Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Merco Group - Roosevelt Building Llc, Richard Meruelo Individually And As Trustee Of The Richard Meruelo Living Trust, Richard Meruelo Living Trust, Rosen & Associates P.C., filed a(n) General Arbitration - Arbitration case represented by Benson Susan, Rosen Robert, against Meruelo Richard Individually And As Trustee Of The Richard Meruelo Living Trust, Rosen & Associates P.C., represented by Gordon Peter D., Gordon Peter David, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with William F. Fahey presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management153 days |
|
Filing DateJuly 26, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaArbitration |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Arbitration |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-11-04T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-08-12T00:00:00Declaration Re Order to Show Cause Re POS; Filed by: ROSEN & ASSOCIATES, P.C. (Petitioner)
Date: 2019-09-19T00:00:00Opposition OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SANCTIONS; Filed by: ROSEN & ASSOCIATES, P.C. (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-01-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: ROSEN & ASSOCIATES, P.C. (Petitioner)
Date: 2019-12-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re Reassignment with Related Cases) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-30T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-31T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by:
Date: 2021-02-26T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-08-12T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-03-09T00:00:00Notice of Related Case; Filed by: ROSEN & ASSOCIATES, P.C. (Petitioner)
Date: 2019-10-03T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-07T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Default Issued; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-06-14T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: ROSEN & ASSOCIATES, P.C. (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Appeal - Notice Court Reporter to Prepare Appeal Transcript "AMENDED"; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-07-21T00:00:00Notice of Lodging OF PROPOSED JUDGMENT; Filed by: ROSEN & ASSOCIATES, P.C. (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-08-27T00:00:00Reply SURREPLY AND REQUEST FOR ADDITIONAL INTEREST; Filed by: ROSEN & ASSOCIATES, P.C. (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-06-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-05-08T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Robert Rosen (Attorney)
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-05-18T00:00:00Motion for Attorney Fees; Filed by: ROSEN & ASSOCIATES, P.C. (Petitioner)
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Response to Petition; Filed by: ROSEN & ASSOCIATES, P.C. (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-06-02T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Fees Due for Clerk's Transcript on Appeal; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-08-09T00:00:00Declaration and Submission of Docs Re 12-3 Hrg; Filed by: ROSEN & ASSOCIATES, P.C. (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Declaration Re Service of Proposed Judgment - Exhibits; Filed by: ROSEN & ASSOCIATES, P.C. (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-12-03T00:00:00Appeal Document B311652;; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Fees Due for Clerk's Transcript on Appeal "U"; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-08-09T00:00:00Appeal - Clerk's Transcript Fee Paid APPELLANT PAID $2116.81; Filed by:
Date: 2021-09-08T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Fees Due for Clerk's Transcript on Appeal "U"; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-08-18T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Fees Due for Clerk's Transcript on Appeal; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-08-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-03-01T00:00:00Response TO PETITION TO VACATE ARBITRATION AWARD; Filed by: ROSEN & ASSOCIATES, P.C. (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-02-25T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-04T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Default Issued "U"; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-06-21T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal "U"; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-05-06T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-01-28T00:00:00Notice of Lodging Of Proposed 1st Amended Judgment; Filed by: ROSEN & ASSOCIATES, P.C. (Petitioner)
Date: 2021-04-22T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: ROSEN & ASSOCIATES, P.C. (Petitioner)
Date: 2021-04-02T00:00:00Appeal Document B311652 c/w B312966; NA's & ; DCA Order;; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-08-26T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-06T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-03-17T00:00:00Appeal - Notice Court Reporter to Prepare Appeal Transcript; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-07-12T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Non-Compliance; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-12-01T00:00:00Appeal - Remittitur - Affirmed B311652; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-06-15T00:00:00Notice OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL; Filed by: ROSEN & ASSOCIATES, P.C. (Petitioner)
Date: 2022-02-22T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Default Issued; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-10-19T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: ROSEN & ASSOCIATES, P.C. (Respondent)
Date: 2023-08-11T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: ROSEN & ASSOCIATES, P.C. (Petitioner)
Date: September 08, 2023Appeal - Notice Court Reporter to Prepare Appeal Transcript AUGMENTATION NOA B311652; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-10-21T00:00:00Appeal - Notice Vacating Notice of Default; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-12-16T00:00:00Motion for Attorney Fees; Filed by: ROSEN & ASSOCIATES, P.C. (Petitioner)
Date: 2023-08-09T00:00:00Appeal Record Delivered NOA (U) 8-VOL CLKS & 1-RPT; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00Notice of Lodging Second Amended Proposed Judgment; Filed by: ROSEN & ASSOCIATES, P.C. (Petitioner)
Date: 2023-08-09T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Robert Rosen (Attorney)
Date: 2023-01-17T00:00:00Appeal - Original Clerk's Transcript 6 - 10 Volumes Certified NOA B312966; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-10-12T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: July 26, 2019Summons - SUMMONS ON PETITION
Date: July 26, 2019Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: August 12, 2019Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: August 12, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION RE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE POS
Date: September 19, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)
Date: October 07, 2019Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: October 17, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER)
Date: October 18, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER
Date: October 24, 2019Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 10/28/2019
Date: October 28, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: October 28, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF RULING RE TRANSFER OF RELATED CASE TO DEPT. 1
Date: October 29, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF MERUELO'S STATUTORY VIOLATIONS RE CCP 170.6 FILINGS
Date: October 29, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE REASSIGNMENT WITH RELATED CASES)
Date: October 30, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: December 24, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: December 26, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER RE: MOTION TO STRIKE RESPONDENT'S ...)
Date: December 27, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO STRIKE RESPONDENT'S PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE...)
Date: December 26, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF RULING ON MOTION TO STRIKE
Date: December 31, 2019Motion for Sanctions
Date: January 09, 2020Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SANCTIONS
Date: January 23, 2020Reply - REPLY REPLY TO MOTION FOR SANCTIONS
Date: January 27, 2020Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO CONSOLIDATE
Date: January 28, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 01/28/2020
Date: January 28, 2020Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: January 28, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: January 28, 2020Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUATION OF MOTION FOR SANCTIONS
Date: January 31, 2020Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD
Date: February 24, 2020Motion re: - MOTION RE: CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD AND ENTER JUDGMENT THEREON [CCP § 1290.2]
Date: February 07, 2020Response - RESPONSE TO PETITION TO VACATE ARBITRATION AWARD
Date: February 25, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF FILING PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: February 26, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION OF PETER GORDON RE; OBJECTION TO PROOFS OF SERVICE
Date: February 27, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS
Date: February 28, 2020Reply - REPLY REPLY TO OPPOSITION RE MOTION TO CONFIRM ARB AWARD
Date: February 28, 2020Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: March 06, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF MINUTE ORDER
Date: March 09, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: May 08, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE
Date: May 22, 2020Response to Petition
Date: June 02, 2020Response - RESPONSE RESPONSE TO PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD
Date: June 17, 2020Reply - REPLY SURREPLY AND REQUEST FOR ADDITIONAL INTEREST
Date: June 17, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING
Date: July 02, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF SERVICE
Date: July 16, 2020Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: August 20, 2020Request for Judicial Notice
Date: September 02, 2020Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING OF PROPOSED JUDGMENT
Date: August 27, 2020Motion for Reconsideration
Date: September 02, 2020Motion to Compel - MOTION RE: MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLETE EXHIBITS
Date: September 29, 2020Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION EX PARTE ORDER TO SHORTEN TIME
Date: October 02, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO SHORTEN TIME)
Date: October 02, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF OBJ TO MERUELO'S REQUEST JUDICAL
Date: October 30, 2020Motion for Sanctions
Date: October 30, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: October 30, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: November 02, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF TENTATIVE RE MTN RECONSIDERATION
Date: November 12, 2020Objection - OBJECTION OBJECTION TO PROPOSED JUDGMENT FILED OCTOBER 30, 2020
Date: November 13, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF MINUTE ORDER
Date: November 13, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF THE COURT'S AUGUST 2...)
Date: November 13, 2020Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SANCTIONS
Date: November 18, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION AND SUBMISSION OF DOCS RE 12-3 HRG
Date: November 30, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF TENTATIVE RULING
Date: December 01, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION RE SERVICE OF PROPOSED JUDGMENT - EXHIBITS
Date: December 03, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT OF $30,685 REQU...)
Date: December 03, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: December 04, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT
Date: December 31, 2020Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment
Date: January 04, 2021Affidavit of Identity and Order
Date: January 13, 2021Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: January 14, 2021Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment
Date: January 19, 2021Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment
Date: January 22, 2021Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING NOTICE OF LODGING PROPOSED 1ST AMEND JUDGEMENT
Date: February 03, 2021Motion for Attorney Fees
Date: January 28, 2021Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims
Date: February 09, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF OBJECTIONS TO EVIDENCE
Date: February 22, 2021Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed
Date: February 22, 2021Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING LODGING PROPOSED REVISED 1ST AMEND JUDGMENT
Date: February 25, 2021Reply - REPLY SURREPLY DECLARATION OF COUNSEL AND EXHIBIT 16 IN RESPONSE TO TENTATIVE RULING
Date: February 25, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES)
Date: February 26, 2021Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: February 26, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER)
Date: March 01, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF MINUTE ORDER
Date: March 02, 2021Substitution of Attorney
Date: March 03, 2021Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF LODGING REVISED PROPOSED 1ST AMEND JUDGEMENT
Date: March 04, 2021Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal
Date: March 09, 2021Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT
Date: March 12, 2021Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment
Date: March 17, 2021Writ of Execution - WRIT OF EXECUTION (LOS ANGELES)
Date: March 18, 2021Writ of Execution - WRIT OF EXECUTION (RIVERSIDE)
Date: March 19, 2021Writ of Execution - WRIT OF EXECUTION (SAN BERNARDINO)
Date: March 19, 2021Writ of Execution - WRIT OF EXECUTION (VENTURA)
Date: March 19, 2021Writ of Execution - WRIT OF EXECUTION (ORANGE)
Date: March 19, 2021Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: April 02, 2021Separate Statement
Date: April 02, 2021Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING OF PROPOSED 1ST AMENDED JUDGMENT
Date: April 22, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FIRST AMENDED JUDGMENT
Date: April 22, 2021Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103
Date: April 29, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF TENTATIVE RULING
Date: May 04, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF FIRST AMENDED JUDGMENT
Date: May 10, 2021Order - ORDER REVISED FIRST AMENDED JUDGMENT
Date: May 10, 2021Notice - NOTICE CONTINUANCE OF HRG ON MTN RE ROGS
Date: May 10, 2021Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment
Date: May 18, 2021Notice - NOTICE CONTINUANCE OF HRG ON MTN RE RFP
Date: May 10, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF RULING
Date: May 25, 2021Appeal - Notice of Default Issued
Date: June 14, 2021Appeal - Notice of Default Issued - APPEAL - NOTICE OF DEFAULT ISSUED "U"
Date: June 21, 2021Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103
Date: June 29, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: June 29, 2021Appeal - Notice Court Reporter to Prepare Appeal Transcript
Date: July 12, 2021Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-07-26T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-01-28T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Fees Due for Clerk's Transcript on Appeal
Date: August 09, 2021Appeal - Notice of Fees Due for Clerk's Transcript on Appeal
Date: August 17, 2021Appeal - Notice of Fees Due for Clerk's Transcript on Appeal
Date: August 18, 2021Judgment (JUDGMENT) Filed by ROSEN & ASSOCIATES, P.C. (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-10-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-07T00:00:00Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award Filed by ROSEN & ASSOCIATES, P.C. (Petitioner)
Date: 2019-07-26T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by ROSEN & ASSOCIATES, P.C. (Petitioner)
Date: 2019-12-24T00:00:00Opposition (OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SANCTIONS) Filed by ROSEN & ASSOCIATES, P.C. (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-01-23T00:00:00Summons (on Petition) Filed by ROSEN & ASSOCIATES, P.C. (Petitioner)
Date: 2019-07-26T00:00:00Response to Petition Filed by ROSEN & ASSOCIATES, P.C. (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-06-02T00:00:00Notice (OF SERVICE) Filed by ROSEN & ASSOCIATES, P.C. (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-07-16T00:00:00Response ( TO PETITION TO VACATE ARBITRATION AWARD) Filed by ROSEN & ASSOCIATES, P.C. (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-02-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-09-26T00:00:00Notice (OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING) Filed by ROSEN & ASSOCIATES, P.C. (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-07-02T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-07-26T00:00:00Notice of Related Case Filed by ROSEN & ASSOCIATES, P.C. (Petitioner)
Date: 2019-10-03T00:00:00Reply (SURREPLY AND REQUEST FOR ADDITIONAL INTEREST) Filed by ROSEN & ASSOCIATES, P.C. (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-06-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Reassignment with Related Cases)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-30T00:00:00Declaration (Re Order to Show Cause Re POS) Filed by ROSEN & ASSOCIATES, P.C. (Petitioner)
Date: 2019-09-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-01-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award and Enter Judg...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-06T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-08-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-05-08T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-05-08T00:00:00Notice ( OF ERRATA RE DEPARTMENT) Filed by ROSEN & ASSOCIATES, P.C. (Petitioner)
Date: 2019-12-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter re: Motion to Strike Respondent's ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-12-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award and Enter Judg...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Strike Respondent's Peremptory Challenge...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-12-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Notice of Related Case (19STCP03171 and 19STC...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-07T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-11-04T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt Filed by Rosen & Associates, P.C. (Respondent)
Date: 2019-10-03T00:00:00Motion to Compel (COMPLETE EXHIBITS) Filed by ROSEN & ASSOCIATES, P.C. (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-09-29T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-17T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Judgment) Filed by ROSEN & ASSOCIATES, P.C. (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-12-31T00:00:00Notice (of Tentative Re Mtn Reconsideration) Filed by ROSEN & ASSOCIATES, P.C. (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-31T00:00:00Notice (of Service of Minute Order) Filed by ROSEN & ASSOCIATES, P.C. (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Peremptory Challenge to Judicial Officer)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-18T00:00:00Motion for Sanctions Filed by ROSEN & ASSOCIATES, P.C. (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF CONTINUATION OF MOTION FOR SANCTIONS) Filed by ROSEN & ASSOCIATES, P.C. (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by ROSEN & ASSOCIATES, P.C. (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Affidavit of Identity and Order Filed by ROSEN & ASSOCIATES, P.C. (Petitioner)
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00Notice (of Objections to Evidence) Filed by ROSEN & ASSOCIATES, P.C. (Petitioner)
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-26T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-09T00:00:00Notice (OF PROOF OF SERVICE) Filed by ROSEN & ASSOCIATES, P.C. (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims Filed by ROSEN & ASSOCIATES, P.C. (Petitioner)
Date: 2021-02-09T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Entry of Judgment) Filed by ROSEN & ASSOCIATES, P.C. (Petitioner)
Date: 2021-03-12T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Notice (OF PROOF OF SERVICE) Filed by ROSEN & ASSOCIATES, P.C. (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-11-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-01T00:00:00Notice (OF EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS) Filed by ROSEN & ASSOCIATES, P.C. (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00Notice (of Service of Minute Order) Filed by ROSEN & ASSOCIATES, P.C. (Petitioner)
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Sanctions in the Amount of $30,685 Requ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-03T00:00:00Notice (of Service of First Amended Judgment) Filed by ROSEN & ASSOCIATES, P.C. (Petitioner)
Date: 2021-04-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses to Po...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-24T00:00:00Writ of Execution ((San Bernardino)) Filed by ROSEN & ASSOCIATES, P.C. (Petitioner)
Date: 2021-03-19T00:00:00Notice (of Service of Ruling) Filed by ROSEN & ASSOCIATES, P.C. (Petitioner)
Date: 2021-05-25T00:00:00Notice (Continuance of Hrg on Mtn Re RFP) Filed by ROSEN & ASSOCIATES, P.C. (Petitioner)
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by Robert Rosen (Attorney)
Date: 2023-01-17T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Default Issued ("U") Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-21T00:00:00Writ of Execution ((San Diego)) Filed by ROSEN & ASSOCIATES, P.C. (Petitioner)
Date: 2021-03-19T00:00:00Notice (OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL) Filed by ROSEN & ASSOCIATES, P.C. (Petitioner)
Date: 2022-02-22T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Default Issued Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-14T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Fees Due for Clerk's Transcript on Appeal ("U" "CORRECTED") Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-18T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by ROSEN & ASSOCIATES, P.C. (Petitioner)
Date: 2021-04-02T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of First Amended Judgment) Filed by ROSEN & ASSOCIATES, P.C. (Petitioner)
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Fees Due for Clerk's Transcript on Appeal Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-09T00:00:00Notice (Continuance of Hrg on Mtn Re Rogs) Filed by ROSEN & ASSOCIATES, P.C. (Petitioner)
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Fees Due for Clerk's Transcript on Appeal ("U") Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-09T00:00:00Appeal - Notice Vacating Notice of Default Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-12-16T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal ("U") Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-06T00:00:00Order (First Amended Judgment) Filed by ROSEN & ASSOCIATES, P.C. (Petitioner)
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Appeal Record Delivered (AUGMENTATION) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-04-01T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-18T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by Robert Rosen (Attorney)
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Fees Due for Clerk's Transcript on Appeal (CORRECTED) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses; Hear...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Appeal Document (B311652 c/w B312966; NA's & ; DCA Order;) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-26T00:00:00Writ of Execution ((Santa Barbara)) Filed by ROSEN & ASSOCIATES, P.C. (Petitioner)
Date: 2021-03-19T00:00:00Writ of Execution ((Orange)) Filed by ROSEN & ASSOCIATES, P.C. (Petitioner)
Date: 2021-03-19T00:00:00Writ of Execution ((Ventura)) Filed by ROSEN & ASSOCIATES, P.C. (Petitioner)
Date: 2021-03-19T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Non-Compliance Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-12-01T00:00:00Appeal - Notice Court Reporter to Prepare Appeal Transcript (AUGMENTATION NOA B311652) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-21T00:00:00Appeal - Notice Court Reporter to Prepare Appeal Transcript ("AMENDED") Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-21T00:00:00Appeal - Notice Court Reporter to Prepare Appeal Transcript Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-12T00:00:00Appeal Record Delivered (NOA (U) 8-VOL CLKS & 1-RPT) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (Of Proposed 1st Amended Judgment) Filed by ROSEN & ASSOCIATES, P.C. (Petitioner)
Date: 2021-04-22T00:00:00Appeal Document (B311652;) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Writ of Execution ((Riverside)) Filed by ROSEN & ASSOCIATES, P.C. (Petitioner)
Date: 2021-03-19T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Default Issued Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-19T00:00:00Appeal - Original Clerk's Transcript 6 - 10 Volumes Certified (NOA B312966) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-12T00:00:00Notice (of Service of Tentative Ruling) Filed by ROSEN & ASSOCIATES, P.C. (Petitioner)
Date: 2021-05-04T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: 2019-08-12T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-07-26T00:00:00Declaration (Re Order to Show Cause Re POS)
Date: 2019-09-19T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: November 04, 2019Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: October 31, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF ERRATA RE DEPARTMENT
Date: December 19, 2019Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award
Date: 2019-07-26T00:00:00Summons (on Petition)
Date: 2019-07-26T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-07-26T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2019-08-12T00:00:00Petition to Vacate or Alter Arbitration Award (CCP 1285 - 1287.6)
Date: 2019-09-27T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: 2019-10-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service))
Date: 2019-09-26T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-10-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Notice of Related Case (19STCP03171 and 19STC...))
Date: 2019-10-07T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2019-10-03T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of 10/07/2019)
Date: 2019-10-07T00:00:00Notice (AMENDED NOTICE OF RELATED CASE)
Date: 2019-10-07T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2019-10-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 10/28/2019)
Date: 2019-10-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Peremptory Challenge to Judicial Officer))
Date: 2019-10-18T00:00:00Notice (OF PETITIONER'S MOTIONI AND MOTION TO STRIKE RESPONDENTS'S PREEMPTORY CHALLENGE)
Date: 2019-10-25T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Order)
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Peremptory Challenge to Judicial Officer) of 10/18/2019)
Date: 2019-10-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2019-10-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Reassignment with Related Cases) of 10/30/2019)
Date: 2019-10-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2019-10-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Reassignment with Related Cases))
Date: 2019-10-30T00:00:00Notice ( of Meruelo's Statutory Violations Re CCP 170.6 Filings)
Date: 2019-10-29T00:00:00Notice (of Service of Ruling Re Transfer of Related Case to Dept. 1)
Date: 2019-10-29T00:00:00Notice of recalendaring of Rosen & Associates P C motion to strike ccp 170.6
Date: 2019-11-05T00:00:00Notice ( OF ERRATA RE DEPARTMENT)
Date: 2019-12-19T00:00:00Notice (OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: 2019-12-26T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-12-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Strike Respondent's Peremptory Challenge...))
Date: 2019-12-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter re: Motion to Strike Respondent's ...))
Date: 2019-12-27T00:00:00Notice ( OF RULING ON MOTION TO STRIKE)
Date: 2019-12-31T00:00:00Motion for Sanctions
Date: 2020-01-09T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-01-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 01/28/2020)
Date: 2020-01-28T00:00:00Reply (Reply to Motion for Sanctions)
Date: 2020-01-27T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF CONTINUATION OF MOTION FOR SANCTIONS)
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (STIPULATION TO CONSOLIDATE)
Date: 2020-01-28T00:00:00Opposition (OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SANCTIONS)
Date: 2020-01-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-01-28T00:00:00Notice of Consolidation (OF RELATED CASES FOR ALL PURPOSES UNDER C.C.P. 1048)
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award)
Date: 2020-02-24T00:00:00Response ( TO PETITION TO VACATE ARBITRATION AWARD)
Date: 2020-02-25T00:00:00Motion re: (CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD and ENTER JUDGMENT THEREON [CCP ¿ 1290.2])
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00Declaration ( of Peter Gordon re; Objection to Proofs of Service)
Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00Reply (REPLY TO OPPOSITION RE MOTION TO CONFIRM ARB AWARD)
Date: 2020-02-28T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2020-03-06T00:00:00Notice ( of Evidentiary Objections)
Date: 2020-02-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award and Enter Judg...))
Date: 2020-03-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 05/08/2020)
Date: 2020-05-08T00:00:00Response to Petition
Date: 2020-06-02T00:00:00Response (Response to Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award)
Date: 2020-06-17T00:00:00Notice (OF SERVICE OF MINUTE ORDER)
Date: 2020-03-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-05-08T00:00:00Reply (IN RESPONSE TO MERUELO'S OPPOSITION TO PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD)
Date: 2020-06-23T00:00:00Reply (SURREPLY AND REQUEST FOR ADDITIONAL INTEREST)
Date: 2020-06-17T00:00:00Notice (of Continuance)
Date: 2020-05-22T00:00:00Notice (OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING)
Date: 2020-07-02T00:00:00Notice (OF SERVICE)
Date: 2020-07-16T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Stip and Order Re Petition to Confirm)
Date: 2020-07-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award and Enter Judg...))
Date: 2020-06-30T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2020-08-20T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (OF PROPOSED JUDGMENT)
Date: 2020-08-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award and Enter Judg...))
Date: 2020-08-20T00:00:00Motion for Reconsideration
Date: 2020-09-02T00:00:00Notice (OF EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS)
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2020-09-02T00:00:00Notice (OF PROOF OF SERVICE)
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Shorten Time))
Date: 2020-10-02T00:00:00Judgment (JUDGMENT)
Date: 2020-10-02T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (Ex Parte Order to Shorten Time)
Date: 2020-10-02T00:00:00Notice (OF OBJ TO MERUELO'S REQUEST JUDICAL)
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00Motion to Compel (COMPLETE EXHIBITS)
Date: 2020-09-29T00:00:00Notice (of Tentative Re Mtn Reconsideration)
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Notice (of Service of Minute Order)
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00Motion for Sanctions
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00Objection (Objection to Proposed Judgment Filed October 30, 2020)
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's August 2...))
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00Notice (OF PROOF OF SERVICE)
Date: 2020-11-02T00:00:00Reply (ROSEN & ASSOCIATES, P.C.?S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SANCTIONS; DECLARATIONS; EXHIBITS)
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Response (ROSEN?S RESPONSE TO MERUELO?S OBJECTION TO PROPOSED JUDGMENT; DECLARATION; EXHIBITS)
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Notice (OF TENTATIVE RULING)
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion for Sanctions)
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Declaration (and Submission of Docs Re 12-3 Hrg)
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Declaration (Re Service of Proposed Judgment - Exhibits)
Date: 2020-12-03T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Sanctions in the Amount of $30,685 Requ...))
Date: 2020-12-03T00:00:00Affidavit of Identity and Order
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: 2021-01-14T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment
Date: 2021-01-04T00:00:00Motion for Attorney Fees
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Judgment)
Date: 2020-12-31T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00Notice (of Objections to Evidence)
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims
Date: 2021-02-09T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (NOTICE OF LODGING PROPOSED 1ST AMEND JUDGEMENT)
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF LODGING REVISED PROPOSED 1ST AMEND JUDGEMENT)
Date: 2021-03-04T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest
Date: 2021-03-12T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (Lodging Proposed Revised 1st Amend Judgment)
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Notice (of Service of First Amended Judgment)
Date: 2021-04-22T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal
Date: 2021-03-09T00:00:00Writ of Execution ((San Diego))
Date: 2021-03-19T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Entry of Judgment)
Date: 2021-03-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2021-03-01T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment
Date: 2021-03-17T00:00:00Writ of Execution ((Riverside))
Date: 2021-03-19T00:00:00Notice (of Service of Minute Order)
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Writ of Execution ((Ventura))
Date: 2021-03-19T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (Of Proposed 1st Amended Judgment)
Date: 2021-04-22T00:00:00Order (First Amended Judgment)
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses; Hear...))
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Writ of Execution ((Los Angeles))
Date: 2021-03-18T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal ("U")
Date: 2021-05-06T00:00:00Notice (OF SERVICE OF [PROPOSED] 1ST AMENDED JUDGMENT AND NO OBJECTIONS BY JUDGEMENT DEBTOR)
Date: 2021-03-26T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest
Date: 2021-03-05T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of First Amended Judgment)
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103 (NOA 2-22-21)
Date: 2021-04-29T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed ("U")
Date: 2021-04-22T00:00:00Writ of Execution ((San Bernardino))
Date: 2021-03-19T00:00:00Notice (of Service of Tentative Ruling)
Date: 2021-05-04T00:00:00Notice (Continuance of Hrg on Mtn Re Rogs)
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 03/01/2021)
Date: 2021-03-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees))
Date: 2021-02-26T00:00:00Notice (Continuance of Hrg on Mtn Re RFP)
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Writ of Execution ((Orange))
Date: 2021-03-19T00:00:00Writ of Execution ((Santa Barbara))
Date: 2021-03-19T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment
Date: 2021-05-18T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2021-03-03T00:00:00Reply (SURREPLY DECLARATION OF COUNSEL AND EXHIBIT 16 IN RESPONSE TO TENTATIVE RULING)
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103 (NOA 2-22-21)
Date: 2021-04-29T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-04-02T00:00:00Notice (OF TENTATIVE RULING) Filed by ROSEN & ASSOCIATES, P.C. (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-04T00:00:00Writ of Execution ((Los Angeles)) Filed by ROSEN & ASSOCIATES, P.C. (Petitioner)
Date: 2021-03-18T00:00:00Notice (OF OBJ TO MERUELO'S REQUEST JUDICAL) Filed by ROSEN & ASSOCIATES, P.C. (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00Declaration (Re Service of Proposed Judgment - Exhibits) Filed by ROSEN & ASSOCIATES, P.C. (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-12-03T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary) Filed by ROSEN & ASSOCIATES, P.C. (Petitioner)
Date: 2021-01-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's August 2...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00Notice (of Continuance) Filed by ROSEN & ASSOCIATES, P.C. (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-05-22T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00Declaration (and Submission of Docs Re 12-3 Hrg) Filed by ROSEN & ASSOCIATES, P.C. (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Motion for Attorney Fees Filed by ROSEN & ASSOCIATES, P.C. (Petitioner)
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-01-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Reassignment with Related Cases) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award and Enter Judg...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-06-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-28T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (STIPULATION TO CONSOLIDATE) Filed by ROSEN & ASSOCIATES, P.C. (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-01-28T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-08-12T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (OF PROPOSED JUDGMENT) Filed by ROSEN & ASSOCIATES, P.C. (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-08-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Shorten Time)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-02T00:00:00Notice ( OF RULING ON MOTION TO STRIKE) Filed by ROSEN & ASSOCIATES, P.C. (Petitioner)
Date: 2019-12-31T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by ROSEN & ASSOCIATES, P.C. (Petitioner)
Date: 2019-07-26T00:00:00Notice (OF SERVICE OF MINUTE ORDER) Filed by ROSEN & ASSOCIATES, P.C. (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-03-09T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-01-28T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-06T00:00:00Notice (AMENDED NOTICE OF RELATED CASE) Filed by ROSEN & ASSOCIATES, P.C. (Petitioner)
Date: 2019-10-07T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (Ex Parte Order to Shorten Time) Filed by ROSEN & ASSOCIATES, P.C. (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-10-02T00:00:00Notice ( of Evidentiary Objections) Filed by ROSEN & ASSOCIATES, P.C. (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-02-28T00:00:00Notice (OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) Filed by ROSEN & ASSOCIATES, P.C. (Petitioner)
Date: 2019-12-26T00:00:00Notice (OF FILING PROOF OF SERVICE) Filed by ROSEN & ASSOCIATES, P.C. (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-02-26T00:00:00Notice (OF FILING PROOF OF SERVICE)
Date: 2020-02-26T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2019-11-04T00:00:00Appeal Document - APPEAL DOCUMENT B311652;
Date: August 23, 2021Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: September 07, 2021Appeal - Notice of Default Issued
Date: October 19, 2021Appeal - Notice of Non-Compliance
Date: December 01, 2021Appeal - Notice Vacating Notice of Default
Date: December 16, 2021Notice - ASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEY NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL
Date: February 22, 2022Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: January 17, 2023For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.