Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Allied Property & Casualty Insurance Company, filed a(n) General Arbitration - Arbitration case against Commerce West Insurance Company, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Katherine Chilton presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 17, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaArbitration |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Arbitration |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
First Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-09-17T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Allied Property & Casualty Insurance Company (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-09-17T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-23T00:00:00Notice of Hearing on Petition; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-09-17T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Allied Property & Casualty Insurance Company (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-01-22T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Allied Property & Casualty Insurance Company (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-03-12T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: September 17, 2019Summons - Summons on Petition
Date: September 17, 2019Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award - Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award
Date: September 17, 2019Notice of Hearing on Petition - Notice of Hearing on Petition
Date: September 17, 2019First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order
Date: September 17, 2019Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service
Date: November 22, 2019Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling
Date: January 22, 2020Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Petition Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award)
Date: January 21, 2020Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling
Date: March 12, 2020Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Petition Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award)
Date: August 05, 2020Notice (name extension) - Notice of Continued Petition Hearing
Date: October 19, 2020Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Petition Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award)
Date: October 19, 2020Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Petition Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award)
Date: November 19, 2020Memorandum of Costs (Summary) - Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: November 24, 2020Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Filing of Proposed Judgment)
Date: December 29, 2020Judgment - Proposed Arbitration Award Judgment
Date: March 05, 2021Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment
Date: January 06, 2022Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Allied Property & Casualty Insurance Company (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-01-22T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Allied Property & Casualty Insurance Company (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-03-12T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Allied Property & Casualty Insurance Company (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.