Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Rice Lake Housing Authority, filed a(n) Judgment Enforcement - Creditor case represented by Hogan Bruce Wagner, against Kolay Flooring International Llc, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Serena R. Murillo presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSerena R. Murillo Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 19, 2019 |
CategorySister State Judgment (Limited Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeJudgment Enforcement |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-11-19T00:00:00First Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-11-19T00:00:00Order for Continuance/Setting of Judgment Debtor Examination; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-03T00:00:00Order for Continuance/Setting of Judgment Debtor Examination; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-09T00:00:00First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order
Date: November 19, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: November 19, 2019Notice (name extension) - Notice Notice of Entry of Judgment on Sister-State Judgment
Date: November 19, 2019Judgment - Judgment
Date: November 19, 2019Proof of Service (Sister State Judgment) - Proof of Service (Sister State Judgment)
Date: December 18, 2019Memorandum of Costs (Summary) - Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: May 29, 2020Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (Los Angeles)
Date: May 29, 2020Writ - Return - Writ - Return
Date: December 17, 2020Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination)
Date: February 25, 2021For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.