Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Corbin John David, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Clough John, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Ruth Ann Kwan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRuth Ann Kwan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management214 days |
Filing DateNovember 21, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
||
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
||
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Case Cycle Time239 days |
Supplemental Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application; Filed by: JOHN DAVID CORBIN (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-02-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-01-28T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: JOHN DAVID CORBIN (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-02-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-18T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: JOHN DAVID CORBIN (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-06-30T00:00:00Declaration OF GARY F. TORRELL; Filed by: JOHN DAVID CORBIN (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-03-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: JOHN DAVID CORBIN (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-03-30T00:00:00Notice of Related Case; Filed by: JOHN DAVID CORBIN (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Order re ex parte application to advance hearing; Filed by:
Date: 2020-02-19T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: JOHN DAVID CORBIN (Petitioner)
Date: 2019-11-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-13T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by: JOHN DAVID CORBIN (Petitioner)
Date: July 17, 2020Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: JOHN DAVID CORBIN (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-02-03T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-11-21T00:00:00Declaration OF NICOLE K. HEININGER; Filed by: JOHN DAVID CORBIN (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-03-05T00:00:00Declaration OF JOHN DAVID CORBIN; Filed by: JOHN DAVID CORBIN (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-02-03T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Case Management Conference) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-16T00:00:00Declaration OF KEOLA ROBERT WHITTAKER; Filed by: JOHN DAVID CORBIN (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-02-03T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: November 21, 2019Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: November 21, 2019Petition - PETITION FOR COURT SUPERVISION OF VOLUNTARY WINDING UP PROCEEDING
Date: November 21, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION OF NICOLE HEININGER IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STAY
Date: November 27, 2019Motion for Stay of Proceedings
Date: November 27, 2019Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: December 03, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER;)
Date: December 03, 2019Notice of Related Case
Date: January 24, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: January 28, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 01/28/2020
Date: January 28, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION OF KEOLA ROBERT WHITTAKER
Date: February 03, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION OF JOHN DAVID CORBIN
Date: February 03, 2020Motion to Disqualify Counsel
Date: February 03, 2020Supplemental Declaration - SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION
Date: February 18, 2020Order - ORDER RE EX PARTE APPLICATION TO ADVANCE HEARING
Date: February 19, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: February 19, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION OF JOHN C. CLOUGH
Date: March 05, 2020Opposition - OPPOSITION HEININGER OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISQUALIFY RE 30 COLLINS
Date: March 05, 2020Request for Judicial Notice
Date: March 05, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION OF NICOLE K. HEININGER
Date: March 05, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION OF GARY F. TORRELL
Date: March 05, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION OF NICOLE HEININGER RE 30 COLLINS
Date: March 05, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: March 09, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/18/2020
Date: March 18, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: March 18, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: March 30, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: April 02, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: April 13, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/13/2020
Date: April 13, 2020Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: June 30, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: July 16, 2020Proof of Service by Mail
Date: July 17, 2020Request for Dismissal
Date: July 17, 2020Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-11-21T00:00:00Petition (for court supervision of voluntary winding up proceeding)
Date: 2019-11-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Peremptory Challenge to Judicial Officer;) of 12/03/2019)
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Notice (of Withdrawal of Motion For Stay of Action and for Appraisal of Petitioner's Interest)
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-03-09T00:00:00Declaration ( OF NICOLE K. HEININGER)
Date: 2020-03-05T00:00:00Opposition (Heininger Opposition to Motion to Disqualify re 30 Collins)
Date: 2020-03-05T00:00:00Declaration (OF JOHN DAVID CORBIN)
Date: 2020-02-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-04-02T00:00:00Motion for Stay of Proceedings
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00Notice ( of continuance of hearing date on motion and case management conference)
Date: 2020-03-24T00:00:00Supplemental Declaration (in Support of Ex Parte Application)
Date: 2020-02-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-03-30T00:00:00Motion to Disqualify Counsel
Date: 2020-02-03T00:00:00Objection ( TO MOTION TO DISQUALIFY HOOPER, LUNDY & BOOKMAN, P.C. AND DISGORGE LEGAL FEES)
Date: 2020-03-05T00:00:00Declaration (of Nicole Heininger in Support of Motion to Stay)
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-04-13T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-02-19T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2020-02-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-01-28T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-11-21T00:00:00Declaration ( OF GARY F. TORRELL)
Date: 2020-03-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 01/28/2020)
Date: 2020-01-28T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Declaration (OF KEOLA ROBERT WHITTAKER)
Date: 2020-02-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Order Advancing the Heari...))
Date: 2020-02-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Peremptory Challenge to Judicial Officer;))
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2020-03-05T00:00:00Declaration (of Nicole Heininger re 30 Collins)
Date: 2020-03-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/13/2020)
Date: 2020-04-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 03/18/2020)
Date: 2020-03-18T00:00:00Declaration (of John C. Clough)
Date: 2020-03-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-03-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Hearing on Motion to Disqualify C...))
Date: 2020-06-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re proposed order re settlement))
Date: 2020-07-14T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2020-06-30T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: July 17, 2020Request for Dismissal
Date: July 17, 2020Notice (Of Continuance Of Hearing Date On Motion And Case Management Conference)
Date: 2020-04-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-07-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference) of 07/16/2020)
Date: 2020-07-16T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.