release of Civil Exhibits; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-02-08T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: KIMBERLEE ALLISON (Defendant)
Date: 2022-09-08T00:00:00Jury Instructions Withdrawn; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-02-06T00:00:00Exhibit List; Filed by: KIMBERLEE ALLISON (Defendant)
Date: 2023-01-09T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name
Date: 2021-06-28T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-06-28T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2022-05-27T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-08-24T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (to Continue Trial, FSC and Related Motion/Discovery Dates)
Date: 2020-08-24T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2019-06-28T00:00:00Order (to Continue Trial and Related Motion/Discovery Dates)
Date: 2021-04-27T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-06-28T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (to Continue Trial, FSC and Related Motion/Discovery Dates)
Date: 2021-04-22T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2020-08-24T00:00:00PI General Order
Date: 2019-07-03T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2019-06-28T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-08-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order] and Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearings Dates)
Date: 2019-07-03T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-06-28T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2019-06-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order] and Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearings Dates)
Date: 2019-07-03T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (to Continue Trial, FSC and Related Motion/Discovery Dates)
Date: 2020-08-24T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-06-28T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.