Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Gomez Leon An Individual Citlali Maribel, Gomez Leon An Individual Xochylth Marisol, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Koshkaryan Vahagn, against Bannister An Individual Anthony Lewis, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Spring Street Courthouse with Stephen I. Goorvitch presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephen I. Goorvitch Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 06, 2019 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle - Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseSpring Street Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Summons - Summons on Complaint
Date: March 06, 2019Notice - Notice Plaintiffs' Demand for Jury Trial
Date: March 06, 2019Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: March 06, 2019Complaint
Date: March 06, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: March 06, 2019Proof of Personal Service
Date: April 16, 2019Other - - STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES
Date: March 08, 2019Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: March 13, 2020Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)
Date: March 13, 2020Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: March 26, 2020Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: April 07, 2020Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: April 09, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: AUGUST 19, 2020)
Date: July 29, 2020Proof of Personal Service
Date: July 13, 2021Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: July 13, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: October 20, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO ENTER DEFAUL...)
Date: September 17, 2021Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: October 20, 2021Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment
Date: October 20, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION RE: PREJUDGMENT INTEREST
Date: October 20, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO ENTER DEFAUL...)
Date: November 10, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: December 16, 2021Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment
Date: December 16, 2021Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: December 16, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO ENTER DEFAUL...)
Date: December 20, 2021Order - Dismissal
Date: January 26, 2022Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Dismissal
Date: July 27, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO SET ASIDE/VACATE DISMISSAL (CCP 473))
Date: September 15, 2022Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment
Date: October 12, 2022Default Judgment
Date: October 12, 2022Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: October 12, 2022Request for Dismissal
Date: October 12, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO ENTER DEFAUL...)
Date: November 18, 2022Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-03-06T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-03-06T00:00:00Notice (Plaintiffs' Demand for Jury Trial)
Date: 2019-03-06T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2019-03-06T00:00:00Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates
Date: 2019-03-08T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-03-06T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-04-16T00:00:00Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)
Date: 2020-03-13T00:00:00Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)
Date: 2020-03-13T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2020-03-13T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: 2020-03-26T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2020-04-07T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: 2020-04-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: August 19, 2020) of 07/29/2020)
Date: 2020-07-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: August 19, 2020))
Date: 2020-07-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: dismissal for failure to enter defaul...))
Date: 2021-06-15T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: dismissal for failure to enter defaul...))
Date: 2021-07-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: dismissal for failure to enter defaul...))
Date: 2021-09-17T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration re: Prejudgment Interest)
Date: 2021-10-20T00:00:00Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment
Date: 2021-10-20T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration re: Prejudgment Interest)
Date: 2021-10-20T00:00:00Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment
Date: 2021-10-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: dismissal for failure to enter defaul...))
Date: 2021-10-21T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2021-10-20T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2021-10-20T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2021-10-20T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2021-12-16T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration RE: Plaintiff, Xochylth Marisol Gomez Leon's, Prejudgment Interest)
Date: 2021-12-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: dismissal for failure to enter defaul...))
Date: 2021-12-20T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration RE: Plaintiff, Citlali Maribel Gomez Leon's, Prejudgment Interest)
Date: 2021-12-16T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2021-12-16T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2021-12-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: dismissal for failure to enter defaul...))
Date: 2021-11-10T00:00:00Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment
Date: 2021-12-16T00:00:00Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment
Date: 2021-12-16T00:00:00Order - Dismissal
Date: 2022-01-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: dismissal for failure to enter defaul...))
Date: 2022-01-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: dismissal for failure to enter defaul...))
Date: 2022-01-26T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.