Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Andersson Erica Marie, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Margarian Hovanes, against Auto Wholesale Outlet Form Of Entity Unknown, Naghdi Kiomars, represented by Vega Freddie Vernon, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Holly J. Fujie presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management121 days |
|
Filing DateJune 26, 2019 |
CategoryFraud (No Contract) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: June 26, 2019Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: June 26, 2019Complaint
Date: June 26, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: June 26, 2019Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: June 27, 2019Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: June 27, 2019Proof of Personal Service
Date: July 26, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: September 04, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: September 09, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: October 15, 2019Proof of Service by Mail
Date: October 15, 2019Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: October 15, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: April 30, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: October 25, 2019Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/30/2020
Date: April 30, 2020Status Report
Date: September 02, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)
Date: September 08, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 09/08/2020
Date: September 08, 2020Substitution of Attorney
Date: December 02, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW JOINT STATUS REPORT)
Date: January 20, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: DISMISSAL)
Date: February 22, 2021Status Report
Date: February 26, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF REINSTATING THE HEREIN ACTION
Date: February 25, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)
Date: May 28, 2021Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: May 14, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION)
Date: May 28, 2021Motion to Vacate - MOTION TO VACATE DISMISSAL
Date: May 28, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO VACATE DISMISSAL)
Date: July 06, 2021Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/30/2022
Date: March 30, 2022Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/07/2022
Date: April 07, 2022Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)
Date: April 20, 2022Request for Dismissal
Date: May 19, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: March 30, 2022Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: November 03, 2021Witness List - WITNESS LIST PLAINTIFF’S WITNESS LIST
Date: April 01, 2022Exhibit List - EXHIBIT LIST PLAINTIFF’S EXHIBIT LIST
Date: April 01, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: April 07, 2022Notice of Settlement
Date: April 19, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: May 19, 2022Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of 09/08/2020)
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/30/2020)
Date: 2020-04-30T00:00:00Status Report
Date: 2020-09-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2019-10-25T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: 2019-06-27T00:00:00Notice ( of Case Management Conference)
Date: 2019-09-09T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-06-26T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-06-26T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review Joint Status Report) of 01/20/2021)
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2019-06-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-09-04T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2019-06-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-04-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Joint Status Report))
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Declaration (In Support of Reinstating the Herein Action)
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (To Reconsider And Revoke Order Dismissing Case Without Prejudice;)
Date: 2021-03-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application To Reconsider And Revoke Orde...))
Date: 2021-03-05T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2021-05-14T00:00:00Application (to Reconsider and Revoke Order Dismissing Case Without Prejudice Reservation #486818886138)
Date: 2021-04-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2021-05-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Reconsideration))
Date: 2021-05-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review re: Dismissal) of 02/22/2021)
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00Status Report
Date: 2021-02-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re: Dismissal))
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00Motion to Vacate (Dismissal)
Date: 2021-05-28T00:00:00Reply (PLAINTIFF?S REPLY MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT)
Date: 2021-06-28T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-06-26T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-07-26T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.