Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
JUAN BONILLA VS AFFLUENT STAFFING, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY
On May 09, 2019 an other enforcement of judgment case (limited jurisdiction) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. Judge Upinder S. Kalra presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
May 09, 2019
Last Refreshed
September 06, 2023
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Filing Court House
Stanley Mosk
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Serena R. Murillo;Category
Other Enforcement of Judgment Case (Limited Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Judgment Enforcement
Status
Want of Prosecution
Case Duration
1 year, 2 months and 27 days
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 21, 2021 | hearing |
Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Order to Show Cause Re: (name extension) Judge: Upinder S. Kalra |
|
July 21, 2021 | hearing |
Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 updated: Result Date to ; Result Type to Held
Judge: Upinder S. Kalra |
|
July 21, 2021 | Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal;) | ||
July 21, 2021 | Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal;) of 07/21/2021 | ||
July 21, 2021 | Order - Dismissal - Order - Dismissal | ||
July 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Order - Dismissal; Issued and Filed by: Clerk |
|
July 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal;) | |
July 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing for (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal;) of ; Filed by: Clerk |
|
July 21, 2021 | Docket Event | On the Petition filed by Juan Bonilla on , entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action |
|
July 21, 2021 | hearing | ||
April 19, 2021 | Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling | ||
April 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Juan Bonilla (Plaintiff) |
|
April 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Juan Bonilla (Plaintiff) |
|
April 13, 2021 | Tentative Ruling | Case Number: 19STCP01841 Hearing Date: April 13, 2021 Dept: 26 Bonilla v. Affluent Staffing, LLC, et al. VACATE JUDGMENT (CCP 473(d)) TENTATIVE RULING: Petitioner California Labor Commissioners Mot... | |
April 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 07/21/2021 in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26
Judge: Upinder S. Kalra |
|
April 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment (CCP 473) scheduled for 04/13/2021 in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 updated: Result Date to 04/13/2021; Result Type to Held
Judge: Upinder S. Kalra |
|
April 13, 2021 | hearing |
Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26
Judge: Upinder S. Kalra |
|
April 13, 2021 | hearing |
Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment (CCP 473) scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 updated: Result Date to ; Result Type to Held
Judge: Upinder S. Kalra |
|
April 13, 2021 | Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment (CCP 473)) of 04/13/2021 | ||
April 13, 2021 | Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment (CCP 473)) | ||
April 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment (CCP 473)) | |
April 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment (CCP 473)) of ; Filed by: Clerk |
|
April 13, 2021 | Docket Event | On the Petition filed by Juan Bonilla on , judgment entered on as to Affluent Staffing, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company is |
|
April 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Updated -- On the Petition filed by Juan Bonilla on , judgment entered on is vacated |
|
April 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment (CCP 473)) of 04/13/2021; Filed by: Clerk |
|
April 13, 2021 | Docket Event | On the Petition filed by Juan Bonilla on 05/09/2019, judgment entered on 05/09/2019 as to Affluent Staffing, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company is |
|
April 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment (CCP 473)) | |
April 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Updated -- On the Petition filed by Juan Bonilla on 05/09/2019, judgment entered on 05/09/2019 is vacated |
|
March 12, 2021 | Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment - Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment | ||
March 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment; Filed by: Juan Bonilla (Plaintiff) |
|
March 12, 2021 | hearing | Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment (CCP 473) scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 | |
March 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment; Filed by: Juan Bonilla (Plaintiff) |
|
March 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment (CCP 473) scheduled for 04/13/2021 in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 | |
August 04, 2020 | Order (name extension) - Order RE: APPLICATION TO SET ASIDE JUDGMENT ON THE FINAL ORDER, DECISION OR AWARD OF THE LABOR COMMISSIONER | ||
August 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Order RE: APPLICATION TO SET ASIDE JUDGMENT ON THE FINAL ORDER, DECISION OR AWARD OF THE LABOR COMMISSIONER; Filed by: Juan Bonilla (Plaintiff); As to: Affluent Staffing, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant) |
|
August 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Updated -- Order RE: APPLICATION TO SET ASIDE JUDGMENT ON THE FINAL ORDER, DECISION OR AWARD OF THE LABOR COMMISSIONER: Status changed from Filed to Signed and Filed | |
August 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Order RE: APPLICATION TO SET ASIDE JUDGMENT ON THE FINAL ORDER, DECISION OR AWARD OF THE LABOR COMMISSIONER; Filed by: Juan Bonilla (Plaintiff); As to: Affluent Staffing, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant) |
|
July 31, 2020 | Application (name extension) - Application APPLICATION TO SET ASIDE JUDGMENT ON THE FINAL ORDER, DECISION OR AWARD OF THE LABOR COMMISSIONER; [Proposed] ORDER FILED CONCURRENTLY | ||
July 31, 2020 | Docket Event | Application APPLICATION TO SET ASIDE JUDGMENT ON THE FINAL ORDER, DECISION OR AWARD OF THE LABOR COMMISSIONER; [Proposed] ORDER FILED CONCURRENTLY; Filed by: Juan Bonilla (Plaintiff); As to: Affluent Staffing, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant) |
|
July 31, 2020 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Spring Street Courthouse in Department 26 - Hon. Serena R\. Murillo; Reason: Inventory Transfer | |
July 31, 2020 | Docket Event | Application APPLICATION TO SET ASIDE JUDGMENT ON THE FINAL ORDER, DECISION OR AWARD OF THE LABOR COMMISSIONER; [Proposed] ORDER FILED CONCURRENTLY; Filed by: Juan Bonilla (Plaintiff); As to: Affluent Staffing, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant) |
|
May 13, 2019 | Docket Event | Case assigned in ROOM 118 Stanley Mosk Courthouse | |
May 09, 2019 | Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet | ||
May 09, 2019 | Request For Entry of Judgment (Enforcement of Judgment) - Request For Entry of Judgment (Enforcement of Judgment) | ||
May 09, 2019 | First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order | ||
May 09, 2019 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Juan Bonilla (Plaintiff); As to: Affluent Staffing, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant) |
|
May 09, 2019 | Docket Event | Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Juan Bonilla against Defendant Affluent Staffing, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company on the Petition filed by Juan Bonilla on for the principal amount of $4,440.55, interest of $0.00, and costs of $250.00 for a total of $4,690.55. |
|
May 09, 2019 | Docket Event | Request For Entry of Judgment (Enforcement of Judgment); Filed by: Juan Bonilla (Plaintiff); As to: Affluent Staffing, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant) |
|
May 09, 2019 | Docket Event | First Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk |
|
May 09, 2019 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Juan Bonilla (Plaintiff); As to: Affluent Staffing, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant) |
|
May 09, 2019 | Docket Event | Request For Entry of Judgment (Enforcement of Judgment); Filed by: Juan Bonilla (Plaintiff); As to: Affluent Staffing, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant) |
|
May 09, 2019 | Docket Event | Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Juan Bonilla against Defendant Affluent Staffing, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company on the Petition filed by Juan Bonilla on 05/09/2019 for the principal amount of $4,440.55, interest of $0.00, and costs of $250.00 for a total of $4,690.55. |
|