Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Barekat Poupak, filed a(n) Intentional Torts - Torts case represented by Manning Joseph R. Jr, against Eun 3819 Enterprise Inc. A California Corporation, represented by Katz Ira Neil, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Stephanie M. Bowick presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management426 days |
|
Filing DateJune 22, 2018 |
CategoryCivil Rights/Discrimination (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeIntentional Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Case Cycle Time615 days |
Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: June 22, 2018Complaint
Date: June 22, 2018Other - - Register of Actions Orange Co.
Date: February 20, 2019Other - - Payment Receipt from Orange Co. 08/01/2018
Date: February 20, 2019Other - - Clerk's Certification Orange Co. 01/31/2019
Date: February 20, 2019Other - - Clerk's Certificate and Receipt for Transfer of Records
Date: February 20, 2019Other - - Payment Receipt from Orange Co. 06/22/2018
Date: February 20, 2019Other - - Notice of Case Reassignment Orange Co. 07/30/2018
Date: February 20, 2019Notice - Notice of Hearing from Orange Co. 08/08/2018
Date: February 20, 2019Notice - Notice of Motion for Change of Venue; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declaration
Date: February 20, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: February 20, 2019Minute Order - Minute Order from Orange Co. 10/04/2018
Date: February 20, 2019Opposition - Opposition to Defendant's Demurrer to Plaintiff's Complaint
Date: February 20, 2019Minute Order - Minute Order from Orange Co. 10/19/2018
Date: February 20, 2019Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: February 20, 2019Other - - Plaintiff's objection to Defendant's Reply
Date: February 20, 2019Other - - Payment Receipt from Orange Co. 10/22/2018
Date: February 20, 2019Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: February 20, 2019Summons - Summons Filed in orange Co. 06/22/2018
Date: February 20, 2019Reply - Reply by Defendant to the Opposition of Demurrer; Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: February 20, 2019Reply - Reply to Opposition to Motion for Change of Venue; Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: February 20, 2019Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: May 14, 2019Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: March 14, 2019Proof of Service by Mail
Date: May 22, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: July 29, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: July 30, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: August 22, 2019Notice of Ruling
Date: August 28, 2019Objection - OBJECTION OBJECTIONS TO MTS FOR FAILURE TO M&C
Date: November 19, 2019Objection - OBJECTION OBJECTIONS TO DEMURRER FOR FAILURE TO M&C
Date: November 19, 2019Amended Complaint - FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: November 19, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: November 25, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: December 03, 2019Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 12/03/2019
Date: December 03, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: December 04, 2019Answer
Date: December 17, 2019Request for Dismissal
Date: February 27, 2020Transfer In Case Documents
Date: 2018-06-22T00:00:00Objection (Objections to MTS for Failure to M&C)
Date: 2019-11-19T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendant's Motion to Strike; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support thereof)
Date: 2019-02-20T00:00:00Summons (Filed in orange Co. 06/22/2018)
Date: 2019-02-20T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-11-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-02-20T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2019-03-14T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendant's Demurrer to Plaintiff's Complaint)
Date: 2019-02-20T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-02-20T00:00:00Notice (by Defendant of Demurrer and Statement of Demurrer; Memorandum of Points and Authorities)
Date: 2019-02-20T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-07-29T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2018-06-22T00:00:00Plaintiff's objection to Defendant's Reply
Date: 2019-02-20T00:00:00Clerk's Certification Orange Co. 01/31/2019
Date: 2019-02-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2019-08-22T00:00:00Notice (of Hearing from Orange Co. 08/08/2018)
Date: 2019-02-20T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: February 27, 2020Notice of Motion (NOTICE BY DEFENDANT OF DEMURRER AND STATEMENT OF DEMURRER)
Date: 2019-08-28T00:00:00Register of Actions Orange Co.
Date: 2019-02-20T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment Orange Co. 07/30/2018
Date: 2019-02-20T00:00:00Payment Receipt from Orange Co. 10/22/2018
Date: 2019-02-20T00:00:00Reply (by Defendant to the Opposition of Demurrer; Memorandum of Points and Authorities)
Date: 2019-02-20T00:00:00Payment Receipt from Orange Co. 08/01/2018
Date: 2019-02-20T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2018-06-22T00:00:00Notice of Incoming Transfer
Date: 2019-02-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Payment Receipt from Orange Co. 06/22/2018
Date: 2019-02-20T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case (from Orange Co. 06/22/2018)
Date: 2019-02-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 12/03/2019)
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Notice (of Transfer, Reclassification and/or Consolidation (Orange Co. 11/05/2018))
Date: 2019-02-20T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2019-05-22T00:00:00Minute Order (from Orange Co. 10/19/2018)
Date: 2019-02-20T00:00:00Reply (to Opposition to Motion for Change of Venue; Memorandum of Points and Authorities)
Date: 2019-02-20T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2019-02-20T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-08-28T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2019-05-14T00:00:00Minute Order (from Orange Co. 10/04/2018)
Date: 2019-02-20T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-07-30T00:00:00Amended Complaint (1st)
Date: 2019-11-19T00:00:00Notice (of Motion for Change of Venue; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declaration)
Date: 2019-02-20T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate and Receipt for Transfer of Records
Date: 2019-02-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: December 04, 2019Notice of Motion (NOTICE BY DEFENDANT OF ITS MOTION TO STRIKE PART OF THE COMPLAINT)
Date: 2019-08-28T00:00:00Answer
Date: December 17, 2019Objection (Objections to Demurrer for Failure to M&C)
Date: 2019-11-19T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.