Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Benson Susan M, Benson Susan Mary Esq., against Sobay Mark Alan, represented by Macdonald Scott L, Moon Michael Francis Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Laura A. Seigle presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLaura A. Seigle Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 15, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-01-15T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: SCOTT L MACDONALD (Attorney)
Date: 2020-04-27T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Mark Alan Sobay (Defendant)
Date: 2019-10-01T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Jury Instructions; Filed by: Mark Alan Sobay (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-06-15T00:00:00PI General Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-03-13T00:00:00Exhibit List; Filed by: Mark Alan Sobay (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-27T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: SUSAN M BENSON (Attorney)
Date: 2019-11-25T00:00:00Motion to Quash; Filed by: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-17T00:00:00Witness List; Filed by: Mark Alan Sobay (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-27T00:00:00Statement of the Case; Filed by: Mark Alan Sobay (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-27T00:00:00Trial Transfer Order as to Judge Nishimoto, Torrance Dept. E, OTR on at 1:30 p.m. Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-05-17T00:00:00Complaint
Date: January 15, 2019Summons - Summons on Complaint
Date: January 15, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: January 15, 2019Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: January 15, 2019PI General Order
Date: March 13, 2019Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: October 01, 2019Proof of Personal Service
Date: October 15, 2019Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: November 25, 2019Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: April 27, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: June 15, 2020Motion to Quash
Date: June 17, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO QUASH DEMAND TO APPEAR AND PRODUCE DOCUM...)
Date: November 23, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: November 30, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)
Date: February 05, 2021Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND TRIAL
Date: February 08, 2021Statement of the Case
Date: April 27, 2022Exhibit List
Date: April 27, 2022Jury Instructions
Date: April 27, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE;)
Date: May 03, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL)
Date: May 31, 2022Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ELECTION TO FORGO AFFIDAVIT CCP170.6
Date: May 17, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL)
Date: May 17, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL)
Date: May 26, 2022Request for Dismissal
Date: June 20, 2022Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2022-04-27T00:00:00Motion to Quash
Date: 2020-06-17T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion in Limine 4 to Preclude Dollar Figure Argument)
Date: 2022-04-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Setting of Motion Pursuant to Emergency Order ...) of )
Date: 2020-06-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Quash Demand to Appear and Produce Docum...))
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-06-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-01-15T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-01-15T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2020-04-27T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2019-11-25T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2022-04-27T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2022-04-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order] and Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates)
Date: 2019-03-13T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2019-01-15T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Final Status Conference and Trial)
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Motion in Limine (DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NUMBER (4) TO PRECLUDE DOLLAR FIGURE ARGUMENT;)
Date: 2022-04-26T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2019-10-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2020-06-15T00:00:00Answer (DEFENDANT MARK ALAN SOBAY?S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL)
Date: 2019-10-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Setting of Motion Pursuant to Emergency Order ...))
Date: 2020-06-18T00:00:00PI General Order
Date: 2019-03-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference))
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-01-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference;))
Date: 2022-05-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2022-05-26T00:00:00Trial Transfer Order (as to Judge Nishimoto, Torrance Dept. E, OTR on at 1:30 p.m.)
Date: 2022-05-17T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Election to Forgo Affidavit CCP170.6)
Date: 2022-05-17T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2022-04-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2022-05-17T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2020-04-27T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2019-11-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-06-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order] and Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates)
Date: 2019-03-13T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-01-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Quash Demand to Appear and Produce Docum...))
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 06/15/2020)
Date: 2020-06-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Setting of Motion Pursuant to Emergency Order ...))
Date: 2020-06-18T00:00:00Answer (DEFENDANT MARK ALAN SOBAY?S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL)
Date: 2019-10-01T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.