Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Hampton Adrian, filed a(n) Contractual Fraud - Commercial case represented by Avrith Charles, against Ahizadeh Bahram, Davoodpour Michael, Eae Investment Holdings Llc A Nevada Limited Liability Company, Kohanim Ramin, Kohanim Sami, (total of 8) See All in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Santa Monica Courthouse with H. Jay Ford III presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMay 10, 2019 |
CategoryContractual Fraud (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeContractual Fraud |
|
Filing Court HouseSanta Monica Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Case Cycle Time61 days |
This complaint is filed by Adrian Hampton, the Trustee of the Adrian Hampton Living Trust, against multiple defendants. The complaint alleges fraud and seeks rescission or damages. The defendants include individuals Michael Davoodpour, Fred Nabati, M...
Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: June 17, 2019Notice of Related Case
Date: June 07, 2019Complaint for Rescission or, Alternatively, Damages for Fraud
Date: May 10, 2019Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: May 10, 2019Complaint - COMPLAINT FOR RESCISSION OR, ALTERNATIVELY, DAMAGES FOR FRAUD
Date: May 10, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: May 10, 2019Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: May 22, 2019Notice of Related Case
Date: June 07, 2019Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: June 17, 2019Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: July 03, 2019Request for Dismissal
Date: July 10, 2019Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-05-10T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-05-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Notice of Related Case filed on June 7, 2019;))
Date: 2019-06-27T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-05-10T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2019-05-22T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: July 03, 2019Request for Dismissal
Date: July 10, 2019For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.