Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Drasin Eric, Strong Sports Gymnasium Llc, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Dack Martin, against Ford Willard, Kim Sing International, Strong Sports Gymnasium Llc, Strong Sports Mma, represented by Audley Michael Richard, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Anthony Mohr presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management99 days |
|
Filing DateJune 10, 2019 |
CategoryOther Employment Complaint Case (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions385 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
This complaint is a first amended complaint filed by Eric Drasin against Strong Sports Gymnasium, LLC, Willard Ford, Kim Sing International, Strong Sports MMA, and other defendants. The case number is 19STCV20108 and it has been assigned to Hon. Anth...
Complaint
Date: June 10, 2019Updated -- Motion to Disqualify Counsel: Filed By: Eric Drasin (Plaintiff); Result: Denied; Result Date:
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Eric Drasin (Plaintiff); Strong Sports Gymnasium, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-06-10T00:00:00Declaration of Eric Drasin in Support; Filed by: Eric Drasin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-20T00:00:00Declaration Declaration Re Status of Service and Proof; Filed by: Eric Drasin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Eric Drasin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Eric Drasin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-09-11T00:00:00Summons on First Amended Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Eric Drasin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-09-23T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Eric Drasin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-09-16T00:00:00Reply to Opposition to Motion to Disqualify; Filed by: Eric Drasin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-28T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Eric Drasin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-10T00:00:00Opposition to Motion to Disqualify Michael Audley; Filed by: Willard Ford (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-13T00:00:00Declaration of Eric Drasin in Support of Reply; Filed by: Eric Drasin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-28T00:00:00Declaration of Martin Dack in support of Motion to Disqualify; Filed by: Eric Drasin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-23T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-06-10T00:00:00Declaration of Michael Audley in Support of Motion to Compel; Filed by: Willard Ford (Defendant)
Date: 2020-05-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-05-20T00:00:00Ruling on Demurrer and Motion to Strike; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-06-29T00:00:00Opposition to Demurrer; Filed by: Eric Drasin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Eric Drasin (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-10T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-17T00:00:00Reply to Opposition to Demurrer; Filed by: Willard Ford (Defendant)
Date: 2020-06-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-05-13T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: February 09, 2021Notice of Motion; Filed by: Willard Ford (Defendant)
Date: 2020-05-07T00:00:00Motion for Protective Order; Filed by: Willard Ford (Defendant)
Date: 2020-04-16T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: June 10, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: June 10, 2019Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: June 10, 2019Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: June 14, 2019Substitution of Attorney
Date: August 28, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: September 11, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: September 17, 2019Amended Complaint - FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: September 23, 2019Summons - SUMMONS ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: September 23, 2019Request for Dismissal
Date: October 23, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION RE STATUS OF SERVICE AND PROOF
Date: October 23, 2019Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: October 23, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)
Date: October 30, 2019Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: October 31, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION OF DEMURRING PARTY IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC EXTENSION
Date: November 15, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: December 03, 2019Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: December 03, 2019Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ERRATA
Date: December 03, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: December 06, 2019Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: December 09, 2019Motion to Disqualify Counsel
Date: December 20, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION OF ERIC DRASIN IN SUPPORT
Date: December 20, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION OF MARTIN DACK IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISQUALIFY
Date: December 23, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: December 27, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISQUALIFY MICHAEL AUDLEY
Date: January 13, 2020Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: January 21, 2020Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISQUALIFY
Date: January 28, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO DISQUALIFY COUNSEL; CASE MANAGEMENT CONF...)
Date: February 07, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION OF MICHAEL AUDLEY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL
Date: May 07, 2020Motion for Protective Order
Date: April 16, 2020Notice of Motion
Date: May 07, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: May 13, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: May 20, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: June 10, 2020Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER
Date: June 15, 2020Order - RULING ON DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE
Date: June 29, 2020Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER
Date: June 23, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: June 26, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)
Date: June 26, 2020Answer - ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: July 29, 2020Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: August 17, 2020Notice - NOTICE CASE REASSIGNMENT AND ORDER
Date: August 20, 2020Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY
Date: September 23, 2020Request for Dismissal
Date: February 09, 2021Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: February 09, 2021Declaration (of Eric Drasin in Support)
Date: 2019-12-20T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-06-10T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-06-10T00:00:00Declaration (of Martin Dack in support of Motion to Disqualify)
Date: 2019-12-23T00:00:00Declaration (of Michael Audley in Support of Motion for Protective Order)
Date: 2020-04-10T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2019-10-31T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2019-08-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service))
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2019-09-16T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Case Management Conference)
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-12-06T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2019-12-09T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Notice (of Continued Case Management Conference)
Date: 2019-12-27T00:00:00Declaration ( in Support of Opposition to Motion to Disqualify Michael Audley)
Date: 2020-01-13T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-06-10T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration Re Status of Service and Proof)
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service))
Date: 2019-10-30T00:00:00Motion to Disqualify Counsel
Date: 2019-12-20T00:00:00Declaration ( of Eric Drasin in Support of Reply)
Date: 2020-01-28T00:00:00Summons (on First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-09-23T00:00:00Amended Complaint (1st)
Date: 2019-09-23T00:00:00Complaint ( (1st))
Date: 2019-06-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Disqualify Counsel; Case Management Conf...))
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00Declaration ( of Demurring Party in Support of Automatic Extension)
Date: 2019-11-15T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-09-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2019-09-17T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Errata)
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Reply (to Opposition to Motion to Disqualify)
Date: 2020-01-28T00:00:00Opposition ( to Motion to Disqualify Michael Audley)
Date: 2020-01-13T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order))
Date: 2020-05-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 05/13/2020)
Date: 2020-05-13T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order))
Date: 2020-05-13T00:00:00Answer (To First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2020-07-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Hearing on Demurrer - without Mot...))
Date: 2020-06-29T00:00:00Notice (Case Reassignment and Order)
Date: 2020-08-20T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-06-10T00:00:00Motion for Protective Order
Date: 2020-04-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-06-26T00:00:00Opposition (to Demurrer)
Date: 2020-06-15T00:00:00Declaration (of Michael Audley in Support of Motion to Compel)
Date: 2020-05-07T00:00:00Notice of Motion
Date: 2020-05-07T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION OF MICHAEL AUDLEY IN SUPPORT OF REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER)
Date: 2020-06-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 05/20/2020)
Date: 2020-05-20T00:00:00Reply (to Opposition to Demurrer)
Date: 2020-06-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2020-06-26T00:00:00Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion
Date: 2020-05-07T00:00:00Ruling on Demurrer and Motion to Strike
Date: 2020-06-29T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2020-08-17T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.