Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
JOHN MCKENNA VS FITNESS INTERNATIONAL, LLC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA LA FITNESS
On May 09, 2019 an other personal injury/property damage/wrongful death (general jurisdiction) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. Judge Jon R. Takasugi presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
May 09, 2019
Last Refreshed
September 06, 2023
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Filing Court House
Spring Street Courthouse
Category
Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Personal Injury
Case Outcome Type
Unknown disposition
Status
Voluntary Dismissal
Case Duration
7 months and 2 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 09, 2019 | Request for Dismissal | ||
December 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal Filed by John Mckenna (Plaintiff) |
|
June 18, 2019 | Demand for Jury Trial | ||
June 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
Demand for Jury Trial Filed by Fitness International, LLC, a California Corporation (Defendant) |
|
June 13, 2019 | Answer | ||
June 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
Answer Filed by Fitness International, LLC, a California Corporation (Defendant) |
|
May 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
Proof of Personal Service Filed by John Mckenna (Plaintiff) |
|
May 15, 2019 | PI General Order | ||
May 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order] and Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates) Filed by Clerk |
|
May 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
PI General Order Filed by Clerk |
|
May 09, 2019 | Civil Case Cover Sheet | ||
May 09, 2019 | Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case | ||
May 09, 2019 | Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT | ||
May 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk |
|
May 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed by John Mckenna (Plaintiff) |
|
May 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
Summons (on Complaint) Filed by John Mckenna (Plaintiff) |
|
May 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by John Mckenna (Plaintiff) |
|