Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
The Estate Of Tej Pal Singh By And Through The Representative Of The Estate, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case against Singh Balbir M.D., represented by Bradford Thomas Robert Esq., Yeremian Arpineh Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Georgina T. Rizk presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 08, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-04-08T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Balbir Singh, M.D. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-14T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Balbir Singh, M.D. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-09-04T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts; Filed by: Balbir Singh, M.D. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00PI General Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-04-17T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference Request; Filed by: Balbir Singh, M.D. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-05-27T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by: Balbir Singh, M.D. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-14T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Balbir Singh, M.D. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-14T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Balbir Singh, M.D. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-05-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-17T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Balbir Singh, M.D. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-06-19T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference Request; Filed by: Balbir Singh, M.D. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-06-19T00:00:00Declaration of Donald Nortman, M.D. in Support of MSJ; Filed by: Balbir Singh, M.D. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Declaration of Susie Keshishyan, Esq. in Support of MSJ; Filed by: Balbir Singh, M.D. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Declaration of Irving Posalski, M.D. in Support of MSJ; Filed by: Balbir Singh, M.D. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Balbir Singh, M.D. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00Exhibit List; Filed by: Balbir Singh, M.D. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Balbir Singh, M.D. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: April 08, 2019Complaint
Date: April 08, 2019Answer
Date: May 14, 2019Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: April 08, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: April 08, 2019Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: May 07, 2019PI General Order
Date: April 17, 2019Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: May 14, 2019Demand for Jury Trial
Date: May 14, 2019Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: September 04, 2019Separate Statement
Date: September 04, 2019Reply - REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO RFP-01
Date: October 01, 2019Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts
Date: January 21, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))
Date: January 21, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL FROM MTC FURTHER DISC RESPS TO SROGS-01
Date: February 14, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL FROM MTC FURTHER DISC RESPS TO RFP-01
Date: February 14, 2020Answer - ANSWER AMENDED ANSWER
Date: May 06, 2020Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ORDER RE TRIAL CONTIUNACE
Date: May 07, 2020Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: May 07, 2020Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF COURT ORDER SETTING HEARING ON MOTION
Date: May 21, 2020Informal Discovery Conference - INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: May 27, 2020Separate Statement
Date: May 28, 2020Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: May 28, 2020Informal Discovery Conference - INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: June 19, 2020Separate Statement
Date: June 19, 2020Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: June 19, 2020Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF COURT ORDER SETTING INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE
Date: June 26, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: July 17, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: July 21, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))
Date: August 07, 2020Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: September 04, 2020Answer
Date: September 10, 2020Exhibit List
Date: January 08, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION OF DONALD NORTMAN, M.D. IN SUPPORT OF MSJ
Date: January 08, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION OF IRVING POSALSKI, M.D. IN SUPPORT OF MSJ
Date: January 08, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION OF SUSIE KESHISHYAN, ESQ. IN SUPPORT OF MSJ
Date: January 08, 2021Separate Statement
Date: January 08, 2021Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: January 08, 2021Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL DATE
Date: April 30, 2021Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF MSJ AND TRIAL DATES
Date: March 08, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: July 02, 2021Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF TAKING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OFF CALENDAR
Date: July 02, 2021Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2019-05-14T00:00:00PI General Order
Date: 2019-04-17T00:00:00Defendant Singh M.D.'s Notice of Motion and Motion to Special Interrogatories and Request for Sanctions
Date: 2019-09-04T00:00:00Motion for Leave to Amend (Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint)
Date: 2020-05-06T00:00:00Notice (of Withdrawal from MTC Further Disc Resps to SROGS-01)
Date: 2020-02-14T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Court Order Setting Hearing on Motion)
Date: 2020-05-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)))
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Answer (Amended answer)
Date: 2020-05-06T00:00:00Notice (of Withdrawal from MTC Further Disc Resps to RFP-01)
Date: 2020-02-14T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: 2019-05-07T00:00:00Declaration (of Trial Attorney Pursuant to Section 9 of the California Rules of Court)
Date: 2019-05-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Setting of Informal Discovery Conference;))
Date: 2020-05-27T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2019-05-14T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-05-07T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2019-04-08T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order] and Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates)
Date: 2019-04-17T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-04-08T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-05-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Setting of Informal Discovery Conference;) of 05/27/2020)
Date: 2020-05-27T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-04-08T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-04-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses to Sp...))
Date: 2019-10-03T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order Re: Setting of Hearing Date on Motion for Leave t...).....COVID-19)
Date: 2020-05-08T00:00:00Stipulation and Order ([Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial)
Date: 2020-05-01T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference (Request)
Date: 2020-05-27T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Order re Trial Contiunace)
Date: 2020-05-07T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Stipulation Continuing Trial Date and Related Dates: Order thereon)
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF COURT ORDER SETTING INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE)
Date: 2020-06-26T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-07-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 07/17/2020)
Date: 2020-07-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC); Court Order Re: Transfe...))
Date: 2020-07-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Setting of Hearing Date on Motion to Compel ...))
Date: 2020-06-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)))
Date: 2020-08-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Reassignment to an Independent Calendar Court))
Date: 2020-07-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-07-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Setting of Hearing Date on Motion to Compel ...))
Date: 2020-05-29T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-09-10T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2020-06-19T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2020-05-28T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference (Request)
Date: 2020-06-19T00:00:00Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department T, Shirley K. Watkins, Presiding Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Not Held - Vacated by Court Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Not Held - Vacated by Court Judge: Shirley K. Watkins |
|
April 04, 2022 | Hearing |
Department T at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401 Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal |
|
February 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department T, Shirley K. Watkins, Presiding Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court Judge: Shirley K. Watkins |
|
January 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department T, Shirley K. Watkins, Presiding Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court Judge: Shirley K. Watkins |
|
October 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Department T, Shirley K. Watkins, Presiding Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation Judge: Shirley K. Watkins |
|
September 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Department T, Shirley K. Watkins, Presiding Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation Judge: Shirley K. Watkins |
|
July 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Department T, Shirley K. Watkins, Presiding Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Vacated by Court Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Vacated by Court Judge: Shirley K. Watkins |
|
July 06, 2021 | Hearing | Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department T Not Held - Vacated by Court on | |
July 06, 2021 | Hearing | Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment scheduled for in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department T Not Held - Vacated by Court on | |
July 06, 2021 | Hearing | Final Status Conference scheduled for in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department T Not Held - Vacated by Court on |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.