Case Last Refreshed: 1 week ago
Carrasco Maria, Lin Evangelyn, Pasadena Market Center Inc. A California Corporation, Phan Ngo Thanh, Phan Nguyen T., (total of 6) See All filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Molnar Christian S. Esq., Nava Alfredo Jr, against Pasadena Market Center Inc. A California Corporation Dba Keller Williams Pasadena, Yess Corp., Saroyan Tania, represented by Atabek Jon Ali, Cooper Amy, Cooper Amy J, Erlich Rinat B, Grajewski Wayne S., (total of 8) See All in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Michelle Williams Court presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management148 days |
|
Filing DateMarch 25, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedApril 20, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions196 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Notice of Court Order; Filed by: Maria Carrasco (Plaintiff); As to: TANIA SAROYAN (Defendant)
Date: 2019-07-02T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Maria Carrasco (Plaintiff); As to: TANIA SAROYAN (Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-25T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: Maria Carrasco (Plaintiff); As to: TANIA SAROYAN (Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-25T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-06-26T00:00:00Notice Of Court Order; Filed by: Maria Carrasco (Plaintiff); As to: TANIA SAROYAN (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-14T00:00:00Notice of court order; Filed by: Maria Carrasco (Plaintiff); As to: TANIA SAROYAN (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-28T00:00:00amended complaint; Filed by: Maria Carrasco (Plaintiff); As to: TANIA SAROYAN (Defendant)
Date: 2019-07-08T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-04-03T00:00:00Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Maria Carrasco (Plaintiff); As to: TANIA SAROYAN (Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-25T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-04-03T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-03-25T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-05-20T00:00:00Declaration of Molnar iso Demurrer and Motion to Strike; Filed by: TANIA SAROYAN (Defendant)
Date: 2019-09-03T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: TANIA SAROYAN (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-22T00:00:00Summons Cross-Complaint; Issued and Filed by: TANIA SAROYAN (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-06T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Maria Carrasco (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-18T00:00:00Declaration of Alfredo Nava; Filed by: Maria Carrasco (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-09-27T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: TANIA SAROYAN (Defendant)
Date: 2019-09-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: TANIA SAROYAN (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-23T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Filed by: TANIA SAROYAN (Defendant)
Date: 2019-09-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Maria Carrasco (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-09-27T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: TANIA SAROYAN (Defendant)
Date: 2019-09-03T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: TANIA SAROYAN (Defendant)
Date: 2019-09-10T00:00:00Amended Complaint; Filed by: Maria Carrasco (Plaintiff); As to: TANIA SAROYAN (Defendant)
Date: 2019-07-08T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Maria Carrasco (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-09-24T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Maria Carrasco (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-09-27T00:00:00Declaration of Laughlin iso Demurrer and Motion to Strike; Filed by: TANIA SAROYAN (Defendant)
Date: 2019-09-03T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-01-09T00:00:00Declaration Declaration of Non-Service; Filed by: Tania Saroyan (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-01-27T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: TANIA SAROYAN (Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-19T00:00:00Notice OF COURT ORDER; Filed by: Maria Carrasco (Plaintiff); As to: TANIA SAROYAN (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00Notice OF COURT ORDER; Filed by: Maria Carrasco (Plaintiff); As to: TANIA SAROYAN (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: TANIA SAROYAN (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-15T00:00:00Opposition to Defendant's motion to compel; Filed by: Maria Carrasco (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00Opposition to Defendant's Motion to compel; Filed by: Maria Carrasco (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-02-28T00:00:00Reply in support of motion to compel; Filed by: Maria Carrasco (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-31T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: TANIA SAROYAN (Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-23T00:00:00Notice of court order; Filed by: Maria Carrasco (Plaintiff); As to: Tania Saroyan (Defendant)
Date: 2020-04-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Tania Saroyan (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-07-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Maria Carrasco (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-09T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-03T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-06-05T00:00:00Notice of order; Filed by: Maria Carrasco (Plaintiff); As to: Tania Saroyan (Defendant)
Date: 2020-06-10T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading); Filed by: Evangelyn Lin (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Tania Saroyan (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Opposition to Motion to Compel; Filed by: Tania Saroyan (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-07-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-07-14T00:00:00Jury Instructions PLAINTIFF'S PROPOSED SPECIAL JURY INSTRUCTIONS; Filed by: Maria Carrasco (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for [Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)]; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-02-14T00:00:00Statement of the Case; Filed by: Tania Saroyan (Defendant)
Date: 2022-02-07T00:00:00Opposition to ex parte application; Filed by: Maria Carrasco (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-03T00:00:00Exhibit List; Filed by: Tania Saroyan (Defendant)
Date: 2022-02-07T00:00:00Status Report; Filed by: Tania Saroyan (Defendant)
Date: 2021-12-20T00:00:00Statement of the Case; Filed by: Maria Carrasco (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-09T00:00:00Motion in Limine #1; Filed by: Maria Carrasco (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-11T00:00:00Witness List; Filed by: Tania Saroyan (Defendant)
Date: 2022-02-07T00:00:00Jury Instructions; Filed by: Tania Saroyan (Defendant)
Date: 2022-02-07T00:00:00Brief DEFENDANT’S CLOSING BRIEF AFTER COURT TRIAL; Filed by: Tania Saroyan (Defendant)
Date: 2022-03-30T00:00:00TENTATIVE DECISION AND PROPOSED STATEMENT OF DECISION; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-04-04T00:00:00Witness List; Filed by: Tania Saroyan (Defendant)
Date: 2022-02-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order re: Ruling on Objections) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-05-02T00:00:00Opposition ex parte application; Filed by: Maria Carrasco (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-11T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-07-06T00:00:00Statement of the Case; Filed by: Tania Saroyan (Defendant)
Date: 2022-02-18T00:00:00Jury Instructions AMENDED; Filed by: Maria Carrasco (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-18T00:00:00Jury Instructions; Filed by: Tania Saroyan (Defendant)
Date: 2022-02-18T00:00:00Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; Filed by: Maria Carrasco (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-10T00:00:00Statement of Decision; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-05-02T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Maria Carrasco (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-08T00:00:00Brief IN SUPPORT OF JUDGMENT FOR PLAINTIFF ON HER EQUITABLE CLAIMS; Filed by: Maria Carrasco (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-15T00:00:00Stipulation, Receipt and Order re: Release of Civil Exhibits; Filed by:
Date: 2022-02-23T00:00:00Trial Brief; Filed by: Tania Saroyan (Defendant)
Date: 2022-02-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for [Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)]; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-02-17T00:00:00Opposition to motion for judgment on the pleadings; Filed by: Maria Carrasco (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-08T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Amended; Filed by: Tania Saroyan (Defendant)
Date: 2022-07-08T00:00:00Notice of case reassignment; Filed by: Maria Carrasco (Plaintiff); As to: Tania Saroyan (Defendant)
Date: 2022-08-22T00:00:00Exhibit List; Filed by: Tania Saroyan (Defendant)
Date: 2022-02-18T00:00:00Notice of Ruling ON MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS; Filed by: Tania Saroyan (Defendant)
Date: 2022-06-30T00:00:00Brief on Plaintiff damages and liability; Filed by: Maria Carrasco (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-24T00:00:00Motion for Attorney Fees; Filed by: Tania Saroyan (Defendant)
Date: 2022-09-21T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Maria Carrasco (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-24T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Ngo Thanh Phan (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-10-20T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-12-30T00:00:00Objection to proposed judgment; Filed by: Maria Carrasco (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-12-19T00:00:00Request for Dismissal; Filed by: Tania Saroyan (Cross-Complainant); As to: Maria Carrasco (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-09-30T00:00:00Objection to proposed judgment; Filed by: Maria Carrasco (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-09-30T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Tania Saroyan (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-12-09T00:00:00Notice of Hearing of Motion for New Trial; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-01-31T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Maria Carrasco (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-19T00:00:00Opposition to Defendants motion for attorney fees; Filed by: Maria Carrasco (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-01-10T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Maria Carrasco (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-09T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Fees Due for Clerk's Transcript on Appeal NOA B327431; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-04-07T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-; Filed by: Tania Saroyan (Defendant)
Date: 2023-03-22T00:00:00Appeal - Original Clerk's Transcript 9 Volumes Certified; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-05-03T00:00:00Appeal - Notice Court Reporter to Prepare Appeal Transcript NTR; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-03-20T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-; Filed by: Maria Carrasco (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-03-07T00:00:00Appeal - Reporter Appeal Transcripts Deposit Paid Paid for Maria Carrasco (Appellant); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-03-08T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-03-01T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Tania Saroyan (Defendant)
Date: 2023-08-15T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Default Issued "U"; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-09-11T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal "U"; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-07-14T00:00:00Appeal Document B327431; DCA ORDER; Filed by: Clerk
Date: September 19, 2023Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: March 25, 2019Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: March 25, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: March 25, 2019Complaint
Date: March 25, 2019Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: April 03, 2019Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: April 03, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDER
Date: May 14, 2019Proof of Personal Service
Date: May 14, 2019Notice of Non-Entry of Default; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Tania Saroyan (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Maria Carrasco (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Tania Saroyan (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Notice of idc issues; Filed by: Maria Carrasco (Plaintiff); As to: Tania Saroyan (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Nguyen T. Phan (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Ngo Thanh Phan (Cross-Complainant); Nguyen T. Phan (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-03-12T00:00:00"NOT ENTERED"; Filed by: Maria Carrasco (Plaintiff); As to: Tania Saroyan (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-17T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Ken John Parsons (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-30T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Evangelyn Lin (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-30T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Maria Carassco Erroneously Sued As Maria Carassco (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-30T00:00:00Declaration of alfredo nava; Filed by: Maria Carrasco (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-06T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Ngo Thanh Phan (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-27T00:00:00Notice of court order; Filed by: Maria Carrasco (Plaintiff); As to: Tania Saroyan (Defendant)
Date: 2021-12-08T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: May 20, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDER
Date: May 28, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF LEAD TRIAL COUNSEL CHRISTIAN S. MOLNAR
Date: June 11, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: June 26, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDER
Date: July 02, 2019Amended Complaint
Date: July 08, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: August 20, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: August 23, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION OF LAUGHLIN ISO DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE
Date: September 03, 2019Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: September 03, 2019Request for Judicial Notice
Date: September 03, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION OF MOLNAR ISO DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE
Date: September 03, 2019Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: September 10, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: September 20, 2019Request for Judicial Notice
Date: September 24, 2019Notice of Ruling
Date: September 25, 2019Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: September 27, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION OF ALFREDO NAVA
Date: September 27, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: September 27, 2019Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: October 07, 2019Cross-Complaint
Date: November 06, 2019Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT
Date: November 06, 2019Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: November 18, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES
Date: November 18, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: November 18, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL FRUTHER RESPONSES
Date: November 18, 2019Separate Statement
Date: November 18, 2019Separate Statement
Date: November 22, 2019Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: November 22, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION OF EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE DEMURRER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT
Date: December 04, 2019Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT 1ST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT
Date: December 06, 2019Separate Statement
Date: December 19, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE DEMURRER
Date: December 23, 2019Separate Statement
Date: December 23, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: December 27, 2019Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL
Date: December 31, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF EXTENSION TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING
Date: December 31, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: December 31, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL
Date: January 06, 2020Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL
Date: January 06, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: January 06, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER)
Date: January 09, 2020Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: January 14, 2020Proof of Personal Service
Date: January 14, 2020Separate Statement
Date: January 15, 2020Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: January 16, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDER
Date: January 17, 2020Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: January 17, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES)
Date: January 17, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF NON-SERVICE
Date: January 27, 2020Proof of Personal Service
Date: January 27, 2020Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME
Date: January 28, 2020Proof of Personal Service
Date: January 28, 2020Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: January 29, 2020Proof of Service by Mail
Date: January 30, 2020Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL
Date: November 02, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: November 03, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: November 04, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: November 13, 2020Answer
Date: November 13, 2020Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: November 16, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: November 18, 2020Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: November 18, 2020Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: November 24, 2020Demand for Jury Trial
Date: November 24, 2020Notice of Rejection - Miscellaneous Judgments - NOTICE OF NON-ENTRY OF DEFAULT
Date: December 02, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF IDC ISSUES
Date: December 04, 2020Informal Discovery Conference
Date: December 07, 2020Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ISSUES FOR INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE
Date: December 07, 2020Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: December 08, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))
Date: December 10, 2020Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: December 14, 2020Motion to Compel Arbitration
Date: December 14, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION OF WAYNE S. GRAJEWSKI ISO MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION
Date: December 14, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF LEAD TRIAL COUNSEL
Date: December 16, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL
Date: January 14, 2021Reply - REPLY IN OPPOSITION TO CROSS-COMPLAINANT, TANIA SAROYAN'S SECOND AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT
Date: February 11, 2021Reply - REPLY IN OPPOSITION TO CROSS-COMPLAINANT, TANIA SAROYAN'S SECOND AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT
Date: February 16, 2021Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE HEARING
Date: February 17, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITH MOTION TO STRIKE (CCP 430.10); HEA...)
Date: February 19, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION)
Date: March 10, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: March 12, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: March 12, 2021Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL "NOT ENTERED"
Date: March 30, 2021Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: March 30, 2021Substitution of Attorney
Date: March 30, 2021Summons - SUMMONS SECOND AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT
Date: April 08, 2021Answer - ANSWER TO SECOND AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT
Date: April 12, 2021Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO TOLL DEADLINE
Date: April 09, 2021Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)
Date: April 20, 2021Informal Discovery Conference
Date: May 07, 2021Informal Discovery Conference
Date: May 10, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))
Date: May 11, 2021Motion to Compel Arbitration
Date: June 07, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF IDC ISSUES
Date: June 25, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))
Date: June 29, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: July 01, 2021Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL
Date: July 01, 2021Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL FOR JON A. ATABEK, ESQ.
Date: July 13, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION)
Date: July 14, 2021Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: July 30, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: July 15, 2021Separate Statement
Date: July 30, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: RESCHEDULING OF STATUS CONFERENCE RE: ARBITRA...)
Date: September 07, 2021Reply - REPLY TO DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION
Date: August 20, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES)
Date: August 27, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: ARBITRATION)
Date: September 17, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: SETTLEMENT)
Date: October 19, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION OF ALFREDO NAVA
Date: December 06, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDER
Date: December 08, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: SETTLEMENT)
Date: December 09, 2021Status Report
Date: December 20, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: ARBITRATION)
Date: December 21, 2021Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE #1
Date: January 11, 2022Notice of Change of Firm Name
Date: January 13, 2022Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR A COURT ORDER
Date: January 18, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR A COURT ORDER)
Date: January 19, 2022Order - Trial Preparation; Filed by: Clerk; As to: Maria Carrasco (Plaintiff); Tania Saroyan (Defendant)
Date: 2022-12-07T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Nguyen T. Phan (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-10-20T00:00:00Opposition - OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION
Date: February 03, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, OR, IN THE...)
Date: February 04, 2022Jury Instructions
Date: February 07, 2022Witness List
Date: February 07, 2022Jury Instructions - JURY INSTRUCTIONS PLAINTIFF'S PROPOSED SPECIAL JURY INSTRUCTIONS
Date: February 07, 2022Statement of the Case
Date: February 07, 2022Exhibit List
Date: February 07, 2022Statement of the Case
Date: February 09, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: February 10, 2022Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: February 14, 2022Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: February 17, 2022Jury Instructions - JURY INSTRUCTIONS AMENDED
Date: February 18, 2022Notice - NOTICE OF OMITTED WITNESS PLAINTIFF INTENDS TO CALL
Date: February 18, 2022Exhibit List
Date: February 18, 2022Jury Instructions
Date: February 18, 2022Statement of the Case
Date: February 18, 2022Trial Brief
Date: February 18, 2022Witness List
Date: February 18, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL (10-DAY ESTIMATE); ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY A B...)
Date: February 22, 2022Objection - OBJECTION BY NON-PARTIES KEN PARSONS AND EVANGELINE LIN
Date: February 22, 2022Stipulation, Receipt and Order re: Release of Civil Exhibits
Date: February 23, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-JURY TRIAL (17200 CLAIMS))
Date: February 23, 2022Brief - BRIEF ON PLAINTIFF DAMAGES AND LIABILITY
Date: February 24, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-JURY TRIAL (17200 CLAIMS))
Date: February 24, 2022Request for Judicial Notice
Date: February 24, 2022Opposition - OPPOSITION EX PARTE APPLICATION
Date: March 11, 2022Brief - BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF JUDGMENT FOR PLAINTIFF ON HER EQUITABLE CLAIMS
Date: March 15, 2022Notice - NOTICE OF TRIAL TRANSCRIPTS FOR TRIAL PROCEEDINGS ON 2/23/22 AND 2/24/22
Date: March 15, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: PLAINTIFF'S BRIEF)
Date: March 16, 2022Brief - BRIEF DEFENDANT’S CLOSING BRIEF AFTER COURT TRIAL
Date: March 30, 2022Statement of Decision - TENTATIVE DECISION AND PROPOSED STATEMENT OF DECISION
Date: April 04, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: DEFENDANT'S BRIEF)
Date: March 30, 2022Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CHANGE OF LAW FIRM
Date: April 26, 2022Statement of Decision
Date: May 02, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: RULING ON OBJECTIONS)
Date: May 02, 2022Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings
Date: May 10, 2022Request for Judicial Notice
Date: June 08, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS)
Date: June 30, 2022Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING ON MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS
Date: June 30, 2022Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: July 06, 2022Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: June 30, 2022Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING AMENDED
Date: July 08, 2022Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT
Date: August 22, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE ARBITRATION)
Date: August 24, 2022Motion for Attorney Fees
Date: September 21, 2022Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE HEARING ON MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES
Date: September 28, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO CONTINUE DEF...)
Date: September 29, 2022Notice of Hearing of Motion for New Trial
Date: January 31, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE RESCHEDULING OF MOTION FOR ATTORNEY’S FEES)
Date: February 15, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL)
Date: February 16, 2023Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal
Date: March 01, 2023Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103
Date: March 07, 2023Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103
Date: March 22, 2023Unknown - APPEAL - ORIGINAL CLERK'S TRANSCRIPT 9 VOLUMES CERTIFIED
Date: May 03, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEY’S FEES)
Date: May 16, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE ARBITRATION)
Date: May 26, 2023Answer
Date: February 24, 2020Cross-Complaint
Date: February 24, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: February 27, 2020Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL
Date: February 27, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 02/28/2020
Date: February 28, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: February 28, 2020Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: February 28, 2020Answer
Date: March 25, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: March 11, 2020Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: April 03, 2020Cross-Complaint
Date: April 06, 2020Answer
Date: April 06, 2020Answer
Date: April 13, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDER
Date: April 27, 2020Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: June 05, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER
Date: June 10, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: July 01, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: July 09, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF COURTCALL APPEARANCE AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: July 09, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: July 16, 2020Answer
Date: July 27, 2020Unknown - AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT
Date: July 27, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: RESCHEDULING OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: August 17, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF RULING; NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: July 28, 2020Answer
Date: August 21, 2020Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR EXTENSION TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING
Date: August 24, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF MEDIATION HEARING
Date: August 25, 2020Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFF’S NOTICE OF ORDER
Date: August 28, 2020Request for Dismissal - "NOT ENTERED"
Date: March 17, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: August 27, 2021Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS
Date: June 08, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: June 09, 2022Objection - OBJECTION TO PROPOSED JUDGMENT
Date: September 30, 2022Request for Dismissal
Date: September 30, 2022Substitution of Attorney
Date: October 20, 2022Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND HEARING ON ENTRY OF JUDGMENT
Date: November 22, 2022Status Conference Statement
Date: November 29, 2022Reply - REPLY REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES FILED BY DEFENDANT, TANIA SAROYAN
Date: November 30, 2022Order - ORDER - TRIAL PREPARATION
Date: December 07, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: ARBITRATION; CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE...)
Date: December 07, 2022Order - ORDER OF 12/07/22
Date: December 07, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE SUBMISSION OF PROPOSED JUDGMENT)
Date: December 14, 2022Objection - OBJECTION TO PROPOSED JUDGMENT
Date: December 19, 2022Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order
Date: December 30, 2022Request for Judicial Notice
Date: January 09, 2023Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES
Date: January 09, 2023Notice - NOTICE OF INTENTION TO MOVE FOR NEW TRIAL
Date: January 09, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: January 10, 2023Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 01/10/2023
Date: January 10, 2023Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES FILED BY DEFENDANT, TANIA SAROYAN
Date: January 17, 2023Objection - OBJECTION OF DEFENDANT, TANIA SAROYAN, TO REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE
Date: January 17, 2023Request for Judicial Notice
Date: January 19, 2023Memorandum - MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF AN ORDER FOR A NEW TRIAL
Date: January 19, 2023amended complaint Filed by Maria Carrasco (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-07-08T00:00:00Reply (in support of motion to compel) Filed by Maria Carrasco (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-31T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Tania Saroyan (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-15T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-04-03T00:00:00Amended Complaint (1st) Filed by Maria Carrasco (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-07-08T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendant's Motion to compel) Filed by Maria Carrasco (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-06T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Tania Saroyan (Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-19T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Maria Carrasco (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-31T00:00:00Summons (Cross-Complaint) Filed by Tania Saroyan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-06T00:00:00Declaration (of alfredo nava) Filed by Maria Carrasco (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-06T00:00:00Notice (OF OMITTED WITNESS PLAINTIFF INTENDS TO CALL) Filed by Maria Carrasco (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-18T00:00:00Notice (of order) Filed by Maria Carrasco (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-10T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-14T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference Filed by Maria Carrasco (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Ngo Thanh Phan (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-03-12T00:00:00Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) Filed by Tania Saroyan (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-03-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-27T00:00:00Notice ( of Unavailability of Lead Trial Counsel Christian S. Molnar) Filed by TANIA SAROYAN (Defendant)
Date: 2019-06-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-08-20T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Maria Carrasco (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00Opposition (to ex parte application) Filed by Maria Carrasco (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-03T00:00:00Stipulation, Receipt and Order re: Release of Civil Exhibits Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-23T00:00:00Notice ( of motion and motion to extend time to file demurrer) Filed by Maria Carrasco (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-23T00:00:00Summons (on Cross Complaint (1st)) Filed by Tania Saroyan (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00Notice (Of Court Order) Filed by Maria Carrasco (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Tania Saroyan (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-23T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Evangelyn Lin (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-14T00:00:00Notice (OF COURT ORDER) Filed by Maria Carrasco (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Tania Saroyan (Defendant)
Date: 2019-09-10T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Maria Carassco Erroneously Sued As Maria Carassco (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-01-09T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Maria Carrasco (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-25T00:00:00Witness List Filed by Tania Saroyan (Defendant)
Date: 2022-02-18T00:00:00Notice (OF COURT ORDER) Filed by Maria Carrasco (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference re: Arbitration)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-12-21T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-03T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (to toll deadline) Filed by Maria Carrasco (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Notice (of court order) Filed by Maria Carrasco (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-28T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-03-25T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Tania Saroyan (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-01-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference re: Settlement)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-12-09T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Maria Carrasco (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-18T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Maria Carrasco (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-01-09T00:00:00Declaration (of Alfredo Nava) Filed by Maria Carrasco (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-09-27T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Tania Saroyan (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-22T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Maria Carrasco (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re: Defendant's Brief)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-30T00:00:00Statement of Decision Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-02T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Ngo Thanh Phan (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-10-20T00:00:00Opposition (ex parte application) Filed by Maria Carrasco (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-11T00:00:00Brief (IN SUPPORT OF JUDGMENT FOR PLAINTIFF ON HER EQUITABLE CLAIMS) Filed by Maria Carrasco (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (STATUS CONFERENCE RE ARBITRATION)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference re: Arbitration; Order to Show Cause Re: Wh...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-09T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (for a court order) Filed by Maria Carrasco (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re: Objections to Proposed Stateme...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-04-29T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-06-05T00:00:00Notice (PLAINTIFF?S NOTICE OF ORDER) Filed by Maria Carrasco (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)]) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Maria Carrasco (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-09T00:00:00Notice (of Unavailability of Lead Trial Counsel) Filed by Tania Saroyan (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Rescheduling of Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-17T00:00:00Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) Filed by Tania Saroyan (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-04-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference re: Arbitration)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-17T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Ngo Thanh Phan (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-27T00:00:00Answer Filed by Ngo Thanh Phan (Cross-Defendant); Nguyen T. Phan (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-21T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Unavailability of Counsel) Filed by Tania Saroyan (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-02T00:00:00Motion to Compel Arbitration Filed by Evangelyn Lin (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-06-07T00:00:00Amended Cross-Complaint ( (2nd)) Filed by Tania Saroyan (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-07-27T00:00:00Statement of the Case Filed by Tania Saroyan (Defendant)
Date: 2022-02-07T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading) Filed by Evangelyn Lin (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Summons (Second Amended Cross-Complaint) Filed by Tania Saroyan (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-04-08T00:00:00Answer Filed by Tania Saroyan (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-03-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Tania Saroyan (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-07-01T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to continue hearing) Filed by Maria Carrasco (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-17T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Tania Saroyan (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-01-28T00:00:00Answer Filed by Ngo Thanh Phan (Cross-Defendant); Nguyen T. Phan (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial (10-day estimate); Order to Show Cause Re: Why A B...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-22T00:00:00Jury Instructions Filed by Tania Saroyan (Defendant)
Date: 2022-02-18T00:00:00Statement of the Case Filed by Tania Saroyan (Defendant)
Date: 2022-02-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Hea...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion to Compel) Filed by Tania Saroyan (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-07-01T00:00:00Notice of Non-Entry of Default Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Witness List Filed by Tania Saroyan (Defendant)
Date: 2022-02-07T00:00:00Exhibit List Filed by Tania Saroyan (Defendant)
Date: 2022-02-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for New Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-02-16T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF CHANGE OF LAW FIRM) Filed by Maria Carrasco (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-26T00:00:00DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEY?S FEES Filed by Tania Saroyan (Defendant)
Date: 2022-09-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-30T00:00:00Notice (OF TRIAL TRANSCRIPTS FOR TRIAL PROCEEDINGS ON AND ) Filed by Maria Carrasco (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Jury Trial (17200 Claims))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-24T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Maria Carrasco (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-08T00:00:00TENTATIVE DECISION AND PROPOSED STATEMENT OF DECISION Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-04-04T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Maria Carrasco (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-24T00:00:00Brief (on Plaintiff damages and liability) Filed by Maria Carrasco (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([TENTATIVE DECISION AND PROPOSED STATEMENT OF DECISION]) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-04-04T00:00:00PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTIONS TO PROPOSED JUDGMENT Filed by Maria Carrasco (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-12-19T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-30T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Maria Carrasco (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-19T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Tania Saroyan (Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-27T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by Tania Saroyan (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-01-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Cas...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses; Hear...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Tania Saroyan (Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-09-20T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Maria Carrasco (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-25T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Maria Carrasco (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-25T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses Filed by Tania Saroyan (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-22T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Maria Carrasco (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-09-27T00:00:00Declaration (of Laughlin iso Demurrer and Motion to Strike) Filed by Tania Saroyan (Defendant)
Date: 2019-09-03T00:00:00Notice (of idc issues) Filed by Maria Carrasco (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (for extension to file responsive pleading) Filed by Maria Carrasco (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-24T00:00:00Notice (of CourtCall Appearance at Case Management Conference) Filed by Tania Saroyan (Defendant)
Date: 2020-07-09T00:00:00Cross-Complaint Filed by Ngo Thanh Phan (Cross-Defendant); Nguyen T. Phan (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-10T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Ngo Thanh Phan (Cross-Complainant); Nguyen T. Phan (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-03-12T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by Tania Saroyan (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Maria Carrasco (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Tania Saroyan (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-01-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference re: Settlement)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-19T00:00:00Answer Filed by Nguyen T. Phan (Cross-Defendant); Ngo Thanh Phan (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-04-13T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name Filed by Tania Saroyan (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-01-13T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-17T00:00:00Answer (TO SECOND AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT) Filed by Ken John Parsons (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by Tania Saroyan (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-01-16T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Non-Service) Filed by Tania Saroyan (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-01-27T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Ken John Parsons (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-30T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Tania Saroyan (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-07-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-02-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Tania Saroyan (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Motion to Compel Arbitration Filed by Ngo Thanh Phan (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application TO CONTINUE TRIAL, OR, IN THE...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-04T00:00:00"NOT ENTERED" Filed by Maria Carrasco (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-17T00:00:00Opposition (to motion for judgment on the pleadings) Filed by Maria Carrasco (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO CONTINUE DEF...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-09-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re: Plaintiff's Brief)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to continue motion for judgme...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-21T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-07-06T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Maria Carrasco (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-09T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendants motion for attorney fees) Filed by Maria Carrasco (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-09T00:00:00Order (- Trial Preparation) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-01-10T00:00:00Notice of Hearing of Motion for New Trial Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-01-31T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2019-09-27T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-11-18T00:00:00Declaration (in support of Plaintiff's motion to compel fruther responses)
Date: 2019-11-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-09-27T00:00:00Notice ( of Unavailability of Lead Trial Counsel Christian S. Molnar)
Date: 2019-06-11T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2019-10-07T00:00:00Notice (of Court Order)
Date: 2019-07-02T00:00:00Reply (in support of motion to compel)
Date: 2019-12-31T00:00:00Declaration (of Laughlin iso Demurrer and Motion to Strike)
Date: 2019-09-03T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-12-19T00:00:00Stipulation and Order ((Joint) to Extend Time for Defendant to Respond to First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-08-07T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00amended complaint
Date: 2019-07-08T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2020-01-15T00:00:00Notice (OF RULING; NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: 2020-07-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration))
Date: 2021-07-14T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-08-21T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to continue hearing)
Date: 2021-02-17T00:00:00Notice (of Unavailability of Lead Trial Counsel)
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-12-23T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Hea...) of )
Date: 2021-02-19T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00Request for Dismissal ("NOT ENTERED")
Date: 2021-03-30T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses (to Defs Firs Set of Requests for Production)
Date: 2019-12-19T00:00:00Declaration (In support of opposition to Defendant's motion to compel)
Date: 2020-01-06T00:00:00Declaration (in support of extension to file responsive pleading)
Date: 2019-12-31T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-07-27T00:00:00Declaration (of Wayne S. Grajewski ISO Motion to Compel Arbitration)
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of )
Date: 2020-01-09T00:00:00Answer (OF CROSS-DEFENDANT YESS, CORP. TO SECOND AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT)
Date: 2021-05-12T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-03-11T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2019-09-24T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-05-14T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2019-09-03T00:00:00Notice (of court order)
Date: 2019-05-28T00:00:00Declaration (of Alfredo Nava)
Date: 2019-09-27T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-03-25T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-01-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2019-08-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Cas...))
Date: 2019-10-07T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses (to Defs First Set of Special Interrogatories)
Date: 2019-12-19T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-03-25T00:00:00Cross-Complaint Filed by Tania Saroyan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-06T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Tania Saroyan (Defendant)
Date: 2019-09-25T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Maria Carrasco (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-04-03T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Tania Saroyan (Defendant)
Date: 2019-09-03T00:00:00Notice (of Court Order) Filed by Maria Carrasco (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-07-02T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Maria Carrasco (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-09-24T00:00:00Declaration (of Molnar iso Demurrer and Motion to Strike) Filed by Tania Saroyan (Defendant)
Date: 2019-09-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-06-26T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Maria Carrasco (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-09-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-06-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service As T...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-06-03T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) Filed by Tania Saroyan (Defendant)
Date: 2019-09-03T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-05-20T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses Filed by Maria Carrasco (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-18T00:00:00Declaration (of Molnar iso Demurrer and Motion to Strike)
Date: 2019-09-03T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2019-09-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00Amended Complaint (1st)
Date: 2019-07-08T00:00:00Declaration (of extension of time to file demurrer to cross-complaint)
Date: 2019-12-04T00:00:00Declaration (OF ALFREDO NAVA IN SUPPORT OF EXTENSION TO FILE PLAINTIFF?S DEMURRER TO DEFENDANT?S ANSWER)
Date: 2019-11-18T00:00:00Summons (Cross-Complaint)
Date: 2019-11-06T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-03-25T00:00:00Declaration (in support of Plaintiff's motion to compel further responses)
Date: 2019-11-18T00:00:00Notice (of CourtCall Appearance at Case Management Conference)
Date: 2020-07-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service As T...))
Date: 2019-06-03T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Reply (IN OPPOSITION TO CROSS-COMPLAINANT, TANIA SAROYAN'S SECOND AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT)
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-07-01T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2019-05-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2019-06-26T00:00:00Case Management Statement (THE PHANS? SUPPLEMENTAL CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT)
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-09-25T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2020-01-16T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2020-01-29T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-12-31T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-11-22T00:00:00Objection (to Re-Filed Motion to Strike by Cross-Defendants Lin and Pasadena Market Center)
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference re: Settlement))
Date: 2021-10-19T00:00:00Summons (on Cross Complaint (1st))
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: 2019-11-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2019-09-20T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00Declaration ((Supplemental) of Wayne Grajewski ISO the Phans' Motion to Compel Arbitration)
Date: 2021-03-03T00:00:00Notice (Of Court Order)
Date: 2019-05-14T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses (to Defs Second Set of Form Interrogatories)
Date: 2019-12-19T00:00:00Declaration (of Christian S. Molnar re Non-Service of Cross-Defendant Nguyen T. Phan)
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)
Date: 2021-04-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2020-01-09T00:00:00Notice (OF COURT ORDER)
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: 2019-04-03T00:00:001st Amended Cross-Complaint
Date: 2019-12-06T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: 2019-11-22T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2021-03-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2019-04-03T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order) of )
Date: 2019-06-26T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-08-23T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2019-03-25T00:00:00Notice (of court order)
Date: 2020-04-27T00:00:00Motion to Compel Arbitration
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2019-11-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-07-16T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses (to First Set of Requests for Admission)
Date: 2019-12-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-02-28T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-11-18T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2019-09-10T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2021-03-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Rescheduling of Case Management Conference) of )
Date: 2020-08-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses))
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00Notice (of order)
Date: 2020-06-10T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2020-04-06T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-07-30T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2020-02-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Hea...))
Date: 2021-02-19T00:00:00Notice (PLAINTIFF?S NOTICE OF ORDER)
Date: 2020-08-28T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF ISSUES FOR INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE)
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion to Compel)
Date: 2021-07-01T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-01-14T00:00:00Answer (TO SECOND AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT)
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (ON STATUS CONFERENCE RE: ARBITRATION; NOTICE OF CONTINUED STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: 2021-10-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)))
Date: 2021-05-11T00:00:00"NOT ENTERED"
Date: 2021-03-17T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-07-15T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore ((Wil S. Wilcox, CSR #9178))
Date: 2021-07-14T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Motion to Compel Arbitration
Date: 2021-06-07T00:00:00Reply (to defendants opposition)
Date: 2021-08-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses))
Date: 2021-08-27T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2022-02-17T00:00:00Declaration (of alfredo nava)
Date: 2021-12-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for a court order))
Date: 2022-01-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference re: Arbitration))
Date: 2021-12-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2022-02-10T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2022-02-14T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2022-02-07T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2022-02-07T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter ((Brenda Sanches, CSR #13019))
Date: 2022-02-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application TO CONTINUE TRIAL, OR, IN THE...))
Date: 2022-02-04T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)])
Date: 2022-02-14T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2022-02-18T00:00:00Status Report
Date: 2021-12-20T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2022-02-07T00:00:00Notice (of court order)
Date: 2021-12-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference re: Settlement))
Date: 2021-12-09T00:00:00Opposition (to ex parte application)
Date: 2022-02-03T00:00:00Motion in Limine (#1)
Date: 2022-01-11T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2022-02-07T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name
Date: 2022-01-13T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2022-02-18T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2022-02-09T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2022-02-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)])
Date: 2022-02-17T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (for a court order)
Date: 2022-01-18T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2022-02-18T00:00:00Jury Instructions (PLAINTIFF'S PROPOSED SPECIAL JURY INSTRUCTIONS)
Date: 2022-02-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Jury Trial (17200 Claims)))
Date: 2022-02-23T00:00:00Opposition (PLAINTIFF?S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE #4; DECLARATION OF ALFREDO NAVA)
Date: 2022-02-22T00:00:00Brief (on Plaintiff damages and liability)
Date: 2022-02-24T00:00:00DEFENDANT TANIA SAROYANS EX PARTE APPLICATION TO SHORTEN TIME ON MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND
Date: 2022-03-11T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter ((Justus Balentine, CSR #13859))
Date: 2022-02-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Jury Trial (17200 Claims)))
Date: 2022-02-24T00:00:00Stipulation, Receipt and Order re: Release of Civil Exhibits
Date: 2022-02-23T00:00:00Trial Brief
Date: 2022-02-18T00:00:00Notice (OF OMITTED WITNESS PLAINTIFF INTENDS TO CALL)
Date: 2022-02-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial (10-day estimate); Order to Show Cause Re: Why A B...))
Date: 2022-02-22T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (ON EX PARTE APPLCIATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED ANSWER)
Date: 2022-03-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application TO SHORTEN TIME ON MOTION FO...))
Date: 2022-03-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re: Plaintiff's Brief))
Date: 2022-03-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re: Objections to Proposed Stateme...))
Date: 2022-04-29T00:00:00Brief (DEFENDANT?S CLOSING BRIEF AFTER COURT TRIAL)
Date: 2022-03-30T00:00:00TENTATIVE DECISION AND PROPOSED STATEMENT OF DECISION
Date: 2022-04-04T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF CHANGE OF LAW FIRM)
Date: 2022-04-26T00:00:00Brief (IN SUPPORT OF JUDGMENT FOR PLAINTIFF ON HER EQUITABLE CLAIMS)
Date: 2022-03-15T00:00:00Objection (AND OMITTED ISSUES FROM TENTATIVE DECISION AND PROPOSED STATEMENT OF DECISION)
Date: 2022-04-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re: Defendant's Brief))
Date: 2022-03-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference re: Arbitration; Order to Show Cause Re: Wh...))
Date: 2022-03-09T00:00:00Stipulation - No Order (JOINT FACT STIPULATION RE: HISTORIC RENTS PAID, AND AMOUNTS PAID TO SAROYAN)
Date: 2022-03-09T00:00:00Trial Brief (SUPPLEMENTAL TRIAL BRIEF RE: WAIVER OF DEFECTS IN NOTICE OF RENT INCREASES)
Date: 2022-02-22T00:00:00Joint Status Conference Report (JOINT REPORT REGARDING SELECTION OF ARBITRATOR)
Date: 2022-03-01T00:00:00Notice (OF TRIAL TRANSCRIPTS FOR TRIAL PROCEEDINGS ON AND )
Date: 2022-03-15T00:00:00Jury Instructions (AMENDED)
Date: 2022-02-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([TENTATIVE DECISION AND PROPOSED STATEMENT OF DECISION])
Date: 2022-04-04T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2022-02-24T00:00:00Objection (by non-parties Ken Parsons and Evangeline Lin)
Date: 2022-02-22T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore ((Sandra Guerra, CSR #10977))
Date: 2022-02-23T00:00:00Opposition (ex parte application)
Date: 2022-03-11T00:00:00Status Report Filed by Tania Saroyan (Defendant)
Date: 2021-12-20T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by Tania Saroyan (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-01-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-11T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Tania Saroyan (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Tania Saroyan (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Exhibit List Filed by Tania Saroyan (Defendant)
Date: 2022-02-07T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by Nguyen T. Phan (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Statement of the Case Filed by Maria Carrasco (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-09T00:00:00Jury Instructions Filed by Tania Saroyan (Defendant)
Date: 2022-02-07T00:00:00Notice (of case reassignment) Filed by Maria Carrasco (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-08-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Filed by Maria Carrasco (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-10T00:00:00Brief (DEFENDANT?S CLOSING BRIEF AFTER COURT TRIAL) Filed by Tania Saroyan (Defendant)
Date: 2022-03-30T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Ruling on Objections) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-02T00:00:00Motion in Limine (#1) Filed by Maria Carrasco (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-11T00:00:00Jury Instructions (PLAINTIFF'S PROPOSED SPECIAL JURY INSTRUCTIONS) Filed by Maria Carrasco (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-07T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Nguyen T. Phan (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-10-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application TO SHORTEN TIME ON MOTION FO...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Rescheduling of Status Conference re: Arbitra...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference Filed by Tania Saroyan (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Trial Brief Filed by Tania Saroyan (Defendant)
Date: 2022-02-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-02-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)]) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for a court order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-19T00:00:00Jury Instructions (AMENDED) Filed by Maria Carrasco (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-18T00:00:00Notice (of court order) Filed by Maria Carrasco (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-04-27T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (to continue deadline) Filed by Maria Carrasco (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Notice (of court order) Filed by Maria Carrasco (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-08T00:00:00Notice (of Unavailability of Counsel) Filed by Tania Saroyan (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Jury Trial (17200 Claims))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-14T00:00:00Notice (of Mediation Hearing) Filed by Tania Saroyan (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-08-25T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendant's motion to compel) Filed by Maria Carrasco (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Tania Saroyan (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-09-30T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Maria Carrasco (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-09T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (ON MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS) Filed by Tania Saroyan (Defendant)
Date: 2022-06-30T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (Amended) Filed by Tania Saroyan (Defendant)
Date: 2022-07-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Ruling on Objections)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-02T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Tania Saroyan (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-12-09T00:00:00Order (of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-01-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE SUBMISSION OF PROPOSED JUDGMENT)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-14T00:00:00PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF INTENTION TO MOVE FOR NEW TRIAL Filed by Maria Carrasco (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (COURT ORDER RE RESCHEDULING OF MOTION FOR ATTORNEY?S FEES)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-02-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference re: Arbitration; Case Management Conference...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-07T00:00:00Amended Cross-Complaint ( (2nd))
Date: 2020-07-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-02-24T00:00:00Notice ( of motion and motion to extend time to file demurrer)
Date: 2019-12-23T00:00:00Notice (of idc issues)
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Notice (of Mediation Hearing)
Date: 2020-08-25T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-07-01T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2020-02-28T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-07-01T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2020-02-24T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-03-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-07-01T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-01-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)))
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2020-01-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Notice (OF COURT ORDER)
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2021-03-30T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-12-27T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (For Extension of Time)
Date: 2020-01-28T00:00:00Reply (CROSS-DEFENDANTS REPLY TO TANIA SAROYANS OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION)
Date: 2021-07-07T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (to toll deadline)
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-07-09T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendant's Motion to compel)
Date: 2020-01-06T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2020-06-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration) of )
Date: 2021-07-14T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Non-Service)
Date: 2020-01-27T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: 2021-07-30T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-04-06T00:00:00Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2021-03-30T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Unavailability of Counsel)
Date: 2020-11-02T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-04-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Rescheduling of Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-08-17T00:00:00Notice of Non-Entry of Default
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Brief (The IDC Statement of Non-Party and Former Cross-Defendant Ngo Thanh Phan)
Date: 2021-06-24T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (for extension to file responsive pleading)
Date: 2020-08-24T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (to continue deadline)
Date: 2021-06-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration) of )
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Rescheduling of Status Conference re: Arbitra...))
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendant's motion to compel)
Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00Notice (of idc issues)
Date: 2021-06-25T00:00:00Notice (Of Court's Order Changing The Date Of The Status Conference Re Arbitration To )
Date: 2021-09-16T00:00:00Reply (IN OPPOSITION TO CROSS-COMPLAINANT, TANIA SAROYAN'S SECOND AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT)
Date: 2021-02-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses; Hear...))
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference re: Arbitration))
Date: 2021-09-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Rescheduling of Status Conference re: Arbitra...) of )
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-01-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)))
Date: 2021-06-29T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-04-13T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2021-03-30T00:00:00Notice (of Unavailability of Counsel)
Date: 2021-01-14T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore ((Timothy McCoy, CSR #4745))
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL FOR JON A. ATABEK, ESQ.)
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00Reply (by Phans to Saroyan's Opposition to the Phans' Motion to Compel Arbitration)
Date: 2021-03-03T00:00:00Summons (Second Amended Cross-Complaint)
Date: 2021-04-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration))
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-03-12T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-08-27T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-03-25T00:00:00Notice (Of Court Order)
Date: 2019-05-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2019-06-26T00:00:00Notice (of Court Order)
Date: 2019-07-02T00:00:00Amended Complaint (1st)
Date: 2019-07-08T00:00:00Stipulation and Order ((Joint) to Extend Time for Defendant to Respond to First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-08-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2019-08-20T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2019-09-03T00:00:00Declaration (of Molnar iso Demurrer and Motion to Strike)
Date: 2019-09-03T00:00:00Declaration (of Laughlin iso Demurrer and Motion to Strike)
Date: 2019-09-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2019-09-20T00:00:00Declaration (of Alfredo Nava)
Date: 2019-09-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Cas...))
Date: 2019-10-07T00:00:00Summons (Cross-Complaint)
Date: 2019-11-06T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-11-18T00:00:00Declaration (in support of Plaintiff's motion to compel further responses)
Date: 2019-11-18T00:00:00Declaration (OF ALFREDO NAVA IN SUPPORT OF EXTENSION TO FILE PLAINTIFF?S DEMURRER TO DEFENDANT?S ANSWER)
Date: 2019-11-18T00:00:00Declaration (in support of Plaintiff's motion to compel fruther responses)
Date: 2019-11-18T00:00:00Declaration (of extension of time to file demurrer to cross-complaint)
Date: 2019-12-04T00:00:00Summons (on Cross Complaint (1st))
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses (to First Set of Requests for Admission)
Date: 2019-12-19T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses (to Defs Second Set of Form Interrogatories)
Date: 2019-12-19T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses (to Defs Firs Set of Requests for Production)
Date: 2019-12-19T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses (to Defs First Set of Special Interrogatories)
Date: 2019-12-19T00:00:00Notice ( of motion and motion to extend time to file demurrer)
Date: 2019-12-23T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-12-27T00:00:00Declaration (in support of extension to file responsive pleading)
Date: 2019-12-31T00:00:00Reply (in support of motion to compel)
Date: 2019-12-31T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendant's Motion to compel)
Date: 2020-01-06T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-01-06T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-12-31T00:00:00Declaration (In support of opposition to Defendant's motion to compel)
Date: 2020-01-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses; Hear...))
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2020-01-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 01/09/2020)
Date: 2020-01-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses))
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00Notice (OF COURT ORDER)
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00Notice (OF COURT ORDER)
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Non-Service)
Date: 2020-01-27T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (For Extension of Time)
Date: 2020-01-28T00:00:00Declaration (of Christian S. Molnar re Non-Service of Cross-Defendant Nguyen T. Phan)
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendant's motion to compel)
Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2020-02-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-02-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 02/28/2020)
Date: 2020-02-28T00:00:00Notice (of court order)
Date: 2020-04-27T00:00:00Notice (of order)
Date: 2020-06-10T00:00:00Notice (of CourtCall Appearance at Case Management Conference)
Date: 2020-07-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-07-16T00:00:00Amended Cross-Complaint ( (2nd))
Date: 2020-07-27T00:00:00Notice (OF RULING; NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: 2020-07-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Rescheduling of Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-08-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Rescheduling of Case Management Conference) of 08/17/2020)
Date: 2020-08-17T00:00:00Notice (of Mediation Hearing)
Date: 2020-08-25T00:00:00Notice (PLAINTIFF?S NOTICE OF ORDER)
Date: 2020-08-28T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (for extension to file responsive pleading)
Date: 2020-08-24T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Unavailability of Counsel)
Date: 2020-11-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement (THE PHANS? SUPPLEMENTAL CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT)
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Objection (to Re-Filed Motion to Strike by Cross-Defendants Lin and Pasadena Market Center)
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF ISSUES FOR INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE)
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00Notice (of idc issues)
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)))
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Declaration (of Wayne S. Grajewski ISO Motion to Compel Arbitration)
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Notice (of Unavailability of Lead Trial Counsel)
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00Notice (of Unavailability of Counsel)
Date: 2021-01-14T00:00:00Reply (IN OPPOSITION TO CROSS-COMPLAINANT, TANIA SAROYAN'S SECOND AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT)
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Reply (IN OPPOSITION TO CROSS-COMPLAINANT, TANIA SAROYAN'S SECOND AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT)
Date: 2021-02-11T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to continue hearing)
Date: 2021-02-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Hea...))
Date: 2021-02-19T00:00:00Reply (by Phans to Saroyan's Opposition to the Phans' Motion to Compel Arbitration)
Date: 2021-03-03T00:00:00Declaration ((Supplemental) of Wayne Grajewski ISO the Phans' Motion to Compel Arbitration)
Date: 2021-03-03T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration) of 03/10/2021)
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore ((Timothy McCoy, CSR #4745))
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration))
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Request for Dismissal ("NOT ENTERED")
Date: 2021-03-30T00:00:00"NOT ENTERED"
Date: 2021-03-17T00:00:00Summons (Second Amended Cross-Complaint)
Date: 2021-04-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)))
Date: 2021-05-11T00:00:00Answer (OF CROSS-DEFENDANT YESS, CORP. TO SECOND AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT)
Date: 2021-05-12T00:00:00Brief (The IDC Statement of Non-Party and Former Cross-Defendant Ngo Thanh Phan)
Date: 2021-06-24T00:00:00Notice (of idc issues)
Date: 2021-06-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)))
Date: 2021-06-29T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (to continue deadline)
Date: 2021-06-14T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-07-01T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion to Compel)
Date: 2021-07-01T00:00:00Reply (CROSS-DEFENDANTS REPLY TO TANIA SAROYANS OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION)
Date: 2021-07-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration) of 07/14/2021)
Date: 2021-07-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration))
Date: 2021-07-14T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore ((Wil S. Wilcox, CSR #9178))
Date: 2021-07-14T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL FOR JON A. ATABEK, ESQ.)
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00Reply (to defendants opposition)
Date: 2021-08-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses))
Date: 2021-08-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference re: Arbitration))
Date: 2021-09-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Rescheduling of Status Conference re: Arbitra...))
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (ON STATUS CONFERENCE RE: ARBITRATION; NOTICE OF CONTINUED STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: 2021-10-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference re: Settlement))
Date: 2021-10-19T00:00:00Declaration (of alfredo nava)
Date: 2021-12-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference re: Settlement))
Date: 2021-12-09T00:00:00Notice (of court order)
Date: 2021-12-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference re: Arbitration))
Date: 2021-12-21T00:00:00Motion in Limine (#1)
Date: 2022-01-11T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (for a court order)
Date: 2022-01-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for a court order))
Date: 2022-01-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application TO CONTINUE TRIAL, OR, IN THE...))
Date: 2022-02-04T00:00:00Opposition (to ex parte application)
Date: 2022-02-03T00:00:00Jury Instructions (PLAINTIFF'S PROPOSED SPECIAL JURY INSTRUCTIONS)
Date: 2022-02-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2022-02-10T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2022-02-14T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter ((Brenda Sanches, CSR #13019))
Date: 2022-02-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)])
Date: 2022-02-17T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2022-02-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)])
Date: 2022-02-14T00:00:00Opposition (PLAINTIFF?S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE #4; DECLARATION OF ALFREDO NAVA)
Date: 2022-02-22T00:00:00Jury Instructions (AMENDED)
Date: 2022-02-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Jury Trial (17200 Claims)))
Date: 2022-02-23T00:00:00Trial Brief (SUPPLEMENTAL TRIAL BRIEF RE: WAIVER OF DEFECTS IN NOTICE OF RENT INCREASES)
Date: 2022-02-22T00:00:00Notice (OF OMITTED WITNESS PLAINTIFF INTENDS TO CALL)
Date: 2022-02-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial (10-day estimate); Order to Show Cause Re: Why A B...))
Date: 2022-02-22T00:00:00Objection (by non-parties Ken Parsons and Evangeline Lin)
Date: 2022-02-22T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore ((Sandra Guerra, CSR #10977))
Date: 2022-02-23T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (ON EX PARTE APPLCIATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED ANSWER)
Date: 2022-03-14T00:00:00Joint Status Conference Report (JOINT REPORT REGARDING SELECTION OF ARBITRATOR)
Date: 2022-03-01T00:00:00Brief (IN SUPPORT OF JUDGMENT FOR PLAINTIFF ON HER EQUITABLE CLAIMS)
Date: 2022-03-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application TO SHORTEN TIME ON MOTION FO...))
Date: 2022-03-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference re: Arbitration; Order to Show Cause Re: Wh...))
Date: 2022-03-09T00:00:00Stipulation - No Order (JOINT FACT STIPULATION RE: HISTORIC RENTS PAID, AND AMOUNTS PAID TO SAROYAN)
Date: 2022-03-09T00:00:00Brief (on Plaintiff damages and liability)
Date: 2022-02-24T00:00:00Opposition (ex parte application)
Date: 2022-03-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Jury Trial (17200 Claims)))
Date: 2022-02-24T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter ((Justus Balentine, CSR #13859))
Date: 2022-02-24T00:00:00Notice (OF TRIAL TRANSCRIPTS FOR TRIAL PROCEEDINGS ON 2/23/22 AND 2/24/22)
Date: 2022-03-15T00:00:00Notice (of court order)
Date: 2019-05-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service As T...))
Date: 2019-06-03T00:00:00Notice ( of Unavailability of Lead Trial Counsel Christian S. Molnar)
Date: 2019-06-11T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order) of 06/26/2019)
Date: 2019-06-26T00:00:00Answer (TO SECOND AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT)
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2021-03-30T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (to toll deadline)
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)
Date: 2021-04-20T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.