Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Dominguez Guadalupe, James Dorothy, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Goldsman Gene, against Hittelman Stunk Llp, Ma Hungi, represented by Wang Arnold, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Christopher K. Lui presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeChristopher K. Lui Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 04, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-04-04T00:00:00PI General Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-04-11T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Notice of Settlement) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-07-21T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Hungi Ma (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: April 04, 2019Complaint
Date: April 04, 2019Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: April 04, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: April 04, 2019PI General Order
Date: April 11, 2019Proof of Personal Service
Date: April 26, 2019Request for Dismissal
Date: June 07, 2019Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion
Date: September 03, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: October 22, 2020Notice of Settlement
Date: July 21, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT)
Date: July 21, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: September 20, 2021Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Notice of Settlement)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Defendant Hungi Ma's Motion to Compel Plaintiff Guadalupe Dom...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-20T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Guadalupe Dominguez (Plaintiff); Dorothy James (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-04-26T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Guadalupe Dominguez (Plaintiff); Dorothy James (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-04-04T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Guadalupe Dominguez (Plaintiff); Dorothy James (Plaintiff)
Date: September 20, 2021PI General Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-04-11T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Guadalupe Dominguez (Plaintiff); Dorothy James (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-04-04T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Guadalupe Dominguez (Plaintiff); Dorothy James (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2019-04-04T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Hungi Ma (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Guadalupe Dominguez (Plaintiff); Dorothy James (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-07T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-04-04T00:00:00Notice of Settlement Filed by Guadalupe Dominguez (Plaintiff); Dorothy James (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Notice of Settlement) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-21T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-04-04T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-04-04T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order] and Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates)
Date: 2019-04-12T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2019-04-04T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-04-04T00:00:00PI General Order
Date: 2019-04-11T00:00:00Answer (OF DEFENDANT HUNGI MA TO COMPLAINT OF PLAINTIFFS GUADALUPE DOMINGUEZ AND DOROTHY JAMES)
Date: 2019-05-15T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-04-26T00:00:00Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion
Date: 2020-09-03T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2019-06-07T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.