Case Last Refreshed: 16 hours ago
Mashian Law Group Apc, filed a(n) General Arbitration - Arbitration case represented by Mashian Bahman, against Boodaie Mojgan, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Superior with James E. Blancarte presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 15, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedMay 01, 2024 |
Practice AreaArbitration |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Arbitration |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Cycle Time265 days |
Notice of Hearing on Petition; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-11-15T00:00:00First Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-11-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-11-15T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-13T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-17T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Bahman Mashian (Attorney)
Date: 2020-01-14T00:00:00Notice OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING ON PETITION; Filed by: Mashian Law Group, APC (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-04-27T00:00:00Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award - Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award
Date: November 15, 2019Notice of Hearing on Petition - Notice of Hearing on Petition
Date: November 15, 2019Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case
Date: November 15, 2019First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order
Date: November 15, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: November 15, 2019Summons - Summons on Petition
Date: November 15, 2019Notice (name extension) - Notice OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING ON PETITION
Date: April 10, 2020Notice (name extension) - Notice OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING ON PETITION
Date: April 27, 2020Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal
Date: August 06, 2020Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Bahman Mashian (Attorney)
Date: 2020-01-14T00:00:00Notice OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING ON PETITION; Filed by: Mashian Law Group, APC (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-04-27T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.