Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Lincoln Center Llc A California Limited Liability Company Successor In Interest To Earl H. Schafer And Sallie Jac Schafer, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Sperling Dean Phillip, against Alpha Beta Company A California Corporation Legal Assignee Of The Kroger Company A Ohio Corporation, Ralphs Grocery Company A Ohio Corporation, represented by Kessler Daniel Joseph, Oberbeck Dale Michael, Sanchez Amber Mereille, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Santa Monica with Lisa K Sepe-Wiesenfeld presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLisa K Sepe-Wiesenfeld Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 13, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 27, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Filing Court HouseSanta Monica |
Motion to Tax Costs - Motion to Tax Costs
Date: July 29, 2021Notice of Entry of Amended Judgment (Civil Limited); Filed by: Clerk
Date: September 17, 2021Judgment - Unlawful Detainer; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-06-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for [Order ORDER ON DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES]; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-09-17T00:00:00Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-12-13T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Amended Judgment (Civil Limited); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-06-28T00:00:00Amended Judgment - Unlawful Detainer; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-06-28T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-12-13T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-06-28T00:00:00Declaration re: Attorney's Fees; Filed by: Ralphs Grocery Company, a Ohio corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-10T00:00:00Amended Judgment - Unlawful Detainer; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-09-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
Date: 2021-06-28T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: December 13, 2019Complaint - Complaint
Date: December 13, 2019Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice - Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice
Date: December 13, 2019Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case
Date: December 13, 2019Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (ALL OCCUPANTS)
Date: December 24, 2019Answer - Answer
Date: January 08, 2020Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service
Date: February 21, 2020Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) - Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)
Date: February 21, 2020Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: February 21, 2020Motion for Summary Judgment - Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: September 15, 2020Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: September 28, 2020Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: October 22, 2020Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review)
Date: February 08, 2021Minute Order - Minute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)
Date: April 28, 2021Witness List - Witness List
Date: June 16, 2021Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
Date: June 21, 2021Trial Brief - Trial Brief
Date: June 21, 2021Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
Date: June 23, 2021Judgment - Unlawful Detainer - Judgment - Unlawful Detainer
Date: June 28, 2021Judgment - Unlawful Detainer - Amended Judgment - Unlawful Detainer (Amended)
Date: June 28, 2021Memorandum of Costs (Summary) - Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: July 13, 2021Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review Re Continuance of Motions)
Date: August 03, 2021Motion for Attorney Fees - Motion for Attorney Fees
Date: August 25, 2021Opposition (name extension) - Opposition Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Tax Costs
Date: September 03, 2021Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration of Daniel J. Kessler in Support of Opposition
Date: September 03, 2021Declaration re: Attorney's Fees - Declaration re: Attorney's Fees
Date: September 10, 2021Reply (name extension) - Reply Reply in Support of Motion for Attorneys Fees
Date: September 10, 2021Order (name extension) - Order ORDER ON DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES
Date: September 17, 2021Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order - (Amended)
Date: September 17, 2021Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing Defendants' on Motion for Attorney Fees; Hearing on ...)
Date: September 17, 2021Judgment - Unlawful Detainer - (Amended)
Date: September 17, 2021Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment
Date: February 15, 2022Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review) of 02/08/2021; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Declaration re: Attorney's Fees; Filed by: Ralphs Grocery Company, a Ohio corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-10T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.