Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Ezhari Babak, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Block Dennis P, against Douglas Bradford, represented by Craig Scott Frazier, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Santa Monica with H. Chester Horn, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJanuary 28, 2019 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer/Residential (Not Drugs Or Wrongful Eviction) (Limited Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions78 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Filing Court HouseSanta Monica |
Case Cycle Time322 days |
Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: BRADFORD DOUGLAS (Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-05T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: BRADFORD DOUGLAS (Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-05T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: BABAK EZHARI (Plaintiff); As to: BRADFORD DOUGLAS (Defendant)
Date: 2019-01-28T00:00:00Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: BABAK EZHARI (Plaintiff); As to: BRADFORD DOUGLAS (Defendant)
Date: 2019-01-28T00:00:00Judgment - Unlawful Detainer; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-04-16T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: BABAK EZHARI (Plaintiff); As to: BRADFORD DOUGLAS (Defendant)
Date: 2019-01-28T00:00:00Request/Counter-Request To Set Case For Trial UD non jury trial; Filed by: BABAK EZHARI (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-02-08T00:00:00Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-01-28T00:00:00Trial Brief; Filed by: BRADFORD DOUGLAS (Defendant)
Date: December 16, 2019Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-03-29T00:00:00Notice of Reclassification; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-03-29T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: BABAK EZHARI (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-04-09T00:00:00Request for Refund / Order; Filed by: BABAK EZHARI (Plaintiff)
Date: June 19, 2019Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: BRADFORD DOUGLAS (Defendant); As to: Scott Frazier Craig (Attorney)
Date: 2019-03-29T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-01-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-04-16T00:00:00Notice of Unlawful Detainer Trial; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-03-29T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-04-16T00:00:00Declaration of mailing; Filed by: BRADFORD DOUGLAS (Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-07T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney
Date: March 29, 2019Notice of Reclassification - Notice of Reclassification
Date: March 29, 2019Notice of Unlawful Detainer Trial - Notice of Unlawful Detainer Trial
Date: March 29, 2019Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney
Date: April 09, 2019Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
Date: April 15, 2019Judgment - Unlawful Detainer - Judgment - Unlawful Detainer
Date: April 16, 2019Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
Date: April 16, 2019Request for Refund / Order - Request for Refund / Order
Date: June 19, 2019Trial Brief - Trial Brief
Date: December 16, 2019Request for Refund / Order; Filed by: BABAK EZHARI (Plaintiff)
Date: June 19, 2019Request/Counter-Request To Set Case For Trial UD non jury trial; Filed by: BABAK EZHARI (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-02-08T00:00:00Trial Brief; Filed by: BRADFORD DOUGLAS (Defendant)
Date: December 16, 2019Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: BABAK EZHARI (Plaintiff); As to: BRADFORD DOUGLAS (Defendant)
Date: 2019-01-28T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: BRADFORD DOUGLAS (Defendant); As to: Scott Frazier Craig (Attorney)
Date: 2019-03-29T00:00:00Declaration of mailing; Filed by: BRADFORD DOUGLAS (Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-07T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: BRADFORD DOUGLAS (Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 04/16/2019; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-04-16T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: BABAK EZHARI (Plaintiff); As to: BRADFORD DOUGLAS (Defendant)
Date: 2019-01-28T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: BABAK EZHARI (Plaintiff); As to: BRADFORD DOUGLAS (Defendant)
Date: 2019-01-28T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: BRADFORD DOUGLAS (Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-05T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: BABAK EZHARI (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-04-09T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.