Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Sanchez Agustin, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case represented by Godoy Karina, Lovretovich Joseph, against Apro Distribution Llc A Delaware Corporation, Apro Llc Dba 76 Gas Station A Delaware Corporation, Apro Llc Dba United Pacific A Delaware Corporation, Gonzalez Marco, Juliano Joseph, (total of 6) See All represented by Schaffer John Andrew, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with David Sotelo presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 29, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Complaint
Date: May 29, 2019Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: May 29, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: May 29, 2019Complaint
Date: May 29, 2019Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: May 29, 2019Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: July 03, 2019Amended Complaint - FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: July 17, 2019Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: August 06, 2019Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: August 26, 2019Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: August 26, 2019Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: October 25, 2019Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: November 04, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION OF JOHN ANDREW ISO MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION
Date: November 04, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION OF MANSOOR RASHEED ISO MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION
Date: November 04, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: CONTINUATION OF THE 12/5/19;)
Date: November 07, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: November 25, 2019Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: January 21, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: January 21, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION; CASE MANAGEMENT CONF...)
Date: February 05, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: February 11, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: STIPULATED CONTINUANCE;)
Date: September 25, 2020Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: May 12, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-ARBITRATION STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: June 23, 2021Notice of Settlement
Date: November 04, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE)
Date: November 04, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))
Date: January 03, 2022Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by: Agustin Sanchez (Plaintiff); As to: APRO LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2019-10-25T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-08-26T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-08-26T00:00:00Notice of Settlement; Filed by: Agustin Sanchez (Plaintiff); Vacate Future Dates: No
Date: 2021-11-04T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-05-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Notice of Settlement of Entire Case) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-11-04T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Alex Martinez (Defendant)
Date: 2020-05-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review re: Stipulated Continuance;) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Agustin Sanchez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review re: continuation of the ;) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-11-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Agustin Sanchez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Agustin Sanchez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Notice of Settlement of Entire Case)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-11-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))) Filed by Clerk
Date: January 03, 2022Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review re: continuation of the ;) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-11-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration; Case Management Conf...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Notice of Settlement of Entire Case) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-11-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re: continuation of the ;)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-11-07T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by Agustin Sanchez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-07-03T00:00:00Request for Dismissal (With Prejudice, Entire Action) Filed by Agustin Sanchez (Plaintiff)
Date: December 20, 2021Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Agustin Sanchez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re: Stipulated Continuance;)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by Agustin Sanchez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-05-29T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-08-26T00:00:00amended complaint Filed by Agustin Sanchez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-07-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review re: Stipulated Continuance;) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Post-Arbitration Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt Filed by Agustin Sanchez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-25T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Agustin Sanchez (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2019-05-29T00:00:00Notice of Settlement Filed by Agustin Sanchez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-04T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Agustin Sanchez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00First Amended Summons Filed by Agustin Sanchez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-07-17T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by Alex Martinez (Defendant)
Date: 2020-05-12T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Agustin Sanchez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-29T00:00:00Amended Complaint (1st) Filed by Agustin Sanchez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-07-17T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-08-26T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Declaration (of Mansoor Rasheed ISO Motion to Compel Arbitration)
Date: 2019-11-04T00:00:00Declaration (of John Andrew ISO Motion to Compel Arbitration)
Date: 2019-11-04T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-05-29T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2019-08-26T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review re: continuation of the 12/5/19;) of 11/07/2019)
Date: 2019-11-07T00:00:00amended complaint
Date: 2019-07-17T00:00:00Amended Complaint (1st)
Date: 2019-07-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-11-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration; Case Management Conf...))
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2019-11-04T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: 2019-08-26T00:00:00First Amended Summons
Date: 2019-07-17T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-05-29T00:00:00Motion to Compel Arbitration
Date: 2019-11-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re: continuation of the 12/5/19;))
Date: 2019-11-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-05-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Post-Arbitration Status Conference))
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re: Stipulated Continuance;))
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review re: Stipulated Continuance;) of 09/25/2020)
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Notice of Settlement of Entire Case) of 11/04/2021)
Date: 2021-11-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Notice of Settlement of Entire Case))
Date: 2021-11-04T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2021-11-04T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2020-05-12T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-02-11T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2019-07-03T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: 2019-10-25T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.