Case Last Refreshed: 7 hours ago
Ionic Enterprises Inc. A Corporation, Sunamerica Housing Fund 567 A Nevada Limited Partnership, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Genender David M., House Ariel D, against Ionic Enterprises Inc. A Corporation, represented by Adams Jason Michael, Gadbois Barbara Ringness, Kornblatt Sara Hilary, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Superior with Stephanie M. Bowick presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management115 days |
|
Filing DateJanuary 28, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedJune 16, 2024 |
||
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
||
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-23T00:00:00TENTATIVE AND PROPOSED STATEMENT OF DECISION; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-04-08T00:00:00Appeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed (B322443); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-12-09T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-05-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-03-04T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-12-15T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Ionic Enterprises, Inc., a corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2022-07-08T00:00:00FINAL STATEMENT OF DECISION; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-04-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for [FINAL STATEMENT OF DECISION]; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-04-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for [Judgment]; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-05-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-29T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-08-17T00:00:00Appellate Order Dismissing Appeal B322443; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-12-09T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Ionic Enterprises, Inc., a corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone; Filed by: Ionic Enterprises, Inc., a corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-17T00:00:00AMENDED FINAL STATEMENT OF DECISION; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-05-20T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Ionic Enterprises, Inc., a corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-01T00:00:00Certificate of Service; Filed by: SunAmerica Housing Fund 567, a Nevada Limited Partnership (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: December 16, 2022Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Sara Hilary Kornblatt (Attorney)
Date: 2022-03-16T00:00:00Motion for Attorney Fees; Filed by: Ionic Enterprises, Inc., a corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2022-07-08T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-02-15T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Ionic Enterprises, Inc., a corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2020-07-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-06-11T00:00:00Order GRANTING EX PARTE; Filed by: SunAmerica Housing Fund 567, a Nevada Limited Partnership (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-05-08T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-16T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-01-28T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: SunAmerica Housing Fund 567, a Nevada Limited Partnership (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-30T00:00:00Exhibit List JOINT; Filed by: SunAmerica Housing Fund 567, a Nevada Limited Partnership (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-20T00:00:00Witness List; Filed by: SunAmerica Housing Fund 567, a Nevada Limited Partnership (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-01T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Ionic Enterprises, Inc., a corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2020-07-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-11-02T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone; Filed by: Ionic Enterprises, Inc., a corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-28T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading); Filed by: Ionic Enterprises, Inc., a corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-03-03T00:00:00Notice of Deposit - Jury; Filed by: Ionic Enterprises, Inc., a corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-02T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: SunAmerica Housing Fund 567, a Nevada Limited Partnership (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Trial Brief; Filed by: Ionic Enterprises, Inc., a corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-22T00:00:00Trial Brief; Filed by: SunAmerica Housing Fund 567, a Nevada Limited Partnership (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-05-13T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-02-15T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by SunAmerica Housing Fund 567, a Nevada Limited Partnership (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Cross-Complaint Filed by Ionic Enterprises, Inc., a corporation (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2019-06-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Pro Hac Vice Supplemental Decl...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-05-31T00:00:00Order (GRANTING EX PARTE) Filed by SunAmerica Housing Fund 567, a Nevada Limited Partnership (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-11-09T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by SunAmerica Housing Fund 567, a Nevada Limited Partnership (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-06-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-11-02T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Ionic Enterprises, Inc., a corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone Filed by Ionic Enterprises, Inc., a corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-11-08T00:00:00Trial Brief Filed by Ionic Enterprises, Inc., a corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Ionic Enterprises, Inc., a corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2022-07-08T00:00:00AMENDED FINAL STATEMENT OF DECISION Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-20T00:00:00Motion for Attorney Fees Filed by Ionic Enterprises, Inc., a corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2022-07-08T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice; Case Managemen...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-05-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-05-08T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Jury Trial/Issuance of Court's TENTATIVE AND PROPOSED STA...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-04-08T00:00:00Appeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed ((B322443)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-09T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary) Filed by Ionic Enterprises, Inc., a corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2022-06-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-31T00:00:00Trial Brief Filed by SunAmerica Housing Fund 567, a Nevada Limited Partnership (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Order Continuing the Tria...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-11-07T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by SunAmerica Housing Fund 567, a Nevada Limited Partnership (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by SunAmerica Housing Fund 567, a Nevada Limited Partnership (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-01T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Ionic Enterprises, Inc., a corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2020-07-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-16T00:00:00Answer Filed by Ionic Enterprises, Inc., a corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2019-06-17T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by SunAmerica Housing Fund 567, a Nevada Limited Partnership (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-06-11T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone Filed by Ionic Enterprises, Inc., a corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-05-13T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading) Filed by Ionic Enterprises, Inc., a corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-05-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Ionic Enterprises, Inc., a corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-01T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-01-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-05-13T00:00:00Complaint Filed by SunAmerica Housing Fund 567, a Nevada Limited Partnership (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Jury Trial) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-04T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Judgment]) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-20T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by Sara Hilary Kornblatt (Attorney)
Date: 2022-03-16T00:00:00Judgment Filed by Ionic Enterprises, Inc., a corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2022-05-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: December 16, 2022Exhibit List (JOINT) Filed by SunAmerica Housing Fund 567, a Nevada Limited Partnership (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Jury Trial; Non-Appearance Case Review)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-11-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Jury Trial;)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-11-15T00:00:00Certificate (of Service) Filed by SunAmerica Housing Fund 567, a Nevada Limited Partnership (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-11-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-11-02T00:00:00Notice of Deposit - Jury Filed by Ionic Enterprises, Inc., a corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-02T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Ionic Enterprises, Inc., a corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2020-07-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-11-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Post-Mediation Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00Witness List Filed by SunAmerica Housing Fund 567, a Nevada Limited Partnership (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([FINAL STATEMENT OF DECISION]) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-04-22T00:00:00TENTATIVE AND PROPOSED STATEMENT OF DECISION Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-04-08T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-15T00:00:00FINAL STATEMENT OF DECISION Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-04-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-04T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-03T00:00:00Appellate Order Dismissing Appeal (B322443) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-16T00:00:00Appeal Record Delivered Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-09-02T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary) Filed by Ionic Enterprises, Inc., a corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2022-06-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-03T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2019-01-28T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-01-28T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone
Date: 2019-05-01T00:00:00Notice of Hearing on Petition
Date: 2019-04-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-01-28T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-01-28T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: 2019-04-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-05-01T00:00:00Notice of Deposit - Jury
Date: 2019-05-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-05-01T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: 2019-02-28T00:00:00Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice
Date: 2019-04-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2019-02-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order) of )
Date: 2019-05-13T00:00:00Reply (to Opposition to Motion and Motion to Strike Portions of Complaint)
Date: 2019-05-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2019-05-08T00:00:00Declaration ( of Thomas Mustante ISO Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Strike)
Date: 2019-05-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order) of )
Date: 2019-05-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice; Case Managemen...))
Date: 2019-05-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2019-05-13T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application
Date: 2019-11-06T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-06-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2019-06-11T00:00:00Declaration (of Dean Obst in support of Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order) of )
Date: 2019-06-11T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2019-06-17T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Judgment or Order)
Date: 2019-11-08T00:00:00Order (GRANTING EX PARTE)
Date: 2019-11-07T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-05-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Order Continuing the Tria...))
Date: 2019-11-07T00:00:00Answer (to Cross-Complaint)
Date: 2019-07-19T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (for Order Continuing the Trial Date)
Date: 2019-11-06T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2020-07-24T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2020-04-16T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Notice (OF CONTINUED HEARING DATE FOR DEFENDANT?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT)
Date: 2020-04-23T00:00:00Notice (SunAmerica Housing Fund 567's Notice of Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2019-12-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-04-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2020-07-29T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2020-07-24T00:00:00Opposition (Ionic Enterprises, Inc.?s Opposition to Plaintiff?s Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2020-07-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-07-29T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-08-10T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone
Date: 2020-08-17T00:00:00Reply (Plaintiff SunAmerica Housing Fund 567s Reply In Support of Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2020-08-10T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone
Date: 2020-08-17T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-08-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment) of )
Date: 2020-08-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment))
Date: 2020-09-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment))
Date: 2020-08-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment) of )
Date: 2020-10-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: 2021-08-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Post-Mediation Status Conference))
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment))
Date: 2020-10-23T00:00:00Certificate (of Service)
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone)
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference))
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Declaration (OF ARIEL D. HOUSE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF SUNAMERICA HOUSING FUND 567?S MOTIONS IN LIMINE)
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00Exhibit List (JOINT)
Date: 2021-11-01T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-10-22T00:00:00Trial Brief
Date: 2021-10-22T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Joint Stipulation Regarding Remote Trial)
Date: 2021-11-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-11-02T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone
Date: 2021-10-26T00:00:00Trial Brief
Date: 2021-10-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2021-11-02T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2021-11-01T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone
Date: 2021-10-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2021-11-02T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (JOINT NOTICE OF LODGMENT OF DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPTS)
Date: 2021-11-03T00:00:00Opposition (TO POST-TRIAL CLOSING BRIEF OF PLAINTIFF AND CROSS-DEFENDANT SUNAMERICA HOUSING FUND 567)
Date: 2021-12-22T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2022-03-16T00:00:00Judgment
Date: 2022-05-20T00:00:00Response (TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR STATEMENT OF DECISION)
Date: 2021-12-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of )
Date: 2022-03-03T00:00:00TENTATIVE AND PROPOSED STATEMENT OF DECISION
Date: 2022-04-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Jury Trial))
Date: 2021-11-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2022-03-03T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order
Date: 2022-05-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Jury Trial) of )
Date: 2022-03-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2022-05-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([FINAL STATEMENT OF DECISION])
Date: 2022-04-22T00:00:00Brief (Plaintifff SunAmerica Housing Fund 567's Post-Trial Brief)
Date: 2021-12-08T00:00:00Objection (to the Proposed Statement of Decision Pursuant to Cal. Rule of Court 3.1590(g))
Date: 2022-04-18T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2022-01-31T00:00:00Reply (to Post-Trial Brief)
Date: 2021-12-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Jury Trial; Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2021-11-16T00:00:00FINAL STATEMENT OF DECISION
Date: 2022-04-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of , and the Amended Final Statement of Decision)
Date: 2022-05-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Jury Trial))
Date: 2022-01-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Jury Trial))
Date: 2021-11-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Jury Trial))
Date: 2021-11-08T00:00:00Brief (Post-trial Closing Brief of Defendant Ionic Enterprises, Inc.)
Date: 2021-12-08T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Court Order Regarding Remote Trial)
Date: 2021-11-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Jury Trial))
Date: 2022-03-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Jury Trial/Issuance of Court's TENTATIVE AND PROPOSED STA...))
Date: 2022-04-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Jury Trial;))
Date: 2021-11-15T00:00:00AMENDED FINAL STATEMENT OF DECISION
Date: 2022-05-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Judgment])
Date: 2022-05-20T00:00:00Objection (Plaintiff's Objections to the Proposed Judgment)
Date: 2022-05-06T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: 2022-06-08T00:00:00Appeal Record Delivered
Date: 2022-09-02T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2022-07-08T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed
Date: 2022-07-19T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: 2022-06-02T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal
Date: 2022-08-17T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-
Date: 2022-08-01T00:00:00Motion for Attorney Fees
Date: 2022-07-08T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-01-28T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: 2019-04-05T00:00:00Declaration ( of Thomas Mustante ISO Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Strike)
Date: 2019-05-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order) of 05/08/2019)
Date: 2019-05-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2019-05-08T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order) of 05/13/2019)
Date: 2019-05-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2019-05-13T00:00:00Reply (to Opposition to Motion and Motion to Strike Portions of Complaint)
Date: 2019-05-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice; Case Managemen...))
Date: 2019-05-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order) of 06/11/2019)
Date: 2019-06-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2019-06-11T00:00:00Answer (to Cross-Complaint)
Date: 2019-07-19T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (for Order Continuing the Trial Date)
Date: 2019-11-06T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Judgment or Order)
Date: 2019-11-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Order Continuing the Tria...))
Date: 2019-11-07T00:00:00Order (GRANTING EX PARTE)
Date: 2019-11-07T00:00:00Notice (SunAmerica Housing Fund 567's Notice of Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2019-12-06T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Declaration (of Dean Obst in support of Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/16/2020)
Date: 2020-04-16T00:00:00Notice (OF CONTINUED HEARING DATE FOR DEFENDANT?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT)
Date: 2020-04-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-04-16T00:00:00Opposition (Ionic Enterprises, Inc.?s Opposition to Plaintiff?s Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2020-07-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 07/29/2020)
Date: 2020-07-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-07-29T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-08-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment))
Date: 2020-08-20T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-08-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment))
Date: 2020-09-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment) of 08/20/2020)
Date: 2020-08-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment) of 10/23/2020)
Date: 2020-10-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment))
Date: 2020-10-23T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone)
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference))
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Certificate (of Service)
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Post-Mediation Status Conference))
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: 2021-08-20T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-10-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 11/02/2021)
Date: 2021-11-02T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Joint Stipulation Regarding Remote Trial)
Date: 2021-11-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-11-02T00:00:00Exhibit List (JOINT)
Date: 2021-11-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2021-11-02T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Court Order Regarding Remote Trial)
Date: 2021-11-08T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (JOINT NOTICE OF LODGMENT OF DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPTS)
Date: 2021-11-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Jury Trial))
Date: 2021-11-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Jury Trial))
Date: 2021-11-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Jury Trial))
Date: 2021-11-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Jury Trial;))
Date: 2021-11-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Jury Trial))
Date: 2022-01-31T00:00:00Brief (Plaintifff SunAmerica Housing Fund 567's Post-Trial Brief)
Date: 2021-12-08T00:00:00Reply (to Post-Trial Brief)
Date: 2021-12-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of 03/03/2022)
Date: 2022-03-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2022-03-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Jury Trial; Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2021-11-16T00:00:00Opposition (TO POST-TRIAL CLOSING BRIEF OF PLAINTIFF AND CROSS-DEFENDANT SUNAMERICA HOUSING FUND 567)
Date: 2021-12-22T00:00:00Brief (Post-trial Closing Brief of Defendant Ionic Enterprises, Inc.)
Date: 2021-12-08T00:00:00Response (TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR STATEMENT OF DECISION)
Date: 2021-12-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Jury Trial) of 03/04/2022)
Date: 2022-03-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Jury Trial))
Date: 2022-03-04T00:00:00Declaration (OF ARIEL D. HOUSE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF SUNAMERICA HOUSING FUND 567?S MOTIONS IN LIMINE)
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00Reply (Plaintiff SunAmerica Housing Fund 567s Reply In Support of Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2020-08-10T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.