Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Mcdaniels James Martin, filed a(n) Mass Torts - Torts case represented by Lira David R, Lira David R., against Auto Max Ventura, Ford Motor Co., represented by Lavere Matthew W., Odegaard Sarah G., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Georgina T. Rizk presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management127 days |
|
Filing DateMay 07, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeMass Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-08T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Ford Motor Co. (Defendant); As to: James Martin McDaniels (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Ford Motor Co. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Auto Max Ventura (Defendant)
Date: 2019-09-06T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Auto Max Ventura (Defendant); As to: James Martin McDaniels (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-28T00:00:00Case Management Order; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-09-11T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Ford Motor Co. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Continuance of Trial and Related Dates) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-03T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Ford Motor Co. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-06T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-05-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-08-05T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: David R. Lira (Attorney)
Date: 2020-10-15T00:00:00Declaration of Dan Rodman ISO Ford's MSJ/MSA; Filed by: Ford Motor Co. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-06T00:00:00Declaration of Ram Krishnaswami ISO Ford's MSJ/MSA; Filed by: Ford Motor Co. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-06T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer; Filed by: Ford Motor Co. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-06-20T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: James Martin McDaniels (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-28T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application; Filed by: Ford Motor Co. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Auto Max Ventura (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-11T00:00:00Notice Notice of Court Ruling Granting Motion for Summary Judgment; Filed by: Ford Motor Co. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment on Motion for Summary Judgment; Filed by: Ford Motor Co. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-19T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: May 07, 2019Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: May 07, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: May 07, 2019PI General Order
Date: May 08, 2019Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer
Date: June 20, 2019Answer
Date: June 28, 2019Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF TRANSFER TO INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT
Date: July 29, 2019Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 08/05/2019
Date: August 05, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: August 05, 2019Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: August 09, 2019Answer
Date: August 27, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: August 27, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: August 28, 2019Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: August 27, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: September 06, 2019Case Management Order
Date: September 11, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE:)
Date: September 11, 2019Notice - NOTICE FORD MOTOR COMPANY’S NOTICE OF PRIOR PAYMENT OF JURY FEES
Date: September 16, 2019Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/08/2020
Date: April 08, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: April 08, 2020Substitution of Attorney
Date: October 15, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL AND RELATED DATES)
Date: August 03, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION OF DAN RODMAN ISO FORD'S MSJ/MSA
Date: November 06, 2020Separate Statement
Date: November 06, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION OF RAM KRISHNASWAMI ISO FORD'S MSJ/MSA
Date: November 06, 2020Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application
Date: December 11, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDE...)
Date: December 18, 2020Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF COURT RULING GRANTING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: January 25, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE /POST-STATUS CONFERENCE RE: ...)
Date: February 10, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: February 11, 2021Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL AS TO DEFENDANT AUTO MAX VENTURA ONLY
Date: February 17, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: February 19, 2021Judgment - JUDGMENT (PROPOSED) ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: February 19, 2021Declaration (of Ram Krishnaswami ISO Ford's MSJ/MSA -[Res ID: _1118])
Date: 2020-11-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Continuance of Trial and Related Dates) of 08/03/2020)
Date: 2020-08-03T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment (, or in the alternative, Summary Adjudication -[Res ID: _1118])
Date: 2020-11-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 08/05/2019)
Date: 2019-08-05T00:00:00Declaration (of Dan Rodman ISO Ford's MSJ/MSA -[Res ID: _1118])
Date: 2020-11-06T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-08-27T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-06-28T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-05-07T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-05-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Continuance of Trial and Related Dates))
Date: 2020-08-03T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/08/2020)
Date: 2020-04-08T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2019-08-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order] and Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates)
Date: 2019-05-08T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Joint Stipulation to Continue Trial and Trial Related Deadlines; Order)
Date: 2020-04-08T00:00:00Case Management Order
Date: 2019-09-11T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2019-08-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-04-08T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-05-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Transfer of Complicated Personal Injury Case ...))
Date: 2019-07-25T00:00:00Notice (FORD MOTOR COMPANY?S NOTICE OF PRIOR PAYMENT OF JURY FEES)
Date: 2019-09-16T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Transfer to Independent Calendar Court)
Date: 2019-07-29T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2019-05-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-08-28T00:00:00PI General Order
Date: 2019-05-08T00:00:00Order (Re: Transfer of Complicated Personal Injury Case to Independent Calendar Court)
Date: 2019-07-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE:))
Date: 2019-09-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2019-08-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-09-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-08-27T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: James Martin McDaniels (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-09T00:00:00PI General Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-05-08T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Court Ruling Granting Motion for Summary Judgment -[Res ID: _1118])
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00Separate Statement (in support of MSJ/MSA -[Res ID: _1118])
Date: 2020-11-06T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Order (Granting Ex Parte Application for Order Advancing Hearing Date on Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00Answer (of Defendant Auto Max Ventura to Unverified Complaint)
Date: 2019-06-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application Ex Parte Application for Orde...))
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2020-10-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment by Defendant Ford Moto...))
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.