Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Kohut Matthew, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Delshad Jonathan Jacob, against Fayz Arash, La Tutors 123, represented by Farivar Fahim, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Daniel S. Murphy presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management93 days |
|
Filing DateJune 12, 2019 |
CategoryOther Employment Complaint Case (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
This complaint is filed by Jonathan J. Delshad, PC on behalf of plaintiff Matthew Kohut against LA Tutors 123, Arash Fayz, and DOES 1-10. The complaint alleges multiple violations of California labor laws, including violation of the Private Attorneys...
Order (Re: PAGA Settlement)
Date: February 03, 2020Complaint
Date: June 12, 2019Complaint; Filed by: Matthew Kohut (Plaintiff); As to: Arash Fayz (Defendant); LA Tutors 123 (Defendant)
Date: 2019-06-12T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-06-18T00:00:00Declaration of Jonathan J. Delshad; Filed by: Matthew Kohut (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-09-17T00:00:00Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-11-15T00:00:00Case Management Order; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-09-13T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-08-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Matthew Kohut (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-19T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Matthew Kohut (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-09-16T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-06-12T00:00:00Declaration MC-030; Filed by: Matthew Kohut (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-07-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-07-26T00:00:00Order Re: PAGA Settlement; Signed and Filed by: Matthew Kohut (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-03T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Matthew Kohut (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-09-17T00:00:00Notice of Withdrawal of Motion; Filed by: Arash Fayz (Defendant); LA Tutors 123 (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-07T00:00:00Answer to Complaint; Filed by: Arash Fayz (Defendant); LA Tutors 123 (Defendant)
Date: 2019-07-12T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Arash Fayz (Defendant); LA Tutors 123 (Defendant)
Date: 2019-09-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Arash Fayz (Defendant); LA Tutors 123 (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-30T00:00:00Motion to Compel THE DEPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF MATTHEW KOHUT;; Filed by: Arash Fayz (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-23T00:00:00Declaration of Jonathan J. Delshad; Filed by: Matthew Kohut (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-09T00:00:00Notice of Settlement; Filed by: Matthew Kohut (Plaintiff); Vacate Future Dates: No
Date: 2019-11-15T00:00:00Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Compel Plaintiff's Deposition; Filed by: Arash Fayz (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-07T00:00:00Notice of Continued Hearing of Defendant Arash Fayz's Motion to Compel; Filed by: Arash Fayz (Defendant)
Date: 2019-10-04T00:00:00Complaint
Date: June 12, 2019Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: June 12, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: June 12, 2019Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: June 12, 2019Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: June 14, 2019Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: June 17, 2019Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings
Date: June 18, 2019Proof of Service by Mail
Date: June 24, 2019Answer - ANSWER TO COMPLAINT
Date: July 12, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF TAKING THE DEPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF
Date: July 12, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION MC-030
Date: July 18, 2019Proof of Personal Service
Date: July 18, 2019Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: July 26, 2019Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: August 08, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: August 19, 2019Proof of Service by Mail
Date: August 19, 2019Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL THE DEPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF MATTHEW KOHUT;
Date: August 23, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: September 13, 2019Case Management Order
Date: September 13, 2019Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: September 16, 2019Proof of Service by Mail
Date: September 16, 2019Proof of Personal Service
Date: September 17, 2019Separate Statement
Date: September 17, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION OF JONATHAN J. DELSHAD
Date: September 17, 2019Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: September 19, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUED HEARING OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION
Date: October 04, 2019Notice of Settlement
Date: November 15, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUED HEARING OF DEFENDANT ARASH FAYZ'S MOTION TO COMPEL
Date: October 04, 2019Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)
Date: November 15, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION
Date: January 07, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF'S DEPOSITION
Date: January 07, 2020Proof of Service by Mail
Date: January 09, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION OF JONATHAN J. DELSHAD
Date: January 09, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER STIPULATION AND JOINT APPLICATION F...)
Date: February 03, 2020Order - ORDER RE: PAGA SETTLEMENT
Date: February 03, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: October 29, 2020Request for Dismissal
Date: October 29, 2020Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-06-12T00:00:00Notice ( of Taking the Deposition of Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-07-12T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2019-06-17T00:00:00Notice (DEFENDANT ARASH FAYZ?S AMENDED NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF MATTHEW KOHUT)
Date: 2019-07-17T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-06-12T00:00:00Answer (to Complaint)
Date: 2019-07-12T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-06-12T00:00:00Declaration (of Substituted Service)
Date: 2019-07-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2019-06-24T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings
Date: 2019-06-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Peremptory Challenge to Judicial Officer))
Date: 2019-06-18T00:00:00Motion to Compel (Supplemental Responses to Plaintiffs special interrogatories set 1 numbers 1-53)
Date: 2019-09-17T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2019-09-16T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-09-17T00:00:00Motion to Compel (THE DEPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF MATTHEW KOHUT;)
Date: 2019-08-23T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-07-18T00:00:00Case Management Order
Date: 2019-09-13T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2019-09-16T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2019-08-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-08-30T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2019-08-19T00:00:00Declaration (of Jonathan J. Delshad)
Date: 2019-09-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2019-09-13T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-01-09T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2019-07-26T00:00:00Notice ( of Continued Hearing of Defendant Arash Fayz's Motion to Compel)
Date: 2019-10-04T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-09-17T00:00:00Notice ( of Continued Hearing of Defendants' Motion)
Date: 2019-10-04T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2019-11-15T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2019-09-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-08-19T00:00:00Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)
Date: 2019-11-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion - Other STIPULATION AND JOINT APPLICATION F...))
Date: 2020-02-03T00:00:00Declaration ( of Jonathan J. Delshad)
Date: 2020-01-09T00:00:00Notice ( of Withdrawal of Motion to Compel Plaintiff's Deposition)
Date: 2020-01-07T00:00:00Notice (of Withdrawal of Motion)
Date: 2020-01-07T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.