Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Communities For A Better Environment A California Nonprofit Corporation, filed a(n) Writ - Administrative Mandamus (General Jurisdiction) case represented by Ganata Jennifer, Ganata Jennifer Christine V, against Marathon Petroleum Company Lp A Delaware Corporation And Wholly-Owned Subsidiary, Marathon Petroleum Corporation A Delaware Corporation, Nastri Wayne, Nastri Wayne In His Official Capacity As Executive Officer Of The South Coast Air Quality Management District, South Coast Air Quality Management District A Public Agency, (total of 6) See All represented by Hager Ricia R, Modlin Peter, Modlin Peter Spett, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Joseph R. Porras presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 06, 2019 |
CategoryWrit - Administrative Mandamus (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re Reassignment) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-12-11T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re Assignment of CEQA Case) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-12-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-05-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: December 06, 2019Petition for Writ of Mandate
Date: December 06, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE ASSIGNMENT OF CEQA CASE)
Date: December 10, 2019Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon
Date: December 11, 2019Summons - SUMMONS ON PETITION
Date: December 17, 2019Notice of Related Case
Date: December 20, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF RESPONSIBLE AGENCIES
Date: January 06, 2020Notice - NOTICE PRELIMINARY NOTIFICATION OF ESTIMATED COST FOR PREPARATION OF RECORD
Date: January 07, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT MEETING
Date: January 07, 2020Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: January 29, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: January 30, 2020Notice - NOTICE TO RESPONSIBLE AGENCIES
Date: January 21, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 01/30/2020
Date: January 30, 2020Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings
Date: January 30, 2020Proof of Personal Service
Date: January 31, 2020Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: January 31, 2020Proof of Service by Mail
Date: January 31, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT
Date: February 04, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 02/06/2020
Date: February 06, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: February 06, 2020Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: February 06, 2020Proof of Service by Mail
Date: February 06, 2020Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER PREPARATION OF ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD
Date: February 10, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER RE CASE REASSIGNMENT
Date: February 13, 2020Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER RESCHEDULING TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE
Date: February 27, 2020Request - REQUEST FOR HEARING (CEQA)
Date: February 28, 2020Notice - NOTICE CONSENT TO ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: March 20, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER
Date: March 10, 2020Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENSION ON ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD
Date: April 15, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/16/2020
Date: April 16, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: April 16, 2020Notice - NOTICE CONSENT TO ELECTRONIC SERVICE AND NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: April 17, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: May 05, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER
Date: May 06, 2020Request for Refund / Order
Date: June 03, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER
Date: July 30, 2020Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER
Date: October 13, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 01/05/2021
Date: January 05, 2021Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings
Date: January 05, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: January 13, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: January 05, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE REASSIGNMENT)
Date: February 01, 2021Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: February 01, 2021Request for Refund / Order
Date: February 05, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF (1) NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND (2) ORDER OF FEBRUARY 1, 2021
Date: February 09, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: February 25, 2021Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 02/25/2021
Date: February 25, 2021Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER
Date: March 12, 2021Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING THE STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: June 03, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER RE STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: June 03, 2021Request for Refund / Order
Date: July 13, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER
Date: August 16, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER
Date: September 16, 2021Request for Refund / Order
Date: September 27, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: October 13, 2021Notice of Related Case Filed by South Coast Air Quality Management District, a public agency (Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-20T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Assignment of CEQA Case)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-12-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-12-11T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Assignment of CEQA Case) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-12-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-16T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-05-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-05-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Reassignment) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Reassignment)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 02/06/2020)
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Notice (Consent to Electronic Service)
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Order Re Case Reassignment)
Date: 2020-02-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2019-12-20T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2020-01-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00Notice (of Settlement Meeting)
Date: 2020-01-07T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/16/2020)
Date: 2020-04-16T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Notice (to Responsible Agencies)
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Request (for Hearing (CEQA))
Date: 2020-02-28T00:00:00Notice (Consent to Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service)
Date: 2020-04-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Assignment of CEQA Case) of 12/10/2019)
Date: 2019-12-10T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Notice (to Attorney General)
Date: 2019-12-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Assignment of CEQA Case))
Date: 2019-12-10T00:00:00Notice (of Responsible Agencies)
Date: 2020-01-06T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Extending the Time for Certification of the Administrative Record)
Date: 2020-03-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 01/30/2020)
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Extension on Administrative Record)
Date: 2020-04-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Rescheduling Trial Setting Conference)
Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Order)
Date: 2020-03-10T00:00:00Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon
Date: 2019-12-11T00:00:00Notice (Preliminary Notification of Estimated Cost for Preparation of Record)
Date: 2020-01-07T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-12-06T00:00:00Petition for Writ of Mandate
Date: 2019-12-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-04-16T00:00:00Notice (Consent to electronic service and notice of electronic service address)
Date: 2020-04-17T00:00:00Summons (on Petition)
Date: 2019-12-17T00:00:00Notice (of Case Reassignment)
Date: 2020-02-04T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Preparation of Administrative Record)
Date: 2020-02-10T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Notice (OF Consent to Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service Address)
Date: 2020-04-17T00:00:00Notice (Consent to Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service Address)
Date: 2020-04-17T00:00:00Notice (Consent to Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service Address)
Date: 2020-05-05T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (re Certification of the Administrative Record)
Date: 2020-05-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 05/05/2020)
Date: 2020-05-05T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Order)
Date: 2020-05-06T00:00:00Request for Refund / Order
Date: 2020-06-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-05-05T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Stipulation and Proposed Order Continuing the Trial Setting Conference)
Date: 2020-07-28T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Order)
Date: 2020-07-30T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.