Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Venice Suites Llc, filed a(n) Writ - Administrative Mandamus (General Jurisdiction) case represented by Kavros Andrew Bryant, Nitti Thomas A, against City Of Los Angeles, City Of Los Angeles' Department Of Planning, represented by Brothers Amy, Medellin Oscar, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Mitchell L. Beckloff presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 14, 2019 |
CategoryWrit - Administrative Mandamus (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Petition for Writ of Mandate
Date: June 14, 2019Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: June 14, 2019Summons - SUMMONS ON PETITION
Date: June 14, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: June 14, 2019Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon
Date: June 19, 2019Proof of Personal Service
Date: June 27, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE AND ATTACHED ORDERS THEREON
Date: September 17, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)
Date: September 25, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF TRIAL DATE AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE
Date: January 17, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)
Date: January 17, 2020Answer
Date: February 10, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/27/2020
Date: April 27, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUED TRIAL DATE
Date: May 06, 2020Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application
Date: August 27, 2020Brief - BRIEF PETITIONER'S OPENING BRIEF
Date: August 31, 2020Request for Judicial Notice
Date: September 28, 2020Opposition - OPPOSITION CITY’S OPPOSITION TO WRIT AND DECLARATORY RELIEF CLAIMS
Date: September 28, 2020Reply - REPLY BRIEF
Date: October 13, 2020Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD
Date: October 14, 2020Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING ELECTRONIC ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD
Date: October 15, 2020Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING NOTICE OF LODGING JOINT APPENDIX
Date: October 19, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDER
Date: December 14, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE)
Date: October 28, 2020Order - ORDER DENYING PETITION VERIFIED PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE
Date: December 16, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE)
Date: December 16, 2020Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING PROPOSED JUDGMENT
Date: January 11, 2021Judgment - JUDGMENT PROPOSED JUDGMENT
Date: January 11, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT)
Date: January 20, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT
Date: January 26, 2021Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 02/02/2021
Date: February 02, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: February 02, 2021Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed
Date: February 08, 2021Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal
Date: February 10, 2021Appeal - Notice of Default Issued
Date: April 30, 2021Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103
Date: May 06, 2021Appeal - Notice Court Reporter to Prepare Appeal Transcript
Date: June 24, 2021Appeal - Notice of Fees Due for Clerk's Transcript on Appeal
Date: June 28, 2021Appeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed - APPEAL - REMITTITUR - APPEAL DISMISSED B311458
Date: February 14, 2022Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-02T00:00:00Appeal - Original Clerk's Transcript 1 - 5 Volumes Certified (NOA B311458) Filed by Clerk
Date: September 27, 2021Notice of Lodging PROPOSED JUDGMENT; Filed by: City of Los Angeles (Respondent)
Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: City of Los Angeles (Respondent); As to: Venice Suites LLC, (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-02-10T00:00:00Brief Petitioner's Opening Brief; Filed by: Venice Suites LLC, (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-08-31T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-27T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application; Filed by: Venice Suites LLC, (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-08-27T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Default Issued; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-04-30T00:00:00Petition for Writ of Mandate Filed by Venice Suites LLC, (Petitioner)
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00Appeal - Original Clerk's Transcript 1 - 5 Volumes Certified NOA B311458; Filed by: Clerk
Date: September 27, 2021Order Denying Petition Verified Petition for Writ of Mandate; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-02-10T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by City of Los Angeles (Respondent)
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Appeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed B311458; Filed by: Clerk
Date: February 14, 2022Appeal - Notice Court Reporter to Prepare Appeal Transcript; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-06-24T00:00:00Notice of Lodging ELECTRONIC ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD; Filed by: City of Los Angeles (Respondent)
Date: 2020-10-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Petition for Writ of Mandate) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Fees Due for Clerk's Transcript on Appeal; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-06-28T00:00:00Summons (on Petition) Filed by Venice Suites LLC, (Petitioner)
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-06-19T00:00:00Reply Brief; Filed by: Venice Suites LLC, (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Notice of Lodging Administrative Record; Filed by: Venice Suites LLC, (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-10-14T00:00:00Judgment Filed by City of Los Angeles (Respondent)
Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00Answer Filed by City of Los Angeles (Respondent)
Date: 2020-02-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Petitioner's Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-28T00:00:00Reply (Brief) Filed by Venice Suites LLC, (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Minute Order ((Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Judgment)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Fees Due for Clerk's Transcript on Appeal Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-28T00:00:00Notice ( of Trial Date and Briefing Schedule) Filed by Venice Suites LLC, (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00Notice (of Court Order) Filed by Venice Suites LLC, (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Appeal - Notice Court Reporter to Prepare Appeal Transcript Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-27T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP- Filed by Venice Suites LLC, (Appellant)
Date: 2021-05-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-27T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application Filed by Venice Suites LLC, (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-08-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Petition for Writ of Mandate)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Petition for Writ of Mandate)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00Order (Denying Petition Verified Petition for Writ of Mandate) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-09-25T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (Notice of Lodging Joint Appendix) Filed by Venice Suites LLC, (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Notice (of Continued Trial Date) Filed by Venice Suites LLC, (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-05-06T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (ELECTRONIC ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD) Filed by City of Los Angeles (Respondent)
Date: 2020-10-15T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (Administrative Record) Filed by Venice Suites LLC, (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-10-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Judgment)]) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Appeal Record Delivered Filed by Clerk
Date: October 01, 2021Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Petition for Writ of Mandate) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed Filed by Venice Suites LLC, (Appellant)
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Default Issued Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-30T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (PROPOSED JUDGMENT) Filed by City of Los Angeles (Respondent)
Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00Respondent's Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP- Filed by City of Los Angeles (Respondent)
Date: 2021-05-14T00:00:00Petition for Writ of Mandate
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (PROPOSED JUDGMENT)
Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00Notice (of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon)
Date: 2019-09-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Petitioner's Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial))
Date: 2020-08-28T00:00:00Notice (of Court Order)
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Petition for Writ of Mandate) of 12/16/2020)
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (ELECTRONIC ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD)
Date: 2020-10-15T00:00:00Notice (of Continued Trial Date)
Date: 2020-05-06T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00Summons (on Petition)
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/27/2020)
Date: 2020-04-27T00:00:00Opposition (CITY?S OPPOSITION TO WRIT AND DECLARATORY RELIEF CLAIMS)
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Notice ( of Trial Date and Briefing Schedule)
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00Order (Denying Petition Verified Petition for Writ of Mandate)
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Petition for Writ of Mandate) of 10/28/2020)
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00Reply (Brief)
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-04-27T00:00:00Opposition (TO PETITIONER?S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL; DECLARATION OF AMY BROTHERS)
Date: 2020-08-27T00:00:00Brief (Petitioner's Opening Brief)
Date: 2020-08-31T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (Petitioner's Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial)
Date: 2020-08-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference))
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-02-10T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application
Date: 2020-08-27T00:00:00Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon
Date: 2019-06-19T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice (IN SUPPORT OF PETITIONER'S OPENING BRIEF)
Date: 2020-08-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Petition for Writ of Mandate))
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (Notice of Lodging Joint Appendix)
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference))
Date: 2019-09-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Petition for Writ of Mandate))
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (Administrative Record)
Date: 2020-10-14T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-06-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-02-02T00:00:00Appeal Document TURN DOWN LETTER; Filed by:
Date: 2021-05-11T00:00:00Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-06-19T00:00:00Appeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed (B311458) Filed by Clerk
Date: February 14, 2022Brief (Petitioner's Opening Brief) Filed by Venice Suites LLC, (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-08-31T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Petition for Writ of Mandate) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00Notice of Lodging Notice of Lodging Joint Appendix; Filed by: Venice Suites LLC, (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-10T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: City of Los Angeles (Respondent)
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Notice (OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT) Filed by City of Los Angeles (Respondent)
Date: 2021-01-26T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-; Filed by: Venice Suites LLC, (Appellant)
Date: 2021-05-06T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Venice Suites LLC, (Petitioner)
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Venice Suites LLC, (Petitioner)
Date: 2019-06-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Petition for Writ of Mandate) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for [Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Judgment)]; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Appeal - Clerk's Transcript Fee Paid APPELLANT PAID $170.90; Filed by:
Date: 2021-07-09T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.