Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
William Charles Beck Trustee Of The William Charles Beck Trust, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Meller Eric, against Rips Sheldon, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Santa Monica with Lisa K Sepe-Wiesenfeld presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLisa K Sepe-Wiesenfeld Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 29, 2019 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer/Residential (Not Drugs Or Wrongful Eviction) (Limited Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Filing Court HouseSanta Monica |
Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-08-29T00:00:00Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-08-29T00:00:00Summons - Summons on Complaint
Date: 2019-08-29T00:00:00Complaint - Complaint
Date: August 29, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: August 29, 2019Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (SHELDON RIPS)
Date: September 06, 2019Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (ALL OCCUPANTS)
Date: September 06, 2019Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: September 30, 2019Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service
Date: September 30, 2019Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: September 30, 2019Judgment - Unlawful Detainer - Judgment - Unlawful Detainer
Date: October 03, 2019Writ - Return - Writ - Return
Date: November 25, 2019For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.