Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Perez Jonathan Alexander, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Bauman Shaun Joseph, Sublette Camm Lesley, against Chitica Stephanie Aka Stephanie Morazan, Rasier Llc, represented by Schroeder Tommy U., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Spring Street Courthouse with Jon R. Takasugi presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJune 17, 2019 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle - Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Filing Court HouseSpring Street Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Case Cycle Time280 days |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: June 17, 2019Complaint
Date: June 17, 2019Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: June 17, 2019Proof of Personal Service
Date: July 30, 2019Answer
Date: September 09, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: September 09, 2019Association of Attorney - ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL
Date: January 13, 2020Proof of Service by Mail
Date: March 23, 2020Request for Dismissal
Date: March 23, 2020Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service
Date: March 30, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: March 30, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: March 30, 2020Complaint
Date: 2019-06-17T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: March 23, 2020Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-06-17T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-09-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order] and Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates)
Date: 2019-06-20T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-06-17T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-07-30T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-06-17T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: March 23, 2020PI General Order
Date: 2019-06-20T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-09-09T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service
Date: March 30, 2020Association of Counsel
Date: January 13, 2020For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.