Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Pacific City Bank, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Sagara Shelley A., against Shin Joan, Shin John Suk Dba Tuska Cleaners, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Elizabeth Allen White presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateApril 29, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions158 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Case Cycle Time158 days |
Default entered as to John Suk Shin; On the Complaint filed by PACIFIC CITY BANK on
Date: 2019-06-13T00:00:00Request for Dismissal; Filed by: Pacific City Bank (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-09-09T00:00:00Summary of the Case; Filed by: Pacific City Bank (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-09-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Pacific City Bank (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-09-13T00:00:00Default entered as to Joan Shin; John Suk Shin; On the Complaint filed by PACIFIC CITY BANK on
Date: 2019-09-09T00:00:00Ruling; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-04T00:00:00Default entered as to Joan Shin; On the Complaint filed by PACIFIC CITY BANK on
Date: 2019-07-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-04-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Request for Default Judgment) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-04T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-04-29T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: April 29, 2019Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: April 29, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: April 29, 2019Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: April 29, 2019Complaint
Date: April 29, 2019Proof of Personal Service
Date: May 17, 2019Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: June 13, 2019Notice - NOTICE PROOF OF SERVICE (FOR REFERENCE ONLY)
Date: June 13, 2019Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: June 13, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION OF COSTS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT
Date: September 09, 2019Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: July 18, 2019Request for Dismissal
Date: September 09, 2019Summary of the Case
Date: September 09, 2019Proof of Service by Mail
Date: September 09, 2019Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: September 09, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION OF CHRIS YANG IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT
Date: September 09, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: September 13, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: REQUEST FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT)
Date: October 04, 2019Order - RULING
Date: October 04, 2019Judgment - DEFAULT JUDGMENT
Date: October 04, 2019Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims
Date: October 29, 2019Notice - NOTICE RE: ELECTRONIC WRIT
Date: November 12, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION OF POSTJUDGMENT INTEREST IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF EXECUTION
Date: November 12, 2019Writ of Execution - WRIT OF EXECUTION (LOS ANGELES)
Date: November 13, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION OF POST-JUDGMENT INTEREST IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF EXECUTION
Date: November 14, 2019Writ of Execution - WRIT OF EXECUTION (ORANGE)
Date: November 18, 2019Writ - Return
Date: June 11, 2020Writ - Return
Date: June 12, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-09-13T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2019-06-13T00:00:00Declaration (OF POST-JUDGMENT INTEREST IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF EXECUTION)
Date: 2019-11-14T00:00:00Summary of the Case
Date: 2019-09-09T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-05-17T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2019-04-29T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2019-04-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Request for Default Judgment))
Date: 2019-10-04T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Request for Default Judgment) of 10/04/2019)
Date: 2019-10-04T00:00:00Declaration (OF CHRIS YANG IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT)
Date: 2019-09-09T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2019-09-09T00:00:00Writ of Execution ((Los Angeles))
Date: 2019-11-13T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2019-07-18T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2019-09-09T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims
Date: 2019-10-29T00:00:00Ruling
Date: 2019-10-04T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-04-29T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-04-29T00:00:00Declaration (OF POSTJUDGMENT INTEREST IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF EXECUTION)
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-04-29T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2019-06-13T00:00:00Judgment (by Default)
Date: 2019-10-04T00:00:00Notice (PROOF OF SERVICE (FOR REFERENCE ONLY))
Date: 2019-06-13T00:00:00Declaration (OF COSTS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT)
Date: 2019-09-09T00:00:00Writ of Execution ((Orange))
Date: 2019-11-18T00:00:00Declaration (OF ACCRUED INTEREST IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT)
Date: 2019-09-09T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2019-09-09T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Notice (RE: ELECTRONIC WRIT)
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest
Date: 2019-11-14T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.