Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Villalobos Jacqueline, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Geraci Jeffrey, Lapuyade Jean-Claude, Geraci Jeffrey James, Lebe Jonathan M., against Alterra Group Llc Dba Alterra Home Loans, represented by Ferrantella Jesse, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Richard L. Fruin presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management142 days |
|
Filing DateJune 05, 2019 |
CategoryOther Employment Complaint Case (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Motion re: (- Plaintiff's Notice of Unopposed Motion For PAGA Settlement Approval)
Date: October 07, 2020Order APPROVING PAGA SETTLEMENT; Signed and Filed by: Jacqueline Villalobos (Plaintiff)
Date: November 19, 2020Motion re: (for PAGA Settlement Approval)
Date: October 07, 2020Complaint
Date: June 05, 2019Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-09-11T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Jacqueline Villalobos (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-05T00:00:00Notice of Related Case; Filed by: Jacqueline Villalobos (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-18T00:00:00Answer to Complaint; Filed by: Alterra Group, LLC (Defendant); As to: Jacqueline Villalobos (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-02T00:00:00Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-06-05T00:00:00Association of Attorney; Filed by: Jacqueline Villalobos (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Jacqueline Villalobos (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-08T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Jacqueline Villalobos (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Request for Refund / Order; Filed by: Jacqueline Villalobos (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-07T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Alterra Group, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2019-10-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Alterra Group, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2019-10-08T00:00:00Request for Refund / Order; Filed by: Jacqueline Villalobos (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-09-03T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Jacqueline Villalobos (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order per 7-10-20 Covid-19 Guidance) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-14T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Jacqueline Villalobos (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Notice of Case Relocation Rescheduling; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-06-05T00:00:00Complaint
Date: June 05, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NON-COMPLEX DETERMINATION;)
Date: June 13, 2019Notice of Related Case
Date: June 18, 2019Notice of Related Case
Date: June 19, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF RELATED CASE)
Date: July 11, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE
Date: July 17, 2019Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: July 19, 2019Answer - ANSWER TO COMPLAINT
Date: August 02, 2019Request for Refund / Order
Date: September 03, 2019Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: September 11, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: October 08, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: October 25, 2019Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: October 25, 2019Notice of Related Case
Date: March 26, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER PER 7-10-20 COVID-19 GUIDANCE)
Date: July 14, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF MINUTE ORDER
Date: July 23, 2020Association of Attorney
Date: September 10, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: September 28, 2020Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: September 28, 2020Motion re: - MOTION RE: FOR PAGA SETTLEMENT APPROVAL
Date: October 07, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: October 27, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER BY PLAINTIFF FOR APPROVAL OF PAGA S...)
Date: November 05, 2020Notice of Case Relocation Rescheduling
Date: November 05, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION OF JEAN CLAUDE LAPUYADE, ESQ.
Date: November 17, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: November 17, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER BY PLAINTIFF FOR APPROVAL OF PAGA S...)
Date: November 19, 2020Order - ORDER APPROVING PAGA SETTLEMENT
Date: November 20, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER APPROVING PAGA SETTLEMENT
Date: December 02, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW [CLERICAL])
Date: December 04, 2020Notice of Related Case; Filed by: Jacqueline Villalobos (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Court Order Re Notice of Related Case) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-07-11T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Court Order Re Non-Complex Determination;) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-06-13T00:00:00Request for Refund / Order Filed by Jacqueline Villalobos (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-09-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Non-Complex Determination;)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-06-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order per 7-10-20 Covid-19 Guidance) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-14T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Jacqueline Villalobos (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-05T00:00:00Association of Attorney Filed by Jacqueline Villalobos (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-10T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Alterra Group, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2019-10-25T00:00:00Notice of Related Case Filed by Alterra Group, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-03-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Notice of Related Case)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-07-11T00:00:00Order (APPROVING PAGA SETTLEMENT) Filed by Jacqueline Villalobos (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-20T00:00:00Notice of Related Case Filed by Jacqueline Villalobos (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-18T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Jacqueline Villalobos (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-05T00:00:00Answer (to Complaint) Filed by Alterra Group, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Jacqueline Villalobos (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-08T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order Re Non-Complex Determination;) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-06-13T00:00:00Notice (of Minute Order) Filed by Jacqueline Villalobos (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-23T00:00:00Notice of Related Case Filed by Jacqueline Villalobos (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Alterra Group, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2019-10-08T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Jacqueline Villalobos (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Reassignment to an Independent Calendar Court)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-06-18T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-06-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion - Other by Plaintiff for Approval of PAGA S...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Order Approving PAGA Settlement) Filed by Jacqueline Villalobos (Plaintiff)
Date: December 02, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Jacqueline Villalobos (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by Jacqueline Villalobos (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-07-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review [CLERICAL])) Filed by Clerk
Date: December 04, 2020Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-09-11T00:00:00Notice (Of Order Re: Notice Of Related Case) Filed by Jacqueline Villalobos (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-07-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-25T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Motion - Other Approval of PAGA Settlement [64171...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion - Other by Plaintiff for Approval of PAGA S...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-19T00:00:00Notice of Case Relocation Rescheduling Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Jacqueline Villalobos (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order Re Notice of Related Case) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-07-11T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order per 7-10-20 Covid-19 Guidance)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-14T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-06-05T00:00:00Notice (of Errata and Correction to Caption of Plaintiff's Representative Action Complaint)
Date: 2019-06-13T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-06-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Non-Complex Determination;))
Date: 2019-06-13T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2019-06-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order Re Non-Complex Determination;) of 06/13/2019)
Date: 2019-06-13T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Motion - Other Approval of PAGA Settlement [64171...))
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order Re Notice of Related Case) of 07/11/2019)
Date: 2019-07-11T00:00:00Request for Refund / Order
Date: 2019-09-03T00:00:00Notice (of Minute Order)
Date: 2020-07-23T00:00:00Order (APPROVING PAGA SETTLEMENT)
Date: 2020-11-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion - Other by Plaintiff for Approval of PAGA S...))
Date: 2020-11-19T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Order Approving PAGA Settlement)
Date: December 02, 2020Declaration (of Nicholas J. De Blouw In Support of Plaintiff's Motion for PAGA Counsel Award)
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2020-03-26T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2019-06-19T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2019-07-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-10-08T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2019-10-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-10-08T00:00:00Answer (to Complaint)
Date: 2019-08-02T00:00:00Declaration (of Jeff Geraci In Support Of Plaintiffs? Unopposed Motion For PAGA Settlement Approval)
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Association of Attorney
Date: 2020-09-10T00:00:00Notice (Of Order Re: Notice Of Related Case)
Date: 2019-07-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order per 7-10-20 Covid-19 Guidance) of 07/14/2020)
Date: 2020-07-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2019-09-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Reassignment to an Independent Calendar Court))
Date: 2019-06-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Relocation Rescheduling
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Notice of Related Case))
Date: 2019-07-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2019-10-25T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-10-27T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order per 7-10-20 Covid-19 Guidance))
Date: 2020-07-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion - Other by Plaintiff for Approval of PAGA S...))
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order per 7-10-20 Covid-19 Guidance))
Date: 2020-07-14T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.