Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Thannhaeuser Christopher, Tkh Zuma Llc, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Kitson Robert M, against Keshen Mary Anne, Tkh Zuma Llc, Thannhaeuser Christopher, represented by Keshen Mary Anne, Kordestani Harrison Pierce, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Samantha Jessner presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSamantha Jessner Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management297 days |
Filing DateApril 02, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Case Management Statement; Filed by: TKH ZUMA, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-16T00:00:00General Denial; Filed by: TKH ZUMA, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2019-10-04T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Christopher Thannhaeuser (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: TKH ZUMA, LLC (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Move for New Trial; Filed by: TKH ZUMA, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-11-30T00:00:00Declaration DECLARATION OF ROBERT M. KITSON; Filed by: Christopher Thannhaeuser (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00Declaration of Robert M. Kitson; Filed by: Christopher Thannhaeuser (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00Motion for Leave to File Amend Answer; Filed by: TKH ZUMA, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-25T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment; Filed by: TKH ZUMA, LLC (Defendant); As to: TKH ZUMA, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Christopher Thannhaeuser (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-06T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-02-17T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-01-10T00:00:00Reply to Opposition to MSJ; Filed by: TKH ZUMA, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-31T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-; Filed by: TKH ZUMA, LLC (Appellant)
Date: 2022-02-15T00:00:00Opposition to Demurrer; Filed by: TKH ZUMA, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-17T00:00:00Reply REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL; Filed by: TKH ZUMA, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-12T00:00:00Reply TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR AN UNDERTAKING: Filed by: TKH ZUMA, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-12T00:00:00Notice Notice of Entry of Judgment; Filed by: Christopher Thannhaeuser (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-07T00:00:00Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney's Fees; Filed by: TKH ZUMA, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-21T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Christopher Thannhaeuser (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-18T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: TKH ZUMA, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Christopher Thannhaeuser (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Notice of Lodging RE Exh. 7 to PL Opposition of Def. MSJ; Filed by: Christopher Thannhaeuser (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-31T00:00:00Motion to Continue Trial Date; Filed by: TKH ZUMA, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-16T00:00:00Objection to Final Judgment; Filed by: TKH ZUMA, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-05T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: TKH ZUMA, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-11-01T00:00:00Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal (Unlimited Civil) "U"; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-05-09T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP- "U"; Filed by: TKH ZUMA, LLC (Appellant)
Date: 2022-05-10T00:00:00Declaration of Robert M. Kitson, Esq. Filed by: Christopher Thannhaeuser (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-07T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: TKH ZUMA, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-08T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Christopher Thannhaeuser (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-08T00:00:00Trial Brief; Filed by: Christopher Thannhaeuser (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-01T00:00:00Motion to Vacate Tentative Judgment; Filed by: TKH ZUMA, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-12-01T00:00:00Notice Notice of Non-waiver of Jury Trial; Filed by: TKH ZUMA, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00Witness List; Filed by: Christopher Thannhaeuser (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-01T00:00:00Exhibit List PLAINTIFF?S EXHIBIT LIST; Filed by: Christopher Thannhaeuser (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00Request to Take Judicial Notice; Filed by: TKH ZUMA, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-12-30T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application; Filed by: TKH ZUMA, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-19T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Christopher Thannhaeuser (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-02T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Christopher Thannhaeuser (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-06T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Christopher Thannhaeuser (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-14T00:00:00Brief Memorandum in Support of Motion for New Trial; Filed by: TKH ZUMA, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-12-10T00:00:00Notice of Trial Proceedings; Filed by: Christopher Thannhaeuser (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-04T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Motion for New Trial Intention) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-12-09T00:00:00Declaration Declaration of Robert M. Kitson, Esq. Filed by: Christopher Thannhaeuser (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-14T00:00:00Notice of Trial Proceedings; Filed by: Christopher Thannhaeuser (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-02T00:00:00Motion for Reconsideration; Filed by: TKH ZUMA, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-04T00:00:00Exhibit List; Filed by: Christopher Thannhaeuser (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-01T00:00:00Declaration of David M. Williamson; Filed by: Christopher Thannhaeuser (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-07T00:00:00Declaration of Philip Shakhnis; Filed by: Christopher Thannhaeuser (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-07T00:00:00Appeal Document B318438; APPLICATION FOR EXTENTION OF TIME; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-02-22T00:00:00Declaration of Robert M. Kitson, Esq. Filed by: Christopher Thannhaeuser (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-20T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Christopher Thannhaeuser (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-07T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Christopher Thannhaeuser (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-20T00:00:00Objection Plaintiff's Objections to Evidence Submitted; Filed by: Christopher Thannhaeuser (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-20T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-; Filed by: Christopher Thannhaeuser (Respondent)
Date: 2022-03-08T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-01-07T00:00:00Opposition to Plaintiff's Memorandum of Costs; Filed by: TKH ZUMA, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-21T00:00:00Appeal - Reporter Appeal Transcript Process Fee Paid; Filed by: Christopher Thannhaeuser (Respondent)
Date: 2022-04-26T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Christopher Thannhaeuser (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-07T00:00:00Notice of Withdrawal; Filed by: TKH ZUMA, LLC (Defendant); As to: Christopher Thannhaeuser (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-02T00:00:00Reply to Opposition to Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission; Filed by: TKH ZUMA, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2022-02-02T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Default Issued NOA: B318438; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-04-05T00:00:00Appeal - Reporter Appeal Transcripts Deposit Paid; Filed by:
Date: 2022-04-26T00:00:00Request Request for Refund; Filed by: TKH ZUMA, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2022-03-02T00:00:00Appeal - Notice Court Reporter to Prepare Appeal Transcript NOA ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-05-12T00:00:00Appeal - Clerk's Transcript Fee Paid Paid for Christopher Thannhaeuser; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-01-03T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Default Issued N.O.A. ; B318438 AUGMENTATION; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-01-31T00:00:00Appeal - Notice Court Reporter to Correct/Augment Transcript N.O.A. ; B318438; AUGMENT; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-03-03T00:00:00Appeal - Clerk's Transcript Fee Paid RESPONDENT PAID $635.50; Filed by:
Date: 2022-10-11T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Default Issued N.O.A. ; B321283 "U"; Filed by: Clerk
Date: August 29, 2023Appeal - Original Clerk's Transcript 1 Volumes Certified; Filed by: Clerk
Date: March 20, 2023Appeal - Notice of Fees Due for Clerk's Transcript on Appeal N.O.A. ; B321283; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-12-21T00:00:00Appeal - Clerk's Transcript Fee Paid Paid for TKH ZUMA LLC; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-12-29T00:00:00Appeal - Notice Vacating Notice of Default or Non-Compliance; N.O.A. ; B318438; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-03-03T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Fees Due for Clerk's Transcript on Appeal NOA B18STCP02942; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-09-07T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Fees Due for Clerk's Transcript on Appeal N.O.A ; B318438; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-09-27T00:00:00Appeal - Clerk's Transcript Fee Paid Paid for TkH Zuma LLC; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-10-07T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-03T00:00:00General Denial; Filed by: TKH ZUMA, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application; Filed by: TKH ZUMA, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion for Leave to File a Cross-Complaint) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Motion for Change of Venue; Filed by: Mary Anne Keshen (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-29T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Christopher Thannhaeuser (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-06T00:00:00Reply to Opposition to Motion for Change of Venue; Filed by: TKH ZUMA, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-06-25T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: TKH ZUMA, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Christopher Thannhaeuser (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-05-11T00:00:00Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Change of Venue; Filed by: Christopher Thannhaeuser (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-07T00:00:00Declaration of Christopher Thannhaeuser; Filed by: Christopher Thannhaeuser (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Motion for Leave to File a Cross-Complaint; Filed by: TKH ZUMA, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-18T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by: Christopher Thannhaeuser (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00Declaration of Dennis Beesley; Filed by: Christopher Thannhaeuser (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by: Christopher Thannhaeuser (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-19T00:00:00Motion for Order Motion for Undertaking; Filed by: TKH ZUMA, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-25T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-03-25T00:00:00Judgment After Non-Jury Trial; Signed and Filed by: Christopher Thannhaeuser (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-03T00:00:00Witness List; Filed by: Christopher Thannhaeuser (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00Motion to Stay Execution; Filed by: TKH ZUMA, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-28T00:00:00Objection with Exhibits; Filed by: TKH ZUMA, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-11-17T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-04-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: TKH ZUMA, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Reply to Opposition to Motion for Change of Venue; Filed by: TKH ZUMA, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-14T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Christopher Thannhaeuser (Respondent)
Date: 2022-03-23T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading); Filed by: Christopher Thannhaeuser (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-05-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order re Peremptory Challenge) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-08-21T00:00:00Notice of Related Case; Filed by: TKH ZUMA, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-28T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment; Filed by: TKH ZUMA, LLC (Defendant); As to: TKH ZUMA, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Status Conference Statement; Filed by: Christopher Thannhaeuser (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Christopher Thannhaeuser (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-06T00:00:00Motion for Change of Venue; Filed by: TKH ZUMA, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-21T00:00:00Declaration of David Williamson; Filed by: Christopher Thannhaeuser (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Request JOINT REQUEST TO WITHDRAW CONFERENCE PROGRAM; Filed by: Christopher Thannhaeuser (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-29T00:00:00Objection to Declaration of Mary Anne Keshen; Filed by: Christopher Thannhaeuser (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Christopher Thannhaeuser (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-19T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-08-21T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Christopher Thannhaeuser (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-09T00:00:00Opposition to Motion to Compel Discovery and for Sanctions; Filed by: TKH ZUMA, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-06-19T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Christopher Thannhaeuser (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Appeal - Court Reporter Waiver of Transcript Deposit; Filed by: Christopher Thannhaeuser (Respondent)
Date: 2022-03-23T00:00:00Appeal - Court Reporter Waiver of Transcript Deposit; Filed by: Christopher Thannhaeuser (Respondent)
Date: 2022-04-26T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Christopher Thannhaeuser (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-06T00:00:00Declaration (of Robert M. Kitson, Esq.) Filed by Christopher Thannhaeuser (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-17T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Christopher Thannhaeuser (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-25T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Christopher Thannhaeuser (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-04-02T00:00:00General Denial Filed by TKH ZUMA, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendant's Motion for Change of Venue) Filed by Christopher Thannhaeuser (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Motion for Leave to File a Cross-Complaint Filed by TKH ZUMA, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-18T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Christopher Thannhaeuser (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-04-20T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike Filed by Christopher Thannhaeuser (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-19T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) Filed by Mary Anne Keshen (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-20T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Christopher Thannhaeuser (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-08T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Christopher Thannhaeuser (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00Motion for Change of Venue Filed by TKH ZUMA, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-09-25T00:00:00Reply (to Opposition to MSJ) Filed by TKH ZUMA, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-31T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Christopher Thannhaeuser (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-04-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re Peremptory Challenge) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-08-21T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion to Compel Discovery and for Sanctions) Filed by TKH ZUMA, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-06-19T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Christopher Thannhaeuser (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-09T00:00:00Reply (to Opposition to Motion for Change of Venue) Filed by TKH ZUMA, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-06-25T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt Filed by Christopher Thannhaeuser (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-15T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Christopher Thannhaeuser (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-09-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Leave to File a Cross-Complaint)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (Motion to Continue Trial) Filed by TKH ZUMA, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-19T00:00:00Witness List Filed by Christopher Thannhaeuser (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-01T00:00:00Notice (of Trial Proceedings) Filed by Christopher Thannhaeuser (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-02T00:00:00Opposition to Motion to Strike Cross-Complaint; Filed by: TKH ZUMA, LLC (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-09-09T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Christopher Thannhaeuser (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00Notice of Change Address; Filed by: TKH ZUMA, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-12-08T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-17T00:00:00Reply to Defendant's Opposition to Demurrer; Filed by: Christopher Thannhaeuser (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-06T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Christopher Thannhaeuser (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-09T00:00:00Motion for Change of Venue; Filed by: TKH ZUMA, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Witness List; Filed by: Christopher Thannhaeuser (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-02T00:00:00Updated -- Motion for Change of Venue: Filed By: TKH ZUMA, LLC (Defendant); Result: Denied; Result Date:
Date: 2020-07-02T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-09-25T00:00:00Cross-Complaint; Filed by: TKH ZUMA, LLC (Defendant); As to: Christopher Thannhaeuser (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-01-24T00:00:00Declaration of Robert M. Kitson, Esq. Filed by: Christopher Thannhaeuser (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Christopher Thannhaeuser (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Declaration of Robert M. Kitson, Esq. Filed by: Christopher Thannhaeuser (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00Notice of Hearing on Petition; Filed by: TKH ZUMA, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Christopher Thannhaeuser (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by TKH ZUMA, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-16T00:00:00Cross-Complaint Filed by TKH ZUMA, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re: AMENDED NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-30T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Christopher Thannhaeuser (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-06T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment Filed by TKH ZUMA, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Change of Venue)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-02T00:00:00Request (JOINT REQUEST TO WITHDRAW CONFERENCE PROGRAM) Filed by Christopher Thannhaeuser (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-29T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-04-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Change of Venue)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-01-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-11-03T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-08-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by TKH ZUMA, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Withdrawal of Demand for Jury Trial) Filed by Christopher Thannhaeuser (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-05T00:00:00Exhibit List (PLAINTIFF?S EXHIBIT LIST) Filed by Christopher Thannhaeuser (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re Peremptory Challenge)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-08-21T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by Christopher Thannhaeuser (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Motion for Change of Venue Filed by Mary Anne Keshen (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-29T00:00:00Reply (TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR AN UNDERTAKING:) Filed by TKH ZUMA, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-12T00:00:00Reply (to Opposition to Motion for Change of Venue) Filed by TKH ZUMA, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-14T00:00:00Notice (to Withdraw Motion for Summary Judgment) Filed by TKH ZUMA, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Amended Cross-Complaint ( (1st)) Filed by TKH ZUMA, LLC (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-02-17T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Christopher Thannhaeuser (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-05-11T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Move for New Trial Filed by TKH ZUMA, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-11-30T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application Filed by TKH ZUMA, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Minute Order ((Final Status Conference; Status Conference Re: Mediation)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-08T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion for Leave to File a Cross-Complaint) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by TKH ZUMA, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-08T00:00:00Objection (with Exhibits) Filed by TKH ZUMA, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-11-17T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-03T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by TKH ZUMA, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Declaration (of Christopher Thannhaeuser) Filed by Christopher Thannhaeuser (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Leave to Amend Motion to Amend Answer)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-28T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION OF ROBERT M. KITSON) Filed by Christopher Thannhaeuser (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application Filed by TKH ZUMA, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-19T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by TKH ZUMA, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-11-01T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion to Strike Cross-Complaint) Filed by TKH ZUMA, LLC (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-09-09T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Christopher Thannhaeuser (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-27T00:00:00Reply (to Defendant's Opposition to Demurrer) Filed by Christopher Thannhaeuser (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-06T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (Renewed Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial) Filed by TKH ZUMA, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-26T00:00:00Status Conference Statement Filed by Christopher Thannhaeuser (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION BY PLAINTIFF (CHRISTOPHER THA...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-12-03T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Christopher Thannhaeuser (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Opposition (to Demurrer) Filed by TKH ZUMA, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-17T00:00:00Declaration (of Dennis Beesley) Filed by Christopher Thannhaeuser (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Notice of Hearing on Petition Filed by TKH ZUMA, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Motion for Change of Venue Filed by TKH ZUMA, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-21T00:00:00Notice (of Statutory Prohibition to Appear at Trial) Filed by TKH ZUMA, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-11-01T00:00:00Notice of Related Case Filed by TKH ZUMA, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-28T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Christopher Thannhaeuser (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-02T00:00:00Judgment (After Non-Jury Trial) Filed by Christopher Thannhaeuser (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-03T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Christopher Thannhaeuser (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-19T00:00:00Declaration of Notice (DECLARATION RE: EX PARTE NOTICE:) Filed by TKH ZUMA, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-26T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Christopher Thannhaeuser (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Notice of Limited Scope Representation Filed by TKH ZUMA, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-11-17T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Non-waiver of Jury Trial) Filed by TKH ZUMA, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00Declaration (of Robert M. Kitson) Filed by Christopher Thannhaeuser (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application Ex Parte Application for Cont...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by TKH ZUMA, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Notice (of Trial Proceedings) Filed by Christopher Thannhaeuser (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-09T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Christopher Thannhaeuser (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Advance Noticed Motion for...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-01T00:00:00Objection (to Final Judgment) Filed by TKH ZUMA, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Advance Noticed Motion for...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-03T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary) Filed by Christopher Thannhaeuser (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-22T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Entry of Judgment) Filed by Christopher Thannhaeuser (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-07T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Robert M. Kitson, Esq.) Filed by Christopher Thannhaeuser (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-14T00:00:00Brief (Memorandum in Support of Motion for New Trial) Filed by TKH ZUMA, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-12-10T00:00:00Declaration (of Robert M. Kitson, Esq.) Filed by Christopher Thannhaeuser (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-20T00:00:00Notice (of Change Address) Filed by TKH ZUMA, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-12-08T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Christopher Thannhaeuser (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for New Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-07T00:00:00Declaration (of David M. Williamson) Filed by Christopher Thannhaeuser (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-07T00:00:00Motion to Stay Execution Filed by TKH ZUMA, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-28T00:00:00Request (to Take Judicial Notice) Filed by TKH ZUMA, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-12-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Motion for New Trial Intention)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-12-09T00:00:00Reply (to Opposition to Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission) Filed by TKH ZUMA, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2022-02-02T00:00:00Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice Filed by TKH ZUMA, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-12-21T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-07T00:00:00Notice (of Withdrawal) Filed by TKH ZUMA, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2022-02-02T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Christopher Thannhaeuser (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-06T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (for Pro Hac Vice Admission) Filed by TKH ZUMA, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-26T00:00:00Opposition (to Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney's Fees) Filed by TKH ZUMA, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-21T00:00:00Declaration (of Robert M. Kitson, Esq.) Filed by Christopher Thannhaeuser (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-07T00:00:00Opposition (to Plaintiff's Memorandum of Costs) Filed by TKH ZUMA, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-21T00:00:00Objection (Plaintiff's Objections to Evidence Submitted) Filed by Christopher Thannhaeuser (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Motion for New Trial Intention) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-12-09T00:00:00Notice (of Withdrawal of Motion for New Trial) Filed by TKH ZUMA, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-27T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by Christopher Thannhaeuser (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-07T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims Filed by Christopher Thannhaeuser (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-12T00:00:00Notice (of Limited Scope Appearance of Counsel) Filed by TKH ZUMA, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-31T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-24T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed Filed by TKH ZUMA, LLC (Appellant)
Date: 2022-02-03T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-10T00:00:00Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal (Unlimited Civil) ("U") Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-09T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Christopher Thannhaeuser (Respondent)
Date: 2022-03-08T00:00:00Appeal Record Delivered Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-11-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-25T00:00:00Appeal Document (B318438; APPLICATION FOR EXTENTION OF TIME) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-22T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP- Filed by TKH ZUMA, LLC (Appellant)
Date: 2022-02-15T00:00:00Appeal Record Delivered Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-01-27T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Default Issued (NOA: B318438) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-04-05T00:00:00Declaration (of Philip Shakhnis) Filed by Christopher Thannhaeuser (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-07T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Fees Due for Clerk's Transcript on Appeal (N.O.A ; B318438) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-09-27T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Christopher Thannhaeuser (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-07T00:00:00Notice of Limited Scope Representation Filed by TKH ZUMA, LLC (Appellant)
Date: 2022-03-24T00:00:00Motion for Reconsideration Filed by TKH ZUMA, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-04T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-16T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Fees Due for Clerk's Transcript on Appeal (NOA B18STCP02942) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-09-07T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Christopher Thannhaeuser (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-18T00:00:00Request (Request for Refund) Filed by TKH ZUMA, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2022-03-02T00:00:00Appeal Document Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-31T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Default Issued (N.O.A. ; B318438 AUGMENTATION) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-01-31T00:00:00Appeal - Clerk's Transcript Fee Paid (Paid for Christopher Thannhaeuser) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-01-03T00:00:00Notice (Amended Notice of Limited Scope Appearance of Counsel) Filed by TKH ZUMA, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2022-03-15T00:00:00Appeal - Notice Court Reporter to Prepare Appeal Transcript (NOA ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-25T00:00:00Appeal - Clerk's Transcript Fee Paid (Paid for TKH ZUMA LLC) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-29T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Fees Due for Clerk's Transcript on Appeal (N.O.A. ; B321283) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-21T00:00:00Appeal - Reporter Appeal Transcript Process Fee Paid Filed by Christopher Thannhaeuser (Respondent)
Date: 2022-04-26T00:00:00Appeal - Clerk's Transcript Fee Paid (Paid for TkH Zuma LLC) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-07T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP- ("U") Filed by TKH ZUMA, LLC (Appellant)
Date: 2022-05-10T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Pleadings Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-22T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application Advance Motion to Continue He...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-23T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed ("U" Appeal) Filed by TKH ZUMA, LLC (Appellant)
Date: 2022-04-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Post ADR))
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00Declaration (of Robert M. Kitson, Esq.)
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00Declaration (of Christopher Thannhaeuser)
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Declaration (of Dennis Beesley)
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00Objection (to Declaration of Mary Anne Keshen)
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Declaration (of David Williamson)
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Declaration (of Robert M. Kitson, Esq.)
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (RE Exh. 7 to PL Opposition of Def. MSJ)
Date: 2020-12-31T00:00:00Reply (to Opposition to MSJ)
Date: 2020-12-31T00:00:00Response (TO PLAINTIFF?S OBJECTION TO DEFENDANT?S SEPARATE STATEMENT AND NEW DECLARATIONS AND EXHIBITS:)
Date: 2021-01-04T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application Ex Parte Application for Cont...))
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (Ex Parte Application for Continuance)
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Notice (of Ruling on Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment))
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Notice (to Withdraw Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-03-19T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Opposition (to Demurrer)
Date: 2021-02-17T00:00:00Notice of Hearing on Petition
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Amended Cross-Complaint ( (1st))
Date: 2021-02-17T00:00:00Reply (to Defendant's Opposition to Demurrer)
Date: 2021-04-06T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-04-06T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2021-03-19T00:00:00Motion for Order (Motion for Undertaking)
Date: 2021-03-25T00:00:00Motion for Leave (to File Amend Answer)
Date: 2021-03-25T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2021-04-15T00:00:00Notice (Plaintiff Clarification Re Demurrer Pleadings Filed)
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Hearing on De...))
Date: 2021-04-15T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-04-16T00:00:00Motion to Continue Trial Date
Date: 2021-04-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Leave to Amend Motion to Amend Answer))
Date: 2021-04-28T00:00:00Reply (REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL)
Date: 2021-05-12T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION OF ROBERT M. KITSON)
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00Declaration (of Robert M. Kitson)
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Continue Trial)
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00Reply (TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR AN UNDERTAKING:)
Date: 2021-05-12T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2021-05-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Order Motion for Undertaking; Hearing o...))
Date: 2021-05-24T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-06-09T00:00:00Statement of the Case (PLAINTIFF?S STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT RE: STATUS OF SETTING MEDIATION)
Date: 2021-06-08T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-05-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2021-06-09T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00Notice (of Unavailability of Counsel)
Date: 2021-07-20T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Non-waiver of Jury Trial)
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00Status Conference Statement
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Withdrawal of Demand for Jury Trial)
Date: 2021-10-05T00:00:00Exhibit List (PLAINTIFF?S EXHIBIT LIST)
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2021-10-08T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2021-10-08T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-10-08T00:00:00Minute Order ((Final Status Conference; Status Conference Re: Mediation))
Date: 2021-10-08T00:00:00Request (to Re-Calendar Hearings on Plaintiff's Motions in Limine 1-3)
Date: 2021-10-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application Motion to Continue Trial))
Date: 2021-10-20T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial)
Date: 2021-10-19T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (Motion to Continue Trial)
Date: 2021-10-19T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application
Date: 2021-10-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial))
Date: 2021-10-27T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Renewed Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial)
Date: 2021-10-26T00:00:00Notice (Plaintiff's Notice of Ruling on Defendant's Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial)
Date: 2021-10-27T00:00:00Declaration of Notice (DECLARATION RE: EX PARTE NOTICE:)
Date: 2021-10-26T00:00:00Notice (of Statutory Prohibition to Appear at Trial)
Date: 2021-11-01T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (Renewed Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial)
Date: 2021-10-26T00:00:00Trial Brief
Date: 2021-11-01T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2021-11-01T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-11-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Jury Trial))
Date: 2021-11-02T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2021-11-01T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2021-11-01T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2021-11-02T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2021-11-02T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-11-02T00:00:00Notice (of Trial Proceedings)
Date: 2021-11-02T00:00:00Notice of Limited Scope Representation
Date: 2021-11-17T00:00:00Notice (of Trial Proceedings)
Date: 2021-11-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Jury Trial))
Date: 2021-11-03T00:00:00Notice (of Plaintiff's [Proposed] Judgment After Non-Jury Trial)
Date: 2021-11-10T00:00:00Objection (with Exhibits)
Date: 2021-11-17T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Move for New Trial
Date: 2021-11-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION BY PLAINTIFF (CHRISTOPHER THA...))
Date: 2021-12-03T00:00:00Motion to Vacate (Tentative Judgment)
Date: 2021-12-01T00:00:00Judgment (After Non-Jury Trial)
Date: 2021-12-03T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Entry of Judgment)
Date: 2021-12-07T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-12-06T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-12-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Motion for New Trial Intention))
Date: 2021-12-09T00:00:00Brief (Memorandum in Support of Motion for New Trial)
Date: 2021-12-10T00:00:00Notice (of Change Address)
Date: 2021-12-08T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Motion for New Trial Intention) of 12/09/2021)
Date: 2021-12-09T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Robert M. Kitson, Esq.)
Date: 2021-12-14T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion for a New Trial)
Date: 2021-12-20T00:00:00Declaration (of Robert M. Kitson, Esq.)
Date: 2021-12-20T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-12-20T00:00:00Objection (Plaintiff's Objections to Evidence Submitted)
Date: 2021-12-20T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: 2021-12-22T00:00:00Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice
Date: 2021-12-21T00:00:00Objection (to Defendant's Untimely Reply and Request for Judicial Notice)
Date: 2022-01-03T00:00:00Notice (Of Withdrawal of Motion to Set Aside or Otherwise Vacate Tentative Judgment)
Date: 2021-12-21T00:00:00Reply (to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion for a New Trial)
Date: 2021-12-30T00:00:00Objection (to Final Judgment)
Date: 2022-01-05T00:00:00Request (to Take Judicial Notice)
Date: 2021-12-30T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment
Date: 2022-01-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for New Trial))
Date: 2022-01-07T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims
Date: 2022-01-12T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment
Date: 2022-01-10T00:00:00Notice (of Withdrawal of Motion for New Trial)
Date: 2022-01-05T00:00:00Reply (to Plaintiff's Objections to Defendant's Reply and Request for Judicial Notice)
Date: 2022-01-05T00:00:00Opposition (to Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney's Fees)
Date: 2022-01-21T00:00:00Opposition (to Plaintiff's Memorandum of Costs)
Date: 2022-01-21T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (for Pro Hac Vice Admission)
Date: 2022-01-26T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Ex Parte Application to Stay Enforcement of Judgment)
Date: 2022-01-31T00:00:00Declaration (of Philip Shakhnis)
Date: 2022-02-07T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendant's Ex Parte Application for Pro Hac Vice)
Date: 2022-01-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Advance Noticed Motion for...))
Date: 2022-02-01T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment
Date: 2022-01-24T00:00:00Declaration (of David M. Williamson)
Date: 2022-02-07T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2022-02-07T00:00:00Notice (of Limited Scope Appearance of Counsel)
Date: 2022-01-31T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed
Date: 2022-02-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Advance Noticed Motion for...))
Date: 2022-02-03T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal
Date: 2022-02-16T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to Advance Noticed Motion for Stay of Execution of Judgment)
Date: 2022-02-02T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to Advance Noticed Motion for Stay of Execution of Judgment)
Date: 2022-01-31T00:00:00Declaration (of Robert M. Kitson, Esq.)
Date: 2022-02-07T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-02-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission))
Date: 2022-01-27T00:00:00Notice (of Withdrawal)
Date: 2022-02-02T00:00:00Request (to Re-Set Hearing Date of Plaintiff's Motion for an Award of Attorney's Fees)
Date: 2022-02-14T00:00:00Opposition (to Plaintiff's Notice of Motion and Motion for an Award of Contractual Attorney's Fees)
Date: 2022-02-18T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103
Date: 2022-02-15T00:00:00Reply (to Opposition to Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission)
Date: 2022-02-02T00:00:00Motion to Stay Execution
Date: 2022-01-28T00:00:00Motion re: (for an Award of Contractual Attorneys Fees Pursuant to Civil Code 1717)
Date: 2022-02-07T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103 (Respondent)
Date: 2022-03-08T00:00:00Opposition (to Def Ex Parte Application to Continue Hearing on Fee Motion)
Date: 2022-03-22T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-03-18T00:00:00Notice (of Re-Set Hearing Date on Plaintiff's Motion for an Award of Attorneys Fees)
Date: 2022-02-23T00:00:00Notice (Amended Notice of Limited Scope Appearance of Counsel)
Date: 2022-03-15T00:00:00Request (Request for Refund)
Date: 2022-03-02T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Pleadings
Date: 2022-02-22T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-03-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application Advance Motion to Continue He...))
Date: 2022-03-23T00:00:00Notice of Limited Scope Representation
Date: 2022-03-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Christopher Thannhaeuser (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading) Filed by Christopher Thannhaeuser (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-05-06T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Christopher Thannhaeuser (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Post ADR)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Hearing on De...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-05-11T00:00:00Declaration (of Robert M. Kitson, Esq.) Filed by Christopher Thannhaeuser (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Christopher Thannhaeuser (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-04-02T00:00:00Trial Brief Filed by Christopher Thannhaeuser (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-01T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment Filed by TKH ZUMA, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application Motion to Continue Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-20T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by TKH ZUMA, LLC (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00Witness List Filed by Christopher Thannhaeuser (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-02T00:00:00Reply (REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL) Filed by TKH ZUMA, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-12T00:00:00General Denial Filed by TKH ZUMA, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2019-10-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Order Motion for Undertaking; Hearing o...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-24T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Christopher Thannhaeuser (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-03-26T00:00:00Notice (of Unavailability of Counsel) Filed by Christopher Thannhaeuser (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-20T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Christopher Thannhaeuser (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (Ex Parte Application for Continuance) Filed by TKH ZUMA, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Notice (of Continued Hearing) Filed by Christopher Thannhaeuser (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-22T00:00:00Motion for Leave (to File Amend Answer) Filed by TKH ZUMA, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-25T00:00:00Declaration (of David Williamson) Filed by Christopher Thannhaeuser (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Christopher Thannhaeuser (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-09T00:00:00Motion for Order (Motion for Undertaking) Filed by TKH ZUMA, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-25T00:00:00Objection (to Declaration of Mary Anne Keshen) Filed by Christopher Thannhaeuser (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Witness List Filed by Christopher Thannhaeuser (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00Motion to Vacate (Tentative Judgment) Filed by TKH ZUMA, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-12-01T00:00:00Exhibit List Filed by Christopher Thannhaeuser (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-01T00:00:00Motion to Continue Trial Date Filed by TKH ZUMA, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Strike (Not initial pleading); Hearing o...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-21T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike Filed by Christopher Thannhaeuser (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-11-02T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (RE Exh. 7 to PL Opposition of Def. MSJ) Filed by Christopher Thannhaeuser (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-31T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-04-02T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: 2019-08-15T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2019-04-02T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-04-02T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-04-02T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings
Date: 2019-08-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re Peremptory Challenge) of 08/21/2019)
Date: 2019-08-21T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2019-08-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re Peremptory Challenge))
Date: 2019-08-21T00:00:00Motion for Change of Venue
Date: 2019-08-29T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2019-09-25T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2019-09-20T00:00:00Request for Dismissal (Without Prejudice of Defendant Mary Anne Keshen ONLY)
Date: 2019-09-25T00:00:00Motion for Change of Venue
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00General Denial
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-01-06T00:00:00General Denial
Date: 2019-10-04T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: 2019-10-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-01-16T00:00:00Reply (to Opposition to Motion for Change of Venue)
Date: 2020-01-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Change of Venue))
Date: 2020-01-22T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendant's Motion for Change of Venue)
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-01-09T00:00:00Notice (of Motion and Motion to Compel Responses/Further Responses and Document Production)
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2020-01-28T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-03-26T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-03-17T00:00:00Motion for Change of Venue
Date: 2020-02-21T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-04-07T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: 2020-05-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re: AMENDED NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE))
Date: 2020-04-30T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-04-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2020-05-11T00:00:00Notice (of Continued Hearing)
Date: 2020-06-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of 05/11/2020)
Date: 2020-05-11T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion to Compel Discovery and for Sanctions)
Date: 2020-06-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Change of Venue))
Date: 2020-07-02T00:00:00Reply (to Opposition to Motion for Change of Venue)
Date: 2020-06-25T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion to Strike Cross-Complaint)
Date: 2020-09-09T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-07-06T00:00:00Notice (of Withdrawl of Pl Motions to Compel Further Discovery Responses)
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00Reply (to Def Opposition to Motion to Strike Cross-Complaint)
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00Motion for Leave to File a Cross-Complaint
Date: 2020-09-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Strike (Not initial pleading); Hearing o...))
Date: 2020-09-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Request (JOINT REQUEST TO WITHDRAW CONFERENCE PROGRAM)
Date: 2020-09-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion for Leave to File a Cross-Complaint) of 11/16/2020)
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Notice (Of Non-opposition to Defendant's Motion for Leave to File a Cross-Complaint)
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Leave to File a Cross-Complaint))
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.