Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Flores Elizabeth, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case represented by Davidson Benjamin, against Molina Healthcare Inc., represented by Domek Natasha L., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Lia Martin presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management141 days |
|
Filing DateMarch 21, 2019 |
CategoryWrongful Termination (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Case Cycle Time411 days |
Notice of Settlement
Date: April 10, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: August 12, 2019Answer
Date: June 06, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: July 24, 2019Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: March 25, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: March 21, 2019Complaint
Date: March 21, 2019Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: April 03, 2019Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: April 03, 2019Answer
Date: June 06, 2019Order - ORDER OF EXEMPTION FROM ELECTRONIC FILING AND SERVICE
Date: April 25, 2019Proof of Personal Service
Date: May 14, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: July 24, 2019Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: July 26, 2019Notice of Ruling
Date: August 12, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: August 27, 2019Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER PROTECTIVE ORDER-CONFIDENTIAL DESIGNATIONS
Date: August 26, 2019Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)
Date: April 21, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL
Date: October 11, 2019Notice of Settlement
Date: April 10, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT)
Date: April 27, 2020Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: 2019-04-03T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2019-04-03T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2019-03-21T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-03-21T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-03-21T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-03-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...))
Date: 2019-08-09T00:00:00Notice (of Unavailability of Counsel)
Date: 2019-10-11T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-07-26T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: May 05, 2020Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)
Date: April 21, 2020Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-05-14T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Protective Order-Confidential Designations)
Date: 2019-08-26T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2019-07-26T00:00:00Order (of Exemption from Electronic Filing and Service)
Date: 2019-04-25T00:00:00Request (for Exemption from Mandatory Electronic Filing and Service)
Date: 2019-04-19T00:00:00Notice (of Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement))
Date: April 27, 2020Notice (of Mandatory Settlement Conference)
Date: 2019-08-27T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.