Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Chalon Investments Dhs Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Baker William E. Jr., Kawahito James, against Dayglowluk Llc A Florida Llc, Df Holdings Group Llc, Solano Investments Llc A Florida Llc, Two Bunch Palms Trail Llc A California Llc, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Unknown Judicial Officer presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateAugust 02, 2019 |
CategoryConfession Of Judgment (Non-Domestic Relations) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions129 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Case Cycle Time129 days |
Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Chalon Investments DHS, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: February 05, 2020Confession of Judgment
Date: August 02, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: August 02, 2019Judgment - JUDGMENT CONFESSION
Date: December 09, 2019Substitution of Attorney
Date: February 05, 2020Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims
Date: February 10, 2020Judgment (Confession) Filed by Chalon Investments DHS, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-09T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Chalon Investments DHS, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: February 05, 2020Confession of Judgment Filed by Chalon Investments DHS, LLC (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2019-08-02T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Chalon Investments DHS, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-02T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims Filed by Chalon Investments DHS, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: February 10, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-08-02T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: February 05, 2020Judgment (Confession)
Date: 2019-12-09T00:00:00Confession of Judgment
Date: 2019-08-02T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims
Date: February 10, 2020Declaration (Attorney Certificate Pursuant to Cal. Code of Civ. Pro Section 1132)
Date: 2019-08-02T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.