Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Three Sons & A Dog Inc., Vafaee Abolfazl Rahbar, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Burunsuzyan Maro, against Alagh Rajan, Crp Alagh Corp. Inc., Subway Sandwich Shops Inc., Three Sons & A Dog Inc., represented by Jensen Amy K., Kass Dennis Bruce, Mellon Gillian, Zakarian Chantalle, Petkoff Douglas Jordan, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Laura A. Seigle presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 05, 2019 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle - Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion to Disqualify Counsel) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Objection To Plaintiff's Late Filed Consolidation; Filed by: CRP Alagh Corp. Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2023-07-03T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by: Rajan Alagh (Cross-Defendant); CRP ALAGH CORP. INC. (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-21T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-06-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Final Status Conference) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Abolfazl Rahbar Vafaee (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-25T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Three Sons & A Dog, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-10-12T00:00:00Association of Attorney; Filed by: Rajan Alagh (Defendant); CRP Alagh Corp. Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-11-14T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Maro Burunsuzyan (Attorney)
Date: 2021-08-25T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Rajan Alagh (Defendant); CRP Alagh Corp. Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-05-25T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by: Rajan Alagh (Defendant); CRP Alagh Corp. Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Motion to Extend Discovery Cut-Off Date; Filed by: CRP Alagh Corp. Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2023-03-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Three Sons & A Dog, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-10-12T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: CRP Alagh Corp. Inc. (Defendant)
Date: September 01, 2023Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: CRP Alagh Corp. Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2023-03-08T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Abolfazl Rahbar Vafaee (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-28T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Rajan Alagh (Defendant); CRP Alagh Corp. Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Abolfazl Rahbar Vafaee (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-09-26T00:00:00Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Three Sons & A Dog, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Maro Burunsuzyan (Attorney)
Date: 2022-05-10T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Rajan Alagh (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-07T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: CRP Alagh Corp. Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2023-04-11T00:00:00PI General Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-06-19T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Maro Burunsuzyan (Attorney)
Date: 2023-02-02T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Three Sons & A Dog, Inc. (Defendant); As to: Abolfazl Rahbar Vafaee (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: CRP Alagh Corp. Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2023-08-08T00:00:00Complaint
Date: June 05, 2019Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: June 05, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: June 05, 2019Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: June 05, 2019PI General Order
Date: June 19, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: November 18, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE) OF 11/18/2020
Date: November 18, 2020Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: November 23, 2020Declaration re: Due Diligence
Date: November 23, 2020Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: December 21, 2020Demand for Jury Trial
Date: December 21, 2020Answer
Date: December 21, 2020Cross-Complaint
Date: December 23, 2020Answer
Date: December 23, 2020Motion to Disqualify Counsel
Date: December 30, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: December 23, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: RESCHEDULED HEARING ON MOTION TO DISQUALIFY C...)
Date: February 04, 2021Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF MOTION TO DISQUALIFY
Date: February 24, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO DISQUALIFY COUNSEL)
Date: February 25, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO DISQUALIFY COUNSEL)
Date: April 09, 2021Substitution of Attorney
Date: June 28, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: September 15, 2021Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: August 25, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: October 12, 2021Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: October 12, 2021Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: October 12, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: October 15, 2021Demand for Jury Trial
Date: October 21, 2021Answer
Date: October 21, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: October 25, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: November 09, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: October 29, 2021Notice of Change of Firm Name
Date: December 17, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE
Date: January 13, 2022Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: May 10, 2022Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: September 26, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE; HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO C...)
Date: November 16, 2022Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: February 02, 2023Request for Judicial Notice
Date: March 08, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO EXTEND DISCOVERY CUT-OFF DATE)
Date: April 03, 2023Notice of Ruling
Date: April 11, 2023Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion
Date: April 26, 2023Motion re: - MOTION RE: TO COMPEL DISCOVERY RESPONSES
Date: April 26, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: DISCOVERY)
Date: April 27, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: May 25, 2023Certificate of Mailing for ((Final Status Conference) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-06-05T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Abolfazl Rahbar Vafaee (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-05T00:00:00PI General Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-06-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Abolfazl Rahbar Vafaee (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-05T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Abolfazl Rahbar Vafaee (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-05T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Rajan Alagh (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Disqualify Counsel)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Rescheduled Hearing on Motion to Disqualify C...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Disqualify Counsel)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Motion to Disqualify Counsel Filed by Three Sons & A Dog, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-30T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion to Disqualify Counsel) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Notice (Notice Of Continuance Of Motion To Disqualify) Filed by Three Sons & A Dog, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Three Sons & A Dog, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Abolfazl Rahbar Vafaee (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-09-15T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Abolfazl Rahbar Vafaee (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-29T00:00:00Notice (of Remote Appearance) Filed by Rajan Alagh (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service of S...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-18T00:00:00Association of Attorney Filed by Rajan Alagh (Defendant); CRP Alagh Corp. Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-11-14T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by Maro Burunsuzyan (Attorney)
Date: 2023-02-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-29T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Three Sons & A Dog, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-10-12T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Abolfazl Rahbar Vafaee (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-25T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Rajan Alagh (Defendant); CRP Alagh Corp. Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Answer Filed by Three Sons & A Dog, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Abolfazl Rahbar Vafaee (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-09-26T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Abolfazl Rahbar Vafaee (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-21T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name Filed by Rajan Alagh (Defendant)
Date: 2021-12-17T00:00:00Answer Filed by Rajan Alagh (Cross-Defendant); CRP ALAGH CORP. INC. (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-21T00:00:00Declaration re: Due Diligence Filed by Abolfazl Rahbar Vafaee (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Answer Filed by Rajan Alagh (Defendant); CRP Alagh Corp. Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service of S...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal For Failure to File Proof o...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-21T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by Maro Burunsuzyan (Attorney)
Date: 2021-08-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference; Hearing on Ex Parte Application to C...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-11-16T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by Maro Burunsuzyan (Attorney)
Date: 2022-05-10T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by Abolfazl Rahbar Vafaee (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Cross-Complaint Filed by Three Sons & A Dog, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Abolfazl Rahbar Vafaee (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-28T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial Filed by Rajan Alagh (Defendant); CRP Alagh Corp. Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial Filed by Rajan Alagh (Cross-Defendant); CRP ALAGH CORP. INC. (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-21T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Three Sons & A Dog, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Three Sons & A Dog, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-10-12T00:00:00PI General Order
Date: 2019-06-19T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-06-05T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2019-06-05T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-06-05T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-06-05T00:00:00Declaration re: Due Diligence
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Final Status Conference) of 11/18/2020)
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order] and Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates)
Date: 2019-06-19T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2021-08-25T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Rescheduled Hearing on Motion to Disqualify C...))
Date: 2021-02-04T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Notice (Notice Of Continuance Of Motion To Disqualify)
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion to Disqualify Counsel) of 04/09/2021)
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-07-07T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Disqualify Counsel))
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Motion to Disqualify Counsel
Date: 2020-12-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Disqualify Counsel))
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2021-06-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery...))
Date: 2021-06-29T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2021-09-15T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service of S...))
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-10-25T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name
Date: 2021-12-17T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2021-10-12T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2021-10-29T00:00:00Notice (of Remote Appearance)
Date: 2022-01-13T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2021-11-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service of S...))
Date: 2021-10-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-10-12T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-10-21T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2021-10-21T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2021-10-12T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.