Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Carbajal Dora, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case represented by Holmquist Marc A, Shegerian Carney Richard, against Davis Ross, Nellson Nutraceutical Llc, Solis Cindy, represented by Olsen Aaron Franklin, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Robert S. Draper presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert S. Draper Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management137 days |
Filing DateMay 23, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Complaint
Date: May 23, 2019Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Carney Richard Shegerian (Attorney)
Date: 2019-10-07T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-06-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Nellson Nutraceutical, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2019-10-10T00:00:00Request for Dismissal; Filed by: Dora Carbajal (Plaintiff)
Date: October 20, 2022Certificate of Mailing for (Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-25T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Dora Carbajal (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Dora Carbajal (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-09-20T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-05-23T00:00:00Association of Attorney; Filed by: Dora Carbajal (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-13T00:00:00Other - Final Ruling Re: Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-25T00:00:00Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: May 23, 2019Complaint
Date: May 23, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: May 23, 2019Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: May 23, 2019Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: June 17, 2019Motion to Compel Arbitration
Date: September 18, 2019Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: September 18, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: September 20, 2019Association of Attorney
Date: October 02, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: October 07, 2019Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: October 07, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: October 10, 2019Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: October 15, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)
Date: October 25, 2019Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER) OF 10/25/2019
Date: October 25, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: April 09, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: April 13, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/13/2020
Date: April 13, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: June 16, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: March 07, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-ARBITRATION STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: March 15, 2022Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: March 17, 2022Request for Dismissal
Date: October 20, 2022Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2019-10-07T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2019-09-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-09-20T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) (Amended)
Date: 2020-04-09T00:00:00Motion to Compel Arbitration
Date: 2019-09-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2019-06-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-04-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/13/2020)
Date: 2020-04-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2019-10-25T00:00:00Other - (Final Ruling Re: Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings)
Date: 2019-10-25T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-05-23T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-04-13T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-05-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2019-10-07T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (in support of Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceeding)
Date: 2019-09-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-05-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-10-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-09-20T00:00:00Association of Attorney
Date: 2019-10-02T00:00:00Reply ( TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY PROCEEDING)
Date: 2019-10-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration; Case Management Conf...))
Date: 2019-10-25T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of 10/25/2019)
Date: 2019-10-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Post-Arbitration Status Conference))
Date: 2020-07-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-06-16T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.