Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Kaufman Janice, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Fortunati Christopher Allen, against Aiken Thomas C., Freeman Freeman & Smiley Llp, Mckay Adrienne H., represented by Kveton Kyle, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Santa Monica with Mark A. Young presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management237 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 12, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
|
Filing Court HouseSanta Monica |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-12-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Status Conference Re: Selection of Arbitrator) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-06-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order ReCourt Closures;) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-01T00:00:00Status Report; Filed by: Freeman, Freeman & Smiley, LLP (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-17T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: February 27, 2023Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: December 12, 2019Complaint
Date: December 12, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: December 12, 2019Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: January 30, 2020Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: March 05, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RECOURT CLOSURES;)
Date: April 01, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-ARBITRATION STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: March 26, 2021Status Report
Date: June 17, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: ARBITRATION)
Date: May 13, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: SELECTION OF ARBITRATOR)
Date: June 18, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: COMPLETION OF ARBITRATION)
Date: January 28, 2022Order - ORDER APPOINTING ARBITRATOR
Date: April 18, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: SELECTION OF NEW ARBITRATOR)
Date: March 10, 2022Joint Status Conference Report
Date: September 15, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: COMPLETION OF ARBITRATION)
Date: September 16, 2022Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: February 27, 2023Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: April 04, 2023Certificate of Mailing for ((Status Conference Re: Selection of Arbitrator) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-18T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Janice Kaufman (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2019-12-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Completion of Arbitration)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Selection of Arbitrator)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order ReCourt Closures;)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-01T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Janice Kaufman (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-12T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt Filed by Janice Kaufman (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-03-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Selection of New Arbitrator)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-10T00:00:00Status Report Filed by Freeman, Freeman & Smiley, LLP (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-17T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Completion of Arbitration)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-09-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Post-Arbitration Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration; Case Management Conf...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Arbitration)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-13T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-12-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order ReCourt Closures;) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-01T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Janice Kaufman (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Completion of Arbitration))
Date: 2022-01-28T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2019-12-12T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-12-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Post-Arbitration Status Conference))
Date: 2021-03-26T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-12-12T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: 2020-03-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Selection of Arbitrator))
Date: 2021-06-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order ReCourt Closures;) of )
Date: 2020-04-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order ReCourt Closures;))
Date: 2020-04-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Status Conference Re: Selection of Arbitrator) of )
Date: 2021-06-18T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Selection of New Arbitrator))
Date: 2022-03-10T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-12-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Arbitration))
Date: 2021-05-13T00:00:00Status Report
Date: 2021-06-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration; Case Management Conf...))
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-12-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order ReCourt Closures;) of 04/01/2020)
Date: 2020-04-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Post-Arbitration Status Conference))
Date: 2021-03-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order ReCourt Closures;))
Date: 2020-04-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration; Case Management Conf...))
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Selection of Arbitrator))
Date: 2021-06-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Arbitration))
Date: 2021-05-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Selection of New Arbitrator))
Date: 2022-03-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Status Conference Re: Selection of Arbitrator) of 06/18/2021)
Date: 2021-06-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Completion of Arbitration))
Date: 2022-01-28T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.