Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Khory An Individual Jason, O'Dell An Individual Ashley, Youssef An Individual Fidaa, Youssef An Individual Jonathan, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Mazza Steven L. Esq., against Youssef An Individual Fidaa, Youssef An Individual Jonathan, represented by Gibbs Patrick Joseph, Kwan Edward Michael, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Jon R. Takasugi presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 05, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review Re Notice of Related Cases;) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-08-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Notice of Settlement) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-06-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: December 07, 2022Separate Statement; Filed by: Ashley O'Dell, an Individual (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-22T00:00:00Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-02-06T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-02-05T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Jonathan Youssef, an Individual (Defendant); Fidaa Youssef, an Individual (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-10-05T00:00:00Order - Dismissal; Filed by: Court
Date: 2022-12-07T00:00:00Complaint
Date: February 05, 2019Summons - Summons on Complaint
Date: February 05, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: February 05, 2019Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: February 05, 2019Other - - Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates
Date: February 06, 2019Proof of Personal Service
Date: February 25, 2019Notice of Deposit - Jury
Date: April 02, 2019Answer
Date: April 02, 2019Demand for Jury Trial
Date: April 02, 2019Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: April 10, 2019Cross-Complaint
Date: April 10, 2019Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED ANSWER
Date: July 25, 2019Answer
Date: August 13, 2019Notice of Ruling
Date: August 13, 2019Separate Statement
Date: June 22, 2020Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-24T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Ashley O'Dell (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: July 24, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))
Date: July 31, 2020Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUED INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE
Date: July 31, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE)
Date: August 04, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: August 04, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))
Date: August 18, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: August 18, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF ROBERTO BERNARDO
Date: February 16, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF DAVID A. GEHRET MD
Date: February 16, 2021Separate Statement
Date: February 16, 2021Motion to Continue Trial Date
Date: February 23, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF ROBERTO BERNARDO IN SUPPORT
Date: February 23, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL)
Date: March 24, 2021Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL
Date: April 06, 2021Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: June 18, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: July 29, 2021Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION
Date: July 29, 2021Answer
Date: August 11, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER FOR COMMISION TO...)
Date: September 02, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: September 15, 2021Subpoena & Proof of Service
Date: September 17, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: December 10, 2021Motion to Continue Trial Date
Date: December 14, 2021Commission to Take Deposition Outside California
Date: December 30, 2021Unknown - EX PARTE PROPOSED ORDER
Date: December 30, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER FOR COMMISSION T...)
Date: December 30, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL)
Date: January 11, 2022Notice of Ruling
Date: January 18, 2022Separate Statement
Date: January 18, 2022Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts
Date: January 18, 2022Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: January 18, 2022Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: April 04, 2022Notice of Settlement
Date: April 20, 2022Notice of Continuance
Date: May 13, 2022Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts
Date: May 13, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT)
Date: June 01, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))
Date: July 18, 2022Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NOT ENTERED
Date: November 04, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))
Date: October 05, 2022Order - Dismissal
Date: December 07, 2022Request for Dismissal
Date: December 07, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))
Date: December 07, 2022Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-02-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-02-05T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2019-02-05T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-02-05T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2019-04-02T00:00:00Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates
Date: 2019-02-06T00:00:00Motion for Leave to Amend (Defendants notice of motion and motion for leave to amend answer)
Date: 2019-06-28T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendants Motion for Leave to File Amended Answer)
Date: 2019-07-25T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-04-02T00:00:00Notice of Deposit - Jury
Date: 2019-04-02T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-04-10T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2019-04-10T00:00:00Reply (Defendants reply to plaintiffs opposition to motion for leave to amend answer)
Date: 2019-08-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re Notice of Related Cases;))
Date: 2019-08-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review Re Notice of Related Cases;) of 08/19/2019)
Date: 2019-08-19T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-08-13T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-08-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Leave to Amend DEFENDANT?S NOTICE OF MO...))
Date: 2019-08-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Leave to File a Cross-Complaint))
Date: 2020-03-02T00:00:00Opposition (OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR LEAVE)
Date: 2020-02-18T00:00:00Motion for Leave to File a Cross-Complaint
Date: 2020-01-28T00:00:00Declaration (in Support of Plaintiffs Motion to Consolidate)
Date: 2020-03-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of 03/24/2020)
Date: 2020-03-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 03/24/2020)
Date: 2020-03-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-03-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2020-03-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Continuance of Motion Pursuant to Emergency Or...))
Date: 2020-04-29T00:00:00Opposition (defendants opposition to plaintiffs motion to consolidate case)
Date: 2020-04-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-07-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (COURT ORDER RE SETTING INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC)))
Date: 2020-06-24T00:00:00Supplemental Declaration (SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF CINDY PHAM)
Date: 2020-07-31T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((COURT ORDER RE SETTING INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC)) of 06/24/2020)
Date: 2020-06-24T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-08-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Consolidate))
Date: 2020-08-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC)))
Date: 2020-07-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC)))
Date: 2020-08-04T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF CONTINUED INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE)
Date: 2020-07-31T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-08-18T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts (- Off Calendar)
Date: 2020-08-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC)))
Date: 2020-08-18T00:00:00Declaration (declaration of david a. gehret md)
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Motion to Compel (motion to compel plaintiff Jason khoury to appear for indenpendent mental examination)
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Continue Trial))
Date: 2021-03-24T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION OF ROBERTO BERNARDO IN SUPPORT)
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00Motion to Continue Trial Date
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00Reply (DEFENDANTS REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTIONS TO COMPEL PLAINITFF JASON KHOURY TO APPEAR)
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00Reply (DEFENDANTS REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTIONS TO COMPEL PLAINITFF JASON KHOURY)
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to Continue Trial and Trial-Related Dates)
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2021-06-18T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (on Ex parte Application)
Date: 2021-07-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application FOR AN ORDER FOR COMMISION TO...))
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2021-07-29T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2021-12-10T00:00:00Motion to Continue Trial Date (AND ALL TRIAL-RELATED DATES;)
Date: 2021-12-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial and Trial-R...))
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Plaintiff to Appear for Independe...))
Date: 2021-04-19T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-09-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an Order for Commission t...))
Date: 2021-12-30T00:00:00Commission to Take Deposition Outside California
Date: 2021-12-30T00:00:00Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE NOTICE OF RELATED CASES;)
Date: August 19, 2019Motion for Leave to File a Cross-Complaint
Date: January 28, 2020Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR LEAVE
Date: February 18, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE
Date: March 18, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A CROSS-COMPLAINT)
Date: March 02, 2020Motion to Consolidate
Date: March 18, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)
Date: March 24, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/24/2020
Date: March 24, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: March 24, 2020Subpoena & Proof of Service
Date: 2021-09-17T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Declaration (declaration of roberto bernardo)
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendants Motion to Compel)
Date: 2021-04-06T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-02-25T00:00:00Motion to Consolidate
Date: 2020-03-18T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2020-06-22T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2020-06-22T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.