Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Sc&P Resources Inc., filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Brousseau Brandon, Parker David B, Smyth Bruce Tabor, Wang Steven S., against Hermes Capital Inc., Seo Young Jin, represented by Cianci Christopher, Park Daniel E, Park Daniel Eal, Rios Wil Jonathon, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Lia Martin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLia Martin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management146 days |
Filing DateJune 12, 2019 |
CategoryBreach Of Rental/Lease Contract (Not Unlawful Detainer Or Wrongful Eviction) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Notice of Ruling; Filed by: SC&P Resources, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-17T00:00:00Order to Show Cause (Hearing); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-07-02T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: SC&P Resources, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-11-16T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-06-24T00:00:00Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-20T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Young Jin Seo (Defendant); Hermes Capital, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: SC&P Resources, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: SC&P Resources, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Hermes Capital, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Response in Opposition to Notice of Related Case; Filed by: SC&P Resources, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-28T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-06-12T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-07-02T00:00:00Notice of Related Case; Filed by: Young Jin Seo (Defendant)
Date: 2022-10-25T00:00:00Motion to Quash; Filed by: Young Jin Seo (Defendant); Hermes Capital, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-06-22T00:00:00Jury Instructions; Filed by: SC&P Resources, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-11-28T00:00:00Statement of the Case; Filed by: SC&P Resources, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-11-28T00:00:00Joint List of Trial Witness; Filed by: SC&P Resources, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-12-08T00:00:00Witness List; Filed by: SC&P Resources, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-11-28T00:00:00Notice of Consolidation; Filed by: Young Jin Seo (Defendant)
Date: 2022-12-05T00:00:00Notice of Continuance; Filed by: SC&P Resources, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-12-12T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Steven S. Wang (Attorney)
Date: 2023-06-27T00:00:00Exhibit List; Filed by: SC&P Resources, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-11-28T00:00:00Notice of Continuance; Filed by: SC&P Resources, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-04-05T00:00:00Motion for Protective Order; Filed by: Young Jin Seo (Defendant)
Date: 2022-11-28T00:00:00Notice of Continuance; Filed by: SC&P Resources, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: July 12, 2023Opposition to Notice of Remote Appearance; Filed by: SC&P Resources, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-02-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: June 12, 2019Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: June 12, 2019Complaint
Date: June 12, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: June 12, 2019Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: June 14, 2019Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: June 17, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER REGARDING PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE)
Date: June 24, 2019Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings
Date: June 24, 2019Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: June 27, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT
Date: June 28, 2019Order to Show Cause (Hearing)
Date: July 02, 2019Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: July 02, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND OSC
Date: July 10, 2019Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: October 17, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: October 21, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: October 23, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)
Date: November 05, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING
Date: November 05, 2019Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL - RFP SEO
Date: July 02, 2020Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL - RFP HERMES
Date: July 02, 2020Unknown - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE DUE TO COVID-19 STATE OF EMERGENCY DECLARATIONS
Date: July 20, 2020Department 16 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012
Date: March 20, 2024Motion to Compel - RFP SEO; Filed by: SC&P Resources, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Young Jin Seo (Defendant)
Date: 2020-07-02T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: SC&P Resources, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: SC&P Resources, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: SC&P Resources, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-08-17T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: November 06, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: January 08, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: March 10, 2021Judgment - JUDGMENT FOR DISCOVERY SANCTIONS AWARD
Date: March 16, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: April 13, 2021Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment
Date: May 24, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER
Date: April 30, 2021Separate Statement
Date: August 11, 2021Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: August 11, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: March 17, 2022Opposition - OPPOSITION NON-OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS
Date: April 27, 2022Motion to Quash
Date: June 22, 2022Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL
Date: June 28, 2022Substitution of Attorney
Date: August 17, 2022Response - RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO NOTICE OF RELATED CASE
Date: October 28, 2022Notice of Related Case
Date: October 25, 2022Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER COMPELLING DEPOSITIONS
Date: November 14, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER COMPELLING DEPOSITI...)
Date: November 16, 2022Notice of Ruling
Date: November 16, 2022Unknown - EX PARTE PROPOSED ORDER
Date: November 16, 2022Exhibit List
Date: November 28, 2022Jury Instructions
Date: November 28, 2022Witness List
Date: November 28, 2022Statement of the Case
Date: November 28, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: December 02, 2022Notice - NOTICE DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER
Date: December 02, 2022Notice of Consolidation
Date: December 05, 2022Witness List - JOINT LIST OF TRIAL WITNESS
Date: December 08, 2022Notice of Continuance
Date: December 12, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-JURY TRIAL , T/E: 3 DAYS, [SEE HRG. OF 12-02-2022])
Date: December 12, 2022Notice - NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE
Date: February 14, 2023Opposition - OPPOSITION TO NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE
Date: February 14, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-JURY TRIAL T/E: 3 DAYS,)
Date: February 15, 2023Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION RE CONTINUED TRIAL DATE
Date: February 16, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-JURY TRIAL T/E: 3 DAYS,)
Date: February 16, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-JURY TRIAL T/E: 3 DAYS,)
Date: March 14, 2023Notice of Continuance
Date: April 05, 2023Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-06-12T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-06-12T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-06-12T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2019-06-12T00:00:00Motion to Compel (- RFP SEO)
Date: 2020-07-02T00:00:00Notice ( of Case Management Conference and OSC)
Date: 2019-07-10T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2019-07-02T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2019-06-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...))
Date: 2019-11-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations])
Date: 2020-07-20T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00Notice ( of Trial Setting)
Date: 2019-11-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations
Date: 2020-07-20T00:00:00Answer (Hermes Capital, Inc. and Youngjin Seo's Answer to pltf's Complaint)
Date: 2019-07-31T00:00:00Motion to Compel (- RFP Hermes)
Date: 2020-07-02T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2019-06-17T00:00:00Notice (of Case Reassignment)
Date: 2019-06-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order regarding peremptory challenge))
Date: 2019-06-24T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings
Date: 2019-06-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Scheduling/Setting of Motion Hearing;))
Date: 2020-07-23T00:00:00Order to Show Cause (Hearing)
Date: 2019-07-02T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-11-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-04-13T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2022-03-17T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Judgment or Order)
Date: 2021-04-30T00:00:00in Department 16
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference Re: Rescheduling FSC and Jury Trial...))
Date: 2020-11-06T00:00:00in Department 16
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Ex Parte Proposed Order
Date: 2022-03-17T00:00:00Judgment (for Discovery Sanctions Award)
Date: 2021-03-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Production OF DEFENDANT HERMES CA...))
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment
Date: 2021-05-24T00:00:00Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE RE: RESCHEDULING FSC AND JURY TRIAL...)
Date: November 06, 2020For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.