Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Walker Dequane, Williams Stacey, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case against Coulson Holly O.T., Select Physical Therapy Business Entity Type Unknown, represented by Kjar James Jorgen, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Spring Street Courthouse with Jon R. Takasugi presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJon R. Takasugi Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateMarch 14, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions491 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
|
Filing Court HouseSpring Street Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Case Cycle Time491 days |
Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion
Date: November 15, 2019Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: March 14, 2019Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: March 14, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: March 14, 2019PI General Order
Date: March 28, 2019Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel
Date: August 09, 2019Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: August 09, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL)
Date: September 10, 2019Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: September 10, 2019Notice of Ruling
Date: September 30, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY (NOT "FURTHER DISCOVERY...)
Date: December 16, 2019Notice of Ruling
Date: December 17, 2019Motion for Terminating Sanctions
Date: January 22, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS)
Date: February 20, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: February 26, 2020Motion for Terminating Sanctions
Date: February 27, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER
Date: February 28, 2020Order - Dismissal
Date: July 17, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: July 17, 2020Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service
Date: July 21, 2020Motion for Terminating Sanctions
Date: 2020-01-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery...))
Date: 2019-12-16T00:00:00Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: 2019-09-10T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2019-03-14T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-04-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-03-14T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-03-14T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel
Date: 2019-08-09T00:00:00Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion
Date: 2019-11-15T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-09-30T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: 2019-08-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Terminating Sanctions))
Date: 2020-02-20T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-03-14T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2019-07-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order] and Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates)
Date: 2019-03-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel))
Date: 2019-09-10T00:00:00PI General Order
Date: 2019-03-28T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-02-26T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-12-17T00:00:00Motion for Terminating Sanctions
Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Continuance of Motion Pursuant to Emergency Or...))
Date: 2020-04-16T00:00:00Order - Dismissal
Date: July 17, 2020Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Terminating Sanctions))
Date: July 17, 2020Notice (of Entry of Judgment or Order)
Date: 2020-02-28T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service
Date: July 21, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: July 17, 2020For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.