Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Cohan Farzaneh, Cohan Perry, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Chaiken Derek, against State Farm General Insurance Company, represented by Gargalis Christy, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Robert S. Draper presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management146 days |
|
Filing DateApril 12, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions179 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-04-12T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-05-07T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: State Farm General Insurance Company (Defendant)
Date: 2019-07-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Perry Cohan (Plaintiff); Farzaneh Cohan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: State Farm General Insurance Company (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Perry Cohan (Plaintiff); Farzaneh Cohan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-25T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Perry Cohan (Plaintiff); Farzaneh Cohan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-07-29T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: State Farm General Insurance Company (Defendant)
Date: 2020-05-13T00:00:00Case Management Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: State Farm General Insurance Company (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-14T00:00:00Opposition to Def's MSJ; Filed by: Perry Cohan (Plaintiff); Farzaneh Cohan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-03T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Perry Cohan (Plaintiff); Farzaneh Cohan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: April 12, 2019Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: April 12, 2019Complaint
Date: April 12, 2019Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: April 12, 2019Proof of Personal Service
Date: April 23, 2019Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: May 07, 2019Amended Complaint
Date: July 24, 2019Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: July 24, 2019Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: July 29, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: August 14, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: August 21, 2019Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: August 28, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: September 05, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF STATE FARM'S DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE
Date: September 09, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: November 13, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: November 25, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: December 03, 2019Case Management Order
Date: December 03, 2019Separate Statement
Date: May 13, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION OF AMY KUHLMAN IN OPPOSITION TO DEF'S MSJ
Date: November 18, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION OF PATRICK ARAKAWA; [PROPOSED] ORDER
Date: November 18, 2020Separate Statement
Date: November 18, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION OF DEREK S. CHAIKEN, ESQ. IN OPPOSITION TO DEF.S MSJ
Date: November 18, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION OF BARRY HABER IN OPPOSITION TO DEF.'S MSJ
Date: November 18, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION OF PERRY COHAN IN OPPOSITION TO DEF'S MSJ
Date: November 18, 2020Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEF'S MSJ
Date: November 18, 2020Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: December 02, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: November 30, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION)
Date: December 02, 2020Notice - NOTICE TRANSCRIPT OF PERRY COHAN'S EXAMINATION UNDER OATH FROM JUNE 20, 2018
Date: December 04, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER)
Date: December 03, 2020Order - RULING RE: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE SUMMARY ADJUDICATION
Date: December 04, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE JOINT STIPULATION REQUESTING CONTINUANCE OF TR...)
Date: February 23, 2021Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER REQUESTING CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL DATES
Date: February 23, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: November 19, 2021Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-04-23T00:00:00amended complaint
Date: 2019-07-24T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-04-12T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-04-12T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2019-07-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-08-14T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2020-05-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-11-13T00:00:00Amended Complaint (1st)
Date: 2019-07-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-08-21T00:00:00Declaration (of Perry Cohan in Opposition to Def's MSJ)
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2019-05-07T00:00:00Declaration (of Derek S. Chaiken, Esq. in Opposition to Def.s MSJ)
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Declaration (of Patrick Arakawa; [Proposed] Order)
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Joint Stipulation Requesting Continuance of S...))
Date: 2020-06-23T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2019-04-12T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2020-05-13T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2019-08-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (of Exhibits in Support of Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2020-05-14T00:00:00Answer (TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT)
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Cas...))
Date: 2019-10-08T00:00:00Declaration (Plaintiff's Additional Undisputed Materials Facts in Support of Plt's MSJ)
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2019-07-24T00:00:00Response (DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' OBJECTIONS TO THE DECLARATION OF PATRICK ARAKAWA)
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-04-12T00:00:00Notice (of Continuance of State Farm's Demurrer and Motion to Strike)
Date: 2019-09-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Adjudication))
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Opposition (to Def's MSJ)
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Stipulation - No Order (and Protective Order-Confidential Designations)
Date: 2020-06-23T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Case Management Order
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Declaration (of Amy Kuhlman in Opposition to Def's MSJ)
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Declaration (of Barry Haber in Opposition to Def.'s MSJ)
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Declaration (of Pat Arakawa in Support of State Farm's Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2020-05-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-11-25T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.