Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Milkshake Media Corp. A Calif. Corp., filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Block Dennis P., against Criswell Arvin K., Robinson Rochelle, represented by Babcock Bartley Austin, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Santa Monica with Lisa K Sepe-Wiesenfeld presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLisa K Sepe-Wiesenfeld Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 06, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Filing Court HouseSanta Monica |
Notice of Unlawful Detainer Trial; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-05-17T00:00:00Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-05-06T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: ROCHELLE ROBINSON (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-10T00:00:00Stipulation, Receipt and Order re: Release of Civil Exhibits; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-07-01T00:00:00Request to Waive Additional Court Fees (Superior Court); Filed by: ROCHELLE ROBINSON (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-10T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by: ARVIN K. CRISWELL (Defendant); ROCHELLE ROBINSON (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-10T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: ROCHELLE ROBINSON (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-21T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: ARVIN K. CRISWELL (Defendant); ROCHELLE ROBINSON (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-10T00:00:00Statement of the Case; Filed by: MILKSHAKE MEDIA CORP., A CALIF. CORP. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-25T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: ARVIN K. CRISWELL (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-07-01T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-07-01T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-05-06T00:00:00Request to Waive Additional Court Fees (Superior Court); Filed by: ARVIN K. CRISWELL (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-10T00:00:00Judgment - Unlawful Detainer; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-07-01T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: ARVIN K. CRISWELL (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-10T00:00:00Complaint - Complaint
Date: May 06, 2019Summons - Summons on Complaint
Date: May 06, 2019Answer - Answer
Date: May 10, 2019Demand for Jury Trial - Demand for Jury Trial
Date: May 10, 2019Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)
Date: May 10, 2019Notice of Unlawful Detainer Trial - Notice of Unlawful Detainer Trial
Date: May 17, 2019Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney
Date: May 20, 2019Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney
Date: May 21, 2019Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service
Date: May 28, 2019Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
Date: May 29, 2019Statement of the Case - Statement of the Case
Date: June 25, 2019Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
Date: June 26, 2019Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
Date: June 28, 2019Judgment - Unlawful Detainer - Judgment - Unlawful Detainer
Date: July 01, 2019Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
Date: July 01, 2019Motion re: (name extension) - Motion re: FOR RELIEF
Date: July 12, 2019Motion re: (name extension) - Motion re: for forfeiture
Date: July 30, 2019Ex Parte Application (name extension) - Ex Parte Application FOR SHORTENING TIME
Date: July 31, 2019Writ - Return - Writ - Return
Date: September 04, 2019Request to Waive Additional Court Fees (Superior Court); Filed by: ROCHELLE ROBINSON (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-10T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: ARVIN K. CRISWELL (Defendant); ROCHELLE ROBINSON (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-10T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by: ARVIN K. CRISWELL (Defendant); ROCHELLE ROBINSON (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-10T00:00:00Statement of the Case; Filed by: MILKSHAKE MEDIA CORP., A CALIF. CORP. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-25T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: ROCHELLE ROBINSON (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-10T00:00:00Request to Waive Additional Court Fees (Superior Court); Filed by: ARVIN K. CRISWELL (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-10T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: ROCHELLE ROBINSON (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-21T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: ARVIN K. CRISWELL (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-20T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: ARVIN K. CRISWELL (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 07/01/2019; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-07-01T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.