Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Community Funeral Services Inc. A California Corporation, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Hinks Matthew David, against City Of Los Angeles A Municipal Corporation, represented by Velazquez Ernesto, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Laura A. Seigle presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 20, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by: City of Los Angeles, a municipal corporation (Respondent)
Date: 2021-03-11T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-18T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: City of Los Angeles, a municipal corporation (Respondent)
Date: 2022-02-09T00:00:00Motion to Dismiss; Filed by: City of Los Angeles, a municipal corporation (Respondent)
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: City of Los Angeles, a municipal corporation (Respondent)
Date: 2021-03-11T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-07-06T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-03-17T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: City of Los Angeles, a municipal corporation (Respondent)
Date: 2022-06-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFS) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-08-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (RULING ON MATTER SUBMITTED ON AUGUST 25, 2022) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-09-12T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-09-12T00:00:00Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-09-12T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: December 20, 2019Summons - SUMMONS ON PETITION
Date: December 20, 2019Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: December 20, 2019Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon
Date: December 24, 2019Petition for Writ of Mandate
Date: December 20, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF FILING VERIFICATION TO PETITION AND COMPLAINT
Date: January 15, 2020Proof of Personal Service
Date: February 14, 2020Request for Judicial Notice
Date: March 16, 2020Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: March 16, 2020Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: March 18, 2020Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: May 12, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER
Date: May 15, 2020Amended Complaint - AMENDED PETITION (1ST)
Date: July 17, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON PETITION
Date: July 17, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)
Date: July 22, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)
Date: July 30, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION OF DEMURRING OR MOVING PARTY IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC EXTENSION
Date: August 13, 2020Motion to Dismiss
Date: December 22, 2020Request for Judicial Notice
Date: January 07, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: January 07, 2021Amended Complaint - AMENDED PETITION (2ND)
Date: February 10, 2021Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: March 11, 2021Request for Judicial Notice
Date: March 11, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)
Date: March 23, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: March 24, 2021Request - REQUEST FOR HEARING
Date: May 07, 2021Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: May 17, 2021Request for Judicial Notice
Date: May 18, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARINGS
Date: May 19, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: May 18, 2021Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: July 15, 2021Brief - BRIEF PETITIONER COMMUNITY FUNERAL SERVICES, INC.S OPENING BRIEF
Date: January 11, 2022Request for Judicial Notice
Date: January 11, 2022Request for Judicial Notice
Date: February 09, 2022Reply - REPLY PETITIONER’S REPLY BRIEF
Date: February 23, 2022Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING JOINT APPENDIX ANSD ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD
Date: February 23, 2022Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING PETITIONER'S HYPERLINKED BRIEFS
Date: February 28, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE)
Date: March 10, 2022Notice - NOTICE OF ERRATA TO PETITIONER'S OPENING AND REPLY BRIEFS
Date: March 01, 2022Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: March 17, 2022Answer
Date: April 19, 2022Notice - NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE
Date: March 23, 2022Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: April 25, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: April 25, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: May 03, 2022Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: July 06, 2022Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT
Date: July 08, 2022Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS
Date: July 11, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFS)
Date: August 09, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER)
Date: August 22, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER)
Date: August 24, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON MATTER SUBMITTED ON AUGUST 25, 2022)
Date: September 12, 2022Judgment
Date: September 12, 2022Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order
Date: September 12, 2022Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by: City of Los Angeles, a municipal corporation (Respondent)
Date: 2020-03-16T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: City of Los Angeles, a municipal corporation (Respondent)
Date: 2020-03-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (DEMURRER OF RESPONDENT, CITY OF LOS ANGELES, TO THE PETITION;...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-12-24T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by COMMUNITY FUNERAL SERVICES, INC., a California corporation (Petitioner)
Date: 2019-12-20T00:00:00Summons (on Petition) Filed by COMMUNITY FUNERAL SERVICES, INC., a California corporation (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-07-17T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-12-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-30T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: City of Los Angeles, a municipal corporation (Respondent)
Date: 2022-04-19T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-12-20T00:00:00Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-12-24T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-05-17T00:00:00Request FOR HEARING; Filed by: COMMUNITY FUNERAL SERVICES, INC., a California corporation (Petitioner)
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER)
Date: August 25, 2022Order - ORDER GRANTING RESPONDENT'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND
Date: September 12, 2022Amended Petition (2nd) Filed by COMMUNITY FUNERAL SERVICES, INC., a California corporation (Petitioner)
Date: 2021-02-10T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-17T00:00:00Summons (on Petition) Filed by COMMUNITY FUNERAL SERVICES, INC., a California corporation (Petitioner)
Date: 2019-12-20T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by City of Los Angeles, a municipal corporation (Respondent)
Date: 2021-03-11T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike Filed by City of Los Angeles, a municipal corporation (Respondent)
Date: 2021-03-11T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike Filed by City of Los Angeles, a municipal corporation (Respondent)
Date: 2020-03-16T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by COMMUNITY FUNERAL SERVICES, INC., a California corporation (Petitioner)
Date: 2021-03-24T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-18T00:00:00Motion to Dismiss Filed by City of Los Angeles, a municipal corporation (Respondent)
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by City of Los Angeles, a municipal corporation (Respondent)
Date: 2020-03-16T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-05-12T00:00:00Request (FOR HEARING) Filed by COMMUNITY FUNERAL SERVICES, INC., a California corporation (Petitioner)
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00Amended Petition (1st) Filed by COMMUNITY FUNERAL SERVICES, INC., a California corporation (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-07-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFS)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-22T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Reassignment to an Independent Calendar Court)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings to First, Fif...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-07-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (DEMURRER OF RESPONDENT, CITY OF LOS ANGELES, TO PORTIONS OF T...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-22T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-07-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (HEARING ON PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (IN CHAMBERS ORDER: ORDER RE SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING ON MOTION F...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-03T00:00:00ORDER GRANTING RESPONDENT'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-09-12T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by City of Los Angeles, a municipal corporation (Respondent)
Date: 2022-06-27T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-09-12T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by City of Los Angeles, a municipal corporation (Respondent)
Date: 2022-02-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((RULING ON MATTER SUBMITTED ON AUGUST 25, 2022) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-09-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by City of Los Angeles, a municipal corporation (Respondent)
Date: 2022-04-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-25T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFS) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-09T00:00:00Judgment Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-09-12T00:00:00Answer Filed by City of Los Angeles, a municipal corporation (Respondent)
Date: 2022-04-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (RULING ON MATTER SUBMITTED ON AUGUST 25, 2022)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-09-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (DEMURRER OF RESPONDENT, CITY OF LOS ANGELES, TO THE PETITION;...))
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Order)
Date: 2020-05-15T00:00:00Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon
Date: 2019-12-24T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2020-03-16T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-02-14T00:00:00Petition for Writ of Mandate
Date: 2019-12-20T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2021-03-11T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-03-18T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-05-12T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2020-03-16T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-12-20T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-05-18T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) (Amended)
Date: 2021-05-17T00:00:00Summons (on Petition)
Date: 2019-12-20T00:00:00Request (FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT AND RESPONDENT CITY OF LOS ANGELES? DEMURRER)
Date: 2020-09-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE))
Date: 2020-07-30T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2021-05-17T00:00:00Summons (on Petition)
Date: 2020-07-17T00:00:00Declaration (OF DEMURRING OR MOVING PARTY IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC EXTENSION)
Date: 2020-08-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW))
Date: 2020-07-22T00:00:00Amended Petition (2nd)
Date: 2021-02-10T00:00:00Motion to Dismiss
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Reply (In Support Of Motion for relief from default)
Date: 2021-07-15T00:00:00Amended Petition (1st)
Date: 2020-07-17T00:00:00Notice (OF RULING ? ORDER RE DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE AND COMPLAINT)
Date: 2021-01-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (DEMURRER OF RESPONDENT, CITY OF LOS ANGELES, TO PORTIONS OF T...))
Date: 2021-07-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE))
Date: 2021-03-23T00:00:00Motion re: (FOR RELIEF FROM DEFAULT PURSUANT TO CCP 473; DECLARATION OF MATTHEW D. HINKS)
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00Notice (Of Filing Verification To Petition And Complaint)
Date: 2020-01-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-12-20T00:00:00Request (FOR HEARING)
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-03-24T00:00:00Notice (of Continuance of Hearings)
Date: 2021-05-19T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-03-11T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-05-18T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (ON PETITIONER?S MOTION FOR RELIEF AND RESPONDENT?S MOTION TO DISMISS)
Date: 2021-07-23T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (Petitioner's Hyperlinked Briefs)
Date: 2022-02-28T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2022-03-17T00:00:00Notice (of Errata to Petitioner's Opening and Reply Briefs)
Date: 2022-03-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Reassignment to an Independent Calendar Court))
Date: 2022-03-11T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Reassignment to an Independent Calendar Court) of )
Date: 2022-03-11T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2022-02-09T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (THUMB DRIVE WITH COPY OF OPPOSITION BRIEF HYPERLINKED TO ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD)
Date: 2022-02-25T00:00:00Brief (PETITIONER COMMUNITY FUNERAL SERVICES, INC.S OPENING BRIEF)
Date: 2022-01-11T00:00:00Reply (PETITIONER?S REPLY BRIEF)
Date: 2022-02-23T00:00:00Notice (OF ENTRY OF MINUTE ORDER AFTER HEARING ON PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE)
Date: 2022-03-11T00:00:00Notice (of Trial Setting Conference)
Date: 2022-03-23T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2022-01-11T00:00:00Opposition (OPPOSITION BRIEF BY RESPONDENT CITY OF LOS ANGELES)
Date: 2022-02-09T00:00:00Answer (DEFENDANT AND RESPONDENT CITY OF LOS ANGELES? ANSWER TO SECOND AMENDED PETITION AND COMPLAINT)
Date: 2021-12-20T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2022-04-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2022-04-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2022-04-19T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (JOINT APPENDIX ANSD ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD)
Date: 2022-02-23T00:00:00Notice (OF RULING ? ORDER RE DEMURRER TO SECOND AMENDED PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE AND COMPLAINT)
Date: 2021-07-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (HEARING ON PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE))
Date: 2022-03-10T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2022-04-19T00:00:00Summons (on Petition)
Date: 2019-12-20T00:00:00Notice (Of Filing Verification To Petition And Complaint)
Date: 2020-01-15T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Order)
Date: 2020-05-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE))
Date: 2020-07-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW))
Date: 2020-07-22T00:00:00Summons (on Petition)
Date: 2020-07-17T00:00:00Amended Petition (1st)
Date: 2020-07-17T00:00:00Request (FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT AND RESPONDENT CITY OF LOS ANGELES? DEMURRER)
Date: 2020-09-16T00:00:00Declaration (OF DEMURRING OR MOVING PARTY IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC EXTENSION)
Date: 2020-08-13T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: COMMUNITY FUNERAL SERVICES, INC., a California corporation (Petitioner)
Date: 2021-03-24T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-05-12T00:00:00Notice (OF RULING ? ORDER RE DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE AND COMPLAINT)
Date: 2021-01-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (DEMURRER OF RESPONDENT, CITY OF LOS ANGELES, TO THE PETITION;...))
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Amended Petition (2nd)
Date: 2021-02-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE))
Date: 2021-03-23T00:00:00Motion re: (FOR RELIEF FROM DEFAULT PURSUANT TO CCP 473; DECLARATION OF MATTHEW D. HINKS)
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00Request (FOR HEARING)
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) (Amended)
Date: 2021-05-17T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-05-18T00:00:00Notice (of Continuance of Hearings)
Date: 2021-05-19T00:00:00Reply (In Support Of Motion for relief from default)
Date: 2021-07-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (DEMURRER OF RESPONDENT, CITY OF LOS ANGELES, TO PORTIONS OF T...))
Date: 2021-07-22T00:00:00Opposition (OPPOSITION BRIEF BY RESPONDENT CITY OF LOS ANGELES)
Date: 2022-02-09T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (ON PETITIONER?S MOTION FOR RELIEF AND RESPONDENT?S MOTION TO DISMISS)
Date: 2021-07-23T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (Petitioner's Hyperlinked Briefs)
Date: 2022-02-28T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (JOINT APPENDIX ANSD ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD)
Date: 2022-02-23T00:00:00Notice (OF RULING ? ORDER RE DEMURRER TO SECOND AMENDED PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE AND COMPLAINT)
Date: 2021-07-26T00:00:00Brief (PETITIONER COMMUNITY FUNERAL SERVICES, INC.S OPENING BRIEF)
Date: 2022-01-11T00:00:00Reply (PETITIONER?S REPLY BRIEF)
Date: 2022-02-23T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (THUMB DRIVE WITH COPY OF OPPOSITION BRIEF HYPERLINKED TO ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD)
Date: 2022-02-25T00:00:00Notice (of Errata to Petitioner's Opening and Reply Briefs)
Date: 2022-03-01T00:00:00Answer (DEFENDANT AND RESPONDENT CITY OF LOS ANGELES? ANSWER TO SECOND AMENDED PETITION AND COMPLAINT)
Date: 2021-12-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (HEARING ON PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE))
Date: 2022-03-10T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.