Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
On Deck Capital Inc., filed a(n) Judgment Enforcement - Creditor case represented by Katz Stuart, against Keyo Hratch, Keyo Trucking Inc., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with David W. Swift presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid W. Swift Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 25, 2019 |
CategoryOther Enforcement Of Judgment Case (Limited Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeJudgment Enforcement |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Order for Continuance/Setting of Judgment Debtor Examination; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Order for Continuance/Setting of Judgment Debtor Examination; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-21T00:00:00First Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-07-25T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by: ON DECK CAPITAL, INC. (Plaintiff); As to: HRATCH KEYO (Defendant)
Date: 2020-05-07T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-01-22T00:00:00First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order
Date: July 25, 2019Declaration (name extension) - Declaration DEC SAK INT OF SSJM
Date: July 25, 2019Proof of Service (Sister State Judgment) - Proof of Service (Sister State Judgment)
Date: August 13, 2019Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (Orange)
Date: September 10, 2019Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (Los Angeles)
Date: September 10, 2019Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service
Date: October 17, 2019Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination)
Date: December 05, 2019Notice (name extension) - Notice Notice of Continuance of Judgment Debtor Examination
Date: January 23, 2020Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail
Date: February 05, 2020Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination)
Date: February 18, 2020Notice (name extension) - Notice of Continuance of Judgment Debtor Examination
Date: February 21, 2020Writ - Return - Writ - Return
Date: May 11, 2020Writ - Return - Writ - Return
Date: June 30, 2020Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination)
Date: September 24, 2020Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (Orange)
Date: November 02, 2020Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (Los Angeles)
Date: November 02, 2020Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail
Date: November 17, 2020Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (Sacramento)
Date: March 18, 2021Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment
Date: August 12, 2021Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by: ON DECK CAPITAL, INC. (Plaintiff); As to: HRATCH KEYO (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by: ON DECK CAPITAL, INC. (Plaintiff); As to: HRATCH KEYO (Defendant)
Date: 2020-05-07T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.